Kirk Knopp v. National Railway Adjustment Board Special Board of, et al
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILWAY ADJUSTMENT BOARD SPECIAL BOARD OF ADJUSTMENT NO. 1185
Plaintiff / Appellant: KIRK E. KNOPP
Defendant / Appellee: BROTHERHOOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT CSX TRANSPORTATION NORTHERN RAILROAD LINES and CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Case Number: 23-3865
Filed: October 24, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Filing 12 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 12/14/2023 03:40 PM]
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 01/17/2024. appellee brief now due 02/16/2024. (LMR) [Entered: 12/04/2023 04:18 PM]
November 8, 2023 Filing 10 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/18/2023; appellee brief due 01/17/2024. (SSS) [Entered: 11/08/2023 09:34 AM]
November 7, 2023 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Joseph Thomas Sobecki for Kirk E. Knopp. Certificate of Service: 11/07/2023. [23-3865] (JTS) [Entered: 11/07/2023 11:54 PM]
November 7, 2023 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph Thomas Sobecki for Appellant Kirk E. Knopp Certificate of Service: 11/07/2023. [23-3865] (JTS) [Entered: 11/07/2023 11:27 PM]
November 7, 2023 Filing 7 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph Thomas Sobecki for Appellant Kirk E. Knopp.. Certificate of Service: 11/07/2023. [23-3865] (JTS) [Entered: 11/07/2023 11:24 PM]
November 7, 2023 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kirk E. Knopp by Joseph Sobecki. Certificate of Service: 11/07/2023. [23-3865] (JTS) [Entered: 11/07/2023 11:21 PM]
November 7, 2023 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Elizabeth L. Dicus for Appellee CSX Transportation, Inc. Certificate of Service: 11/07/2023. [23-3865] (ELD) [Entered: 11/07/2023 10:16 AM]
November 7, 2023 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee CSX Transportation, Inc. by Elizabeth L. Dicus. Certificate of Service: 11/07/2023. [23-3865] (ELD) [Entered: 11/07/2023 10:11 AM]
October 25, 2023 Filing 3 MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Catherine Geyer. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 10/25/2023 05:04 PM]
October 24, 2023 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 10/24/2023 04:19 PM]
October 24, 2023 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Kirk E. Knopp. Transcript needed: y. (SSS) [Entered: 10/24/2023 04:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kirk Knopp v. National Railway Adjustment Board Special Board of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KIRK E. KNOPP
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Sobecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILWAY ADJUSTMENT BOARD SPECIAL BOARD OF ADJUSTMENT NO. 1185
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BROTHERHOOOD OF LOCOMOTIVE ENGINEERS AND TRAINMEN GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT CSX TRANSPORTATION NORTHERN RAILROAD LINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Dicus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?