Gerald Mangum v. Bill Lee, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: GERALD MANGUM
Defendant / Appellee: BILL LEE and DAVID B. RAUSCH
Case Number: 23-5823
Filed: September 14, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2023 Filing 7 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (VLP) [Entered: 10/03/2023 03:26 PM]
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER filed: This appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. No mandate to issue, decision not for publication. Eric L. Clay, Circuit Judge; Helene N. White, Circuit Judge and Joan L. Larsen, Circuit Judge. (VLP) [Entered: 10/03/2023 03:21 PM]
September 25, 2023 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Bill Lee and David B. Rausch by Liz Evan. Certificate of Service: 09/25/2023. [23-5823] (EHE) [Entered: 09/25/2023 01:25 PM]
September 15, 2023 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Bill Lee and David B. Rausch by Miranda Jones. Certificate of Service: 09/15/2023. [23-5823] (MHJ) [Entered: 09/15/2023 02:17 PM]
September 14, 2023 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 10/27/2023;. appellee brief due 11/29/2023;. Reply Brief is due 24 days after the appellee is filed. (VLP) [Entered: 09/14/2023 06:19 AM]
September 14, 2023 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Virginia Padgett (VLP) [Entered: 09/14/2023 06:17 AM]
September 14, 2023 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Gerald Mangum. Transcript needed: n. (VLP) [Entered: 09/14/2023 06:15 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gerald Mangum v. Bill Lee, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GERALD MANGUM
Represented By: Gerald Mangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL LEE
Represented By: Miranda Heather Jones
Represented By: Dean Seif Atyia
Represented By: Elizabeth Helen Evan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID B. RAUSCH
Represented By: Miranda Heather Jones
Represented By: Dean Seif Atyia
Represented By: Elizabeth Helen Evan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?