Michigan Depart of Envt, Great Lakes and Energy, et al v. Gerald R. Ford International Airport Authority
Plaintiff: MICHIGAN DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENT, GREAT LAKES AND ENERGY, on behalf of the People of the State of Michigan and DANA NESSEL, Attorney General, on behalf of the People of the State of Michigan
Defendant: GERALD R. FORD INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT AUTHORITY
Case Number: 24-1085
Filed: February 2, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Acts

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 22, 2024 Mich. Dep't of Env't, Great Lakes & Energy v. Gerald R. Ford Int'l Airport Auth.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Filing 19 RULING LETTER SENT granting in part the appellant's motion to extend time to file brief [ # 17 ] filed by Mr. Aaron D. Lindstrom. Resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 05/01/2024. Appellee brief now due 05/31/2024. (MMP) [Entered: 03/22/2024 01:44 PM]
March 14, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to extend time to file brief, [ # 17 ]; previously filed by Mr. Aaron D. Lindstrom for Gerald R. Ford International Airport Authority. Response from Attorney Mr. Keith David Underkoffler for Appellees Michigan Department of Environment, Great Lakes and Energy and Dana Nessel. Certificate of Service: 03/14/2024. [24-1085] (KDU) [Entered: 03/14/2024 02:08 PM]
March 12, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION filed by Mr. Aaron D. Lindstrom for Gerald R. Ford International Airport Authority to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 03/12/2024. [24-1085] (ADL) [Entered: 03/12/2024 04:31 PM]
March 6, 2024 Filing 16 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Gerald R. Ford International Airport Authority by Sydney O. Imes. Certificate of Service: 03/06/2024. [24-1085] (SOI) [Entered: 03/06/2024 04:02 PM]
March 6, 2024 Filing 15 VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Follow-up Mediation conference has been scheduled for 04/04/2024 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 03/06/2024 09:00 AM]
February 20, 2024 Filing 14 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 04/01/2024; appellee brief due 04/30/2024. (MMP) [Entered: 02/20/2024 04:12 PM]
February 15, 2024 Filing 13 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Aaron D. Lindstrom for Appellant Gerald R. Ford International Airport Authority.. Certificate of Service: 02/15/2024. [24-1085] (ADL) [Entered: 02/15/2024 09:52 AM]
February 13, 2024 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Charles Murray Denton for Appellant Gerald R. Ford International Airport Authority Certificate of Service: 02/13/2024. [24-1085] (CMD) [Entered: 02/13/2024 04:29 PM]
February 9, 2024 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Gerald R. Ford International Airport Authority by Charles M. Denton. Certificate of Service: 02/09/2024. [24-1085] (CMD) [Entered: 02/09/2024 10:14 AM]
February 8, 2024 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Aaron D. Lindstrom for Gerald R. Ford International Airport Authority. Certificate of Service: 02/08/2024. [24-1085] (ADL) [Entered: 02/08/2024 01:24 PM]
February 8, 2024 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Gerald R. Ford International Airport Authority by Aaron D. Lindstrom. Certificate of Service: 02/08/2024. [24-1085] (ADL) [Entered: 02/08/2024 09:14 AM]
February 7, 2024 Filing 8 ***LOCKED - COUNSEL IS ADVISED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE PDF*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Gerald R. Ford International Airport Authority by Charles M. Denton. Certificate of Service: 02/07/2024. [24-1085]--[Edited 02/08/2024 by MMP] (CMD) [Entered: 02/07/2024 03:19 PM]
February 7, 2024 Filing 7 VIDEO CONFERENCE: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 02/29/2024 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 02/07/2024 07:55 AM]
February 6, 2024 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Michigan Department of Environment, Great Lakes and Energy and Dana Nessel by Richard S. Kuhl. Certificate of Service: 02/06/2024. [24-1085] (RSK) [Entered: 02/06/2024 02:33 PM]
February 6, 2024 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Michigan Department of Environment, Great Lakes and Energy and Dana Nessel by Margaret A. Bettenhausen. Certificate of Service: 02/06/2024. [24-1085] (MB) [Entered: 02/06/2024 02:29 PM]
February 6, 2024 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Michigan Department of Environment, Great Lakes and Energy and Dana Nessel by Keith D. Underkoffler. Certificate of Service: 02/06/2024. [24-1085] (KDU) [Entered: 02/06/2024 02:25 PM]
February 5, 2024 Filing 3 MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 02/28/2024 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 02/05/2024 02:29 PM]
February 2, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP) [Entered: 02/02/2024 10:49 AM]
February 2, 2024 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Gerald R. Ford International Airport Authority. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 02/02/2024 10:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michigan Depart of Envt, Great Lakes and Energy, et al v. Gerald R. Ford International Airport Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHIGAN DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENT, GREAT LAKES AND ENERGY, on behalf of the People of the State of Michigan
Represented By: Keith David Underkoffler
Represented By: Margaret Bettenhausen
Represented By: Richard S. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANA NESSEL, Attorney General, on behalf of the People of the State of Michigan
Represented By: Keith David Underkoffler
Represented By: Margaret Bettenhausen
Represented By: Richard S. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD R. FORD INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT AUTHORITY
Represented By: Charles Murray Denton
Represented By: Sydney O. Imes
Represented By: Aaron D. Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?