Rodrigues Talbert v. Bryan Morrison
Petitioner: RODRIGUES TALBERT
Respondent: BRYAN MORRISON, Warden
Case Number: 24-1338
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2024 Filing 7 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Stuart Gary Friedman for Rodrigues Talbert. Certificate of Service: 06/17/2024. Argument Request: requested. [24-1338] (SGF) [Entered: 06/17/2024 12:52 PM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 6 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/17/2024; appellee brief due 07/17/2024. (GSA) [Entered: 05/07/2024 09:11 AM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Rodrigues Talbert by Stuart Friedman. Certificate of Service: 04/23/2024. [24-1338] (SGF) [Entered: 04/23/2024 02:16 PM]
April 22, 2024 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Bryan Morrison by Andrea Christensen-Brown. Certificate of Service: 04/22/2024. [24-1338] (AMC) [Entered: 04/22/2024 03:26 PM]
April 22, 2024 Filing 3 LOCKED ** FORM IS IN AN EDITABLE FORMAT ** PLEASE REFILE BY PRINTING TO PDF BEFORE UPLOADING ** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Rodrigues Talbert by Stuart G. Friedman. Certificate of Service: 04/22/2024. [24-1338]--[Edited 04/22/2024 by GSA] (SGF) [Entered: 04/22/2024 02:24 PM]
April 22, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Gretchen Abruzzo (GSA) [Entered: 04/22/2024 10:53 AM]
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability granted. Notice filed by Appellant Rodrigues Talbert. Transcript needed: n. (GSA) [Entered: 04/22/2024 10:51 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rodrigues Talbert v. Bryan Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RODRIGUES TALBERT
Represented By: Stuart Gary Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BRYAN MORRISON, Warden
Represented By: Andrea M. Christensen-Brown
Represented By: Eric Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?