Justin Guy v. Absopure Water Company
Plaintiff: JUSTIN GUY and JUSTIN GUY, individually and on behalf of those similarly situated
Defendant: ABSOPURE WATER COMPANY
Case Number: 24-1370
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2024 Filing 16 RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief by 60 days [ # 14 ] filed by Mr. Neil E Youngdahl., resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 08/23/2024; appellee brief now due 09/23/2024. (SSS) [Entered: 06/12/2024 08:18 AM]
June 11, 2024 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Justin Guy by Robert G. Kamenec. Certificate of Service: 06/11/2024. [24-1370] (RGK) [Entered: 06/11/2024 04:30 PM]
May 30, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION filed by Mr. Neil E Youngdahl for Absopure Water Company to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 05/30/2024. [24-1370] (NEY) [Entered: 05/30/2024 04:55 PM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 13 MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 06/14/2024 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 05/17/2024 10:17 AM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 12 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/24/2024, appellee brief due 07/24/2024. (ASM) [Entered: 05/14/2024 10:02 AM]
May 13, 2024 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Absopure Water Company by Gary J. Mouw. Certificate of Service: 05/13/2024. [24-1370] (GJM) [Entered: 05/13/2024 03:52 PM]
May 13, 2024 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Neil E Youngdahl for Absopure Water Company. Certificate of Service: 05/13/2024. [24-1370] (NEY) [Entered: 05/13/2024 03:49 PM]
May 13, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Neil E Youngdahl for Appellant Absopure Water Company Certificate of Service: 05/13/2024. [24-1370] (NEY) [Entered: 05/13/2024 03:48 PM]
May 13, 2024 Filing 8 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Neil E Youngdahl for Appellant Absopure Water Company.. Certificate of Service: 05/13/2024. [24-1370] (NEY) [Entered: 05/13/2024 03:46 PM]
May 13, 2024 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Absopure Water Company by Neil E. Youngdahl. Certificate of Service: 05/13/2024. [24-1370] (NEY) [Entered: 05/13/2024 03:44 PM]
May 13, 2024 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael N. Hanna for Appellee Justin Guy Certificate of Service: 05/13/2024. [24-1370] (MNH) [Entered: 05/13/2024 10:16 AM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Justin Guy by Michael Hanna. Certificate of Service: 05/10/2024. [24-1370] (MNH) [Entered: 05/10/2024 10:29 AM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Justin Guy by Andrew R. Frisch. Certificate of Service: 05/01/2024. [24-1370] (ARF) [Entered: 05/01/2024 02:12 PM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 3 **LOCKED**APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Justin Guy by Andrew R. Frisch. Certificate of Service: 05/01/2024. [24-1370]-Counsel instructed to file form listing the client represented on appeal.--[Edited 05/01/2024 by SSS] (ARF) [Entered: 05/01/2024 01:24 PM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 04/29/2024 01:45 PM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Absopure Water Company. Transcript needed: y. (SSS) [Entered: 04/29/2024 01:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Justin Guy v. Absopure Water Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN GUY
Represented By: Geoffrey Nels Fieger
Represented By: Andrew R. Frisch
Represented By: Ertis Tereziu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN GUY, individually and on behalf of those similarly situated
Represented By: Andrew R. Frisch
Represented By: Robert G. Kamenec
Represented By: Michael N. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABSOPURE WATER COMPANY
Represented By: Ronald G. Acho
Represented By: Michael Owen Cummings
Represented By: Gary J. Mouw
Represented By: Neil E. Youngdahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?