Ramon Caldwell v. Bryan Morrison
Petitioner: RAMON CALDWELL
Respondent: BRYAN MORRISON, Warden
Case Number: 24-1376
Filed: April 30, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2024 Filing 5 Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Ramon Caldwell to grant a certificate of appealability. Dated: 05/09/2024. (RLB) [Entered: 05/14/2024 11:25 AM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 4 Copy of District Court Order (RE #44) filed May 2, 2024, granting in forma pauperis. (RLB) [Entered: 05/07/2024 01:42 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - INCORRECT .pdf FORMAT - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE .pdf DOCUMENT*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Bryan Morrison by John Pallas. Certificate of Service: 04/30/2024. [24-1376]--[Edited 04/30/2024 by RLB] (JSP) [Entered: 04/30/2024 12:57 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Baker (RLB) [Entered: 04/30/2024 10:37 AM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Ramon Caldwell. Transcript needed: n. (RLB) [Entered: 04/30/2024 10:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ramon Caldwell v. Bryan Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RAMON CALDWELL
Represented By: Ramon Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BRYAN MORRISON, Warden
Represented By: Andrea M. Christensen-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?