USA v. Vasiliki Pappas, et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: VASILIKI PAPPAS and MARIA PAPPAS
Case Number: 24-1927
Filed: October 23, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2024 Filing 7 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 01/06/202. Appellee brief due 02/06/2025. (MMP) [Entered: 11/22/2024 02:38 PM]
November 22, 2024 Filing 6 SIGNED NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Ms. Maria Pappas and Ms. Vasiliki Pappas. (MMP) [Entered: 11/22/2024 12:04 PM]
November 14, 2024 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Joan M Pepin. Certificate of Service: 11/14/2024. [24-1927] (JMP) [Entered: 11/14/2024 01:06 PM]
November 6, 2024 Filing 4 LETTER SENT to Ms. Maria Pappas, regarding unsigned NOA. (MMP) [Entered: 11/06/2024 03:14 PM]
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER filed: It is ordered that each appellant has 21 days from the date of this order to comply with Rule 11(a) by signing the enclosed copy of the notice of appeal filed on October 17, 2024, and returning it to this court. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of the appeal.. (MMP) [Entered: 10/25/2024 10:08 AM]
October 23, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP) [Entered: 10/23/2024 01:02 PM]
October 23, 2024 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Ms. Maria Pappas and Ms. Vasiliki Pappas. Transcript needed: y. (MMP) [Entered: 10/23/2024 12:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Vasiliki Pappas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Joan M. Pepin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VASILIKI PAPPAS
Represented By: Vasiliki Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA PAPPAS
Represented By: Maria Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?