Dennis Pointer v. Annette Chambers-Smith, et al
Plaintiff: DENNIS WAYNE POINTER
Defendant: JANE DOE, III, Cashier Toledo Correctional Institution, JOHN DOE, III, Warden Assistant Madison Correctional Institution, DANIEL TUYEN VAN, JOHN DOE, II, Warden Assistant Madison Correctional Institution, MALCOM HEARD, [UNKNOWN] WHITTEN, JANE DOE, II, Cashier Madison Correctional Institution, ANNETTE CHAMBERS-SMITH, JOHN DOE, VII, LISA HOYING, SHELLEY CLEMMONS, JOHN DOE, V, Correctional Officer Madison Correctional Institution, NANCY FRYE, JANE DOE, IV, Cashier Richland Correctional Institution, JANE DOE, I, Cashier Ross Correctional Institution, [UNKNOWN] COMBS, JOHN DOE, IV, Liutenant "Lieutenant", DOCTOR PETERSON, MICHAEL JENKINS, RON O'BRIEN, JOHN DOE, I, Warden Assistant Ross Correctional Institution, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER ROBINETT, Madison Correctional Institution, JOHN DOE, VI, Highway Patrol Officer, CHAE HARRIS and CUYAHOGA COUNTY, OH
Case Number: 24-4064
Filed: December 12, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2025 Filing 10 LETTER SENT to Mr. Dennis Wayne Pointer, returning unfiled motion for injunction. (BLH) [Entered: 01/22/2025 11:40 AM]
January 16, 2025 Filing 9 RULING LETTER SENT declaring as moot motion for appointment of counsel [ # 8 ] filed by Mr. Dennis Wayne Pointer. The motion was filed and is being considered in the related case, 24-4105, because 24-4064 was dismissed as a duplicate appeal. (REO) [Entered: 01/16/2025 01:05 PM]
January 16, 2025 Filing 8 Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Dennis Wayne Pointer for appointment of counsel. (REO) [Entered: 01/16/2025 12:58 PM]
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed to dismiss as a duplicate appeal of case number 24-4105. 6th Cir. R. 45(a)(8). No mandate to issue. (REO) [Entered: 01/15/2025 09:04 AM]
January 7, 2025 Filing 6 RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee. Fee deadline is now 2/6/2025. (REO) [Entered: 01/07/2025 11:18 AM]
January 7, 2025 Filing 5 Copy of District Court Order filed denying in forma pauperis. Entered 1/6/2025. (REO) [Entered: 01/07/2025 11:12 AM]
January 3, 2025 Filing 4 CORRESPONDENCE: change of address and correspondence by Mr. Dennis Wayne Pointer. Address has been updated. (REO) [Entered: 01/06/2025 03:42 PM]
December 19, 2024 Filing 3 LETTER SENT to Dennis Wayne Pointer, directing that the enclosed notice of appeal be signed and returned to this court by 01/02/2025. Amended caption enclosed. (REO) [Entered: 12/19/2024 12:01 PM]
December 12, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 12/12/2024 09:31 AM]
December 12, 2024 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Dennis Wayne Pointer. Transcript needed: n. (REO) [Entered: 12/12/2024 09:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Dennis Pointer v. Annette Chambers-Smith, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE, III, Cashier Toledo Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, III, Warden Assistant Madison Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL TUYEN VAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, II, Warden Assistant Madison Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALCOM HEARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: [UNKNOWN] WHITTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE, II, Cashier Madison Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNETTE CHAMBERS-SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, VII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA HOYING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELLEY CLEMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, V, Correctional Officer Madison Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY FRYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE, IV, Cashier Richland Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE, I, Cashier Ross Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: [UNKNOWN] COMBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, IV, Liutenant "Lieutenant"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR PETERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL JENKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, I, Warden Assistant Ross Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER ROBINETT, Madison Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, VI, Highway Patrol Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAE HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUYAHOGA COUNTY, OH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS WAYNE POINTER
Represented By: Dennis Wayne Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?