USA, et al v. City of Akron, OH, et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: CITY OF AKRON, OH and STATE OF OHIO
Case Number: 24-4074
Filed: December 17, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2025 Filing 16 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Stephen W. Funk for City of Akron, OH. Certificate of Service: 01/21/2025. Argument Request: requested. [24-4074] (SWF) [Entered: 01/21/2025 05:20 PM]
January 21, 2025 Filing 15 RULING LETTER SENT regarding .Amended Caption (VLP) [Entered: 01/21/2025 02:59 PM]
January 21, 2025 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant City of Akron, OH by Terrence S. Finn. Certificate of Service: 01/21/2025. [24-4074] (TSF) [Entered: 01/21/2025 11:50 AM]
January 21, 2025 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for OH by Amber Wootton Hertlein. Certificate of Service: 01/21/2025. [24-4074] (ADW) [Entered: 01/21/2025 10:22 AM]
December 27, 2024 Filing 12 REPLY filed by Mr. Stephen W. Funk for City of Akron, OH regarding Akron's Renewed Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal Certificate of Service: 12/27/2024. [24-4074] (SWF) [Entered: 12/27/2024 09:27 AM]
December 20, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 4 ]; previously filed by Mr. Stephen W. Funk for City of Akron, OH. Response from Attorney Mr. Jacob David Ecker for Appellee USA. Certificate of Service: 12/20/2024. [24-4074] (JDE) [Entered: 12/20/2024 06:50 PM]
December 19, 2024 Filing 10 BRIEFING LETTER SENT resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 01/21/2025. appellee brief now due 02/19/2025. Reply brief due reply by 03/07/2025. (VLP) [Entered: 12/19/2024 09:02 AM]
December 19, 2024 Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER filed. The clerk previously entered an order directing the defendant to file its appellate brief in 24-4074 on January 20, 2025. That date is a federal holiday. Accordingly, the briefing schedule is AMENDED to reflect that the defendant shall file its principal brief by January 21, 2025. The remainder of the clerks briefing order remains in effect. [24-3277, 24-4074] (VLP) [Entered: 12/19/2024 08:58 AM]
December 19, 2024 Filing 8 ***VACATED- SEE BRIEFING SCHDEULE AT #10*** BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 01/20/2025;. appellee brief due 02/19/2025; Reply brief due reply by 03/07/2025.--[Edited 12/19/2024 by VLP] (VLP) [Entered: 12/19/2024 08:02 AM]
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed: The motions [ # 7276861-2 ] [ # 5 ] are GRANTED IN PART insofar as briefing will be expedited in 24-4074. Upon the completion of briefing in 24-4074, these appeals will be submitted to the same panel for consideration on the same date. In 24-4074, the defendant shall file its opening brief no later than January 20, 2025. The plaintiff shall file its principal brief no later than February 19, 2025. The defendant may reply by March 7, 2025. No extensions of the briefing schedule will be granted. A separate briefing letter will issue. [24-3277, 24-4074] (VLP) [Entered: 12/19/2024 07:57 AM]
December 18, 2024 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Jacob D. Ecker. Certificate of Service: 12/18/2024. [24-4074] (JDE) [Entered: 12/18/2024 01:39 PM]
December 17, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION filed by Mr. Stephen W. Funk for City of Akron, OH to expedite briefing schedule. Certificate of Service: 12/17/2024. [24-4074] (SWF) [Entered: 12/17/2024 04:15 PM]
December 17, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION filed by Mr. Stephen W. Funk for City of Akron, OH to stay district court order. Certificate of Service: 12/17/2024. [24-4074] (SWF) [Entered: 12/17/2024 04:13 PM]
December 17, 2024 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant City of Akron, OH by Stephen W. Funk. Certificate of Service: 12/17/2024. [24-4074] (SWF) [Entered: 12/17/2024 09:38 AM]
December 17, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Virginia Padgett (VLP) [Entered: 12/17/2024 08:07 AM]
December 17, 2024 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant City of Akron, OH. Transcript needed: n. (VLP) [Entered: 12/17/2024 08:05 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA, et al v. City of Akron, OH, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jacob David Ecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF AKRON, OH
Represented By: Terrence S. Finn
Represented By: Stephen W. Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF OHIO
Represented By: Amber Dawn Wootton Hertlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?