Dennis Pointer v. Annette Chambers-Smith, et al
Plaintiff: DENNIS WAYNE POINTER
Defendant: JANE DOE, I, Cashier Ross Correctional Institution, DANIEL TUYEN VAN, CHAE HARRIS, JOHN DOE, II, Warden Assistant Madison Correctional Institution, NANCY FRYE, SHELLEY CLEMMONS, LISA HOYING, JANE DOE, II, Cashier Madison Correctional Institution, [UNKNOWN] WHITTEN, ANNETTE CHAMBERS-SMITH, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER ROBINETT, Madison Correctional Institution, MALCOM HEARD, JOHN DOE, IV, Liutenant "Lieutenant", JANE DOE, III, Cashier Toledo Correctional Institution, JOHN DOE, VII, [UNKNOWN] COMBS, JOHN DOE, I, Warden Assistant Ross Correctional Institution, JANE DOE, IV, Cashier Richland Correctional Institution, MICHAEL JENKINS, JOHN DOE, V, Correctional Officer Madison Correctional Institution, DOCTOR PETERSON, JOHN DOE, VI, Highway Patrol Officer, RON O'BRIEN, CUYAHOGA COUNTY, OH and JOHN DOE, III, Warden Assistant Toledo Correctional Institution
Case Number: 24-4105
Filed: December 27, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2025 Filing 12 Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Dennis Wayne Pointer to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 01/24/2025. (REO) [Entered: 02/20/2025 09:50 AM]
January 29, 2025 Filing 11 Financial Affidavit filed by Appellant Mr. Dennis Wayne Pointer Certificate of Service: none; dated 01/24/2025. (BLH) [Entered: 01/29/2025 11:15 AM]
January 29, 2025 Filing 10 TENDERED motion for ifp. Received from Appellant Mr. Dennis Wayne Pointer. (BLH) [Entered: 01/29/2025 11:14 AM]
January 21, 2025 Filing 9 Prisoner trust account statement filed. (BLH) [Entered: 01/22/2025 11:15 AM]
January 21, 2025 Filing 8 Financial Affidavit filed by Appellant Mr. Dennis Wayne Pointer Certificate of Service: none; dated 01/14/2025. (BLH) [Entered: 01/22/2025 10:23 AM]
January 21, 2025 Filing 6 ***LOCKED - filed on incorrect case*** TENDERED motion for ifp. Received from Appellant Mr. Dennis Wayne Pointer.--[Edited 02/20/2025 by REO] (BLH) [Entered: 01/22/2025 10:14 AM]
January 17, 2025 Filing 5 RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee. (REO) [Entered: 01/17/2025 12:50 PM]
January 17, 2025 Filing 4 Copy of District Court Order filed denying in forma pauperis. Entered 1/6/2025. (REO) [Entered: 01/17/2025 12:48 PM]
January 16, 2025 Filing 3 Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Dennis Wayne Pointer for appointment of counsel. (REO) [Entered: 01/16/2025 01:02 PM]
December 27, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 12/27/2024 11:09 AM]
December 27, 2024 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Dennis Wayne Pointer. Transcript needed: n. (REO) [Entered: 12/27/2024 11:03 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Dennis Pointer v. Annette Chambers-Smith, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE, I, Cashier Ross Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL TUYEN VAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAE HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, II, Warden Assistant Madison Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY FRYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELLEY CLEMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA HOYING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE, II, Cashier Madison Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: [UNKNOWN] WHITTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNETTE CHAMBERS-SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER ROBINETT, Madison Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALCOM HEARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, IV, Liutenant "Lieutenant"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE, III, Cashier Toledo Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, VII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: [UNKNOWN] COMBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, I, Warden Assistant Ross Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE, IV, Cashier Richland Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL JENKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, V, Correctional Officer Madison Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR PETERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, VI, Highway Patrol Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUYAHOGA COUNTY, OH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, III, Warden Assistant Toledo Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS WAYNE POINTER
Represented By: Dennis Wayne Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?