Michael McIntosh, et al v. City of Madisonville, KY
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MCINTOSH and REBECCA MCINTOSH
Defendant: CITY OF MADISONVILLE, KY
Case Number: 24-5383
Filed: April 23, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2024 Filing 13 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Thomas E. Springer, III for Michael McIntosh and Rebecca McIntosh. Certificate of Service: 06/21/2024. Argument Request: requested. [24-5383] (TES) [Entered: 06/21/2024 04:35 PM]
June 11, 2024 Filing 12 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 06/11/2024 10:48 AM]
May 21, 2024 Filing 11 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 06/24/2024. appellee brief now due 07/24/2024. (LMR) [Entered: 05/21/2024 12:27 PM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 10 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas E. Springer, III for Appellants Michael McIntosh and Rebecca McIntosh.. Certificate of Service: 04/25/2024. [24-5383] (TES) [Entered: 04/25/2024 05:32 PM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee City of Madisonville, KY by James Sigler. Certificate of Service: 04/25/2024. [24-5383] (JAS) [Entered: 04/25/2024 03:21 PM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James A. Sigler for Appellee City of Madisonville, KY Certificate of Service: 04/25/2024. [24-5383] (JAS) [Entered: 04/25/2024 03:20 PM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 7 VIDEO CONFERENCE: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 05/21/2024 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Catherine Geyer. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 04/25/2024 10:33 AM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas E. Springer, III for Appellants Michael McIntosh and Rebecca McIntosh Certificate of Service: 04/24/2024. [24-5383] (TES) [Entered: 04/24/2024 05:38 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Michael McIntosh and Rebecca McIntosh by Thomas E. Springer III. Certificate of Service: 04/24/2024. [24-5383] (TES) [Entered: 04/24/2024 05:37 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 4 MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 05/16/2024 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Catherine Geyer. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 04/24/2024 01:55 PM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/03/2024;. appellee brief due 07/03/2024; (RGF) [Entered: 04/23/2024 10:22 AM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Mr. Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF) [Entered: 04/23/2024 10:21 AM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Michael McIntosh and Rebecca McIntosh. Transcript needed: n. (RGF) [Entered: 04/23/2024 10:18 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael McIntosh, et al v. City of Madisonville, KY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MCINTOSH
Represented By: Thomas E. Springer III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA MCINTOSH
Represented By: Thomas E. Springer III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF MADISONVILLE, KY
Represented By: James A. Sigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?