Joshua Grubb v. Cookie Crews, et al
Plaintiff: JOSHUA A. GRUBB
Defendant: LAUREN MASSEY, COOKIE CREWS, SCOTT JORDAN, LAURA PLAPPERT and AMY L. FISHER
Case Number: 24-5580
Filed: June 24, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2024 Filing 5 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 09/17/2024. (ASM) [Entered: 08/08/2024 03:27 PM]
August 8, 2024 Filing 4 Update fee status change to paid. (ASM) [Entered: 08/08/2024 03:25 PM]
July 19, 2024 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Mr. Joshua A. Grubb by Samuel Weiss. Certificate of Service: 07/19/2024. [24-5580] (SW) [Entered: 07/19/2024 12:31 PM]
June 24, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 06/24/2024 09:53 AM]
June 24, 2024 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Joshua A. Grubb. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 06/24/2024 09:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Joshua Grubb v. Cookie Crews, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREN MASSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOKIE CREWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT JORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA PLAPPERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY L. FISHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA A. GRUBB
Represented By: Samuel Weiss
Represented By: Joshua A. Grubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?