Karim Codrington v. Jay Dolak, et al
Plaintiff: KARIM CODRINGTON
Defendant: STEVE CONRAD, Indivudually and in his Official Capacity as Chief of Police for Louisville Metro Government, LOUISVILLE-JEFFERSON COUNTY, KY METRO GOVERNMENT, OFFICER JAY DOLAK, Individually and in his Official Capacity as a Police Officer of Louisville Metro Government, OFFICER JOHN KIRK, Individually and in his Official Capacity as a Police Officer of Louisville Metro Government and OFFICER TYLER BLISSETT, Individually and in his Official Capacity as a Police Officer of Louisville Metro Government
Case Number: 24-5831
Filed: September 12, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2024 Filing 14 RULING LETTER SENT GRANTING Appellant's motion to extend time to file brief [ # 13 ] filed by Mr. Paul Brzyski. Reset briefing: appellant brief now due 12/12/2024; appellee brief now due 01/13/2025. (PJE) [Entered: 10/15/2024 12:46 PM]
October 11, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION filed by Mr. Paul Brzyski for Karim Codrington to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 10/11/2024. [24-5831] (PB) [Entered: 10/11/2024 01:58 PM]
October 9, 2024 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Karim Codrington by Daniel N. Lerman. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2024. [24-5831] (DNL) [Entered: 10/09/2024 02:35 PM]
October 9, 2024 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Karim Codrington by Paul Brzyski. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2024. [24-5831] (PB) [Entered: 10/09/2024 02:24 PM]
September 30, 2024 Filing 10 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/12/2024;. appellee brief due 12/09/2024; (JEC) [Entered: 09/30/2024 09:42 AM]
September 27, 2024 Filing 9 ***INCORRECT ENTRY-TRANSCRIPT NOT NEEDED-DISTRICT COURT DOCUMENTS AVAILABLE ELECTRONICALLY***TRANSCRIPT ordered from filed by Mr. Shaun A. Wimberly, Sr. for Karim Codrington. [9] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 09/27/2024 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Rebecca Grady Jennings ; Hearing Dates: Docket Text Number (Doc.) Doc. 1 through Doc. 79 of the entire case file of Karim Codrington v. Officer Jay Dolak, et al. Civil Action No. 3:21-cv-665 filed in the United States District Court Westen District of Kentucky Louisville Division ; Method of Payment: Private Funds CJA-24 Authorization Date: 09/27/2024 ; ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 09/27/2024. [24-5831] --[Edited 09/30/2024 by JEC] (SAW) [Entered: 09/27/2024 02:09 PM]
September 27, 2024 Filing 8 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Shaun A. Wimberly, Sr. for Appellant Karim Codrington. Is this case a cross-appeal? No ; Has this case or a related one been before this court previously? No ; Parties Against Whom this Appeal is Being Taken: Tyler Blissett, Steve Conrad, Jay Dolak, John Kirk and Louisville-Jefferson County, KY Metro Government ; Issues:. Certificate of Service: 09/27/2024. [24-5831] (SAW) [Entered: 09/27/2024 01:42 PM]
September 27, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Name of Counsel: Shaun A. Wimberly, Sr. ; Karim Codrington makes the following disclosure: 1. Is said party a subsidiary or affiliate of a publicly owned corporation? No 2. Is there a publicly owned corporation, not a party to the appeal, with a financial interest in the outcome? No Certificate of Service: 09/27/2024. [24-5831] (SAW) [Entered: 09/27/2024 01:37 PM]
September 27, 2024 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Karim Codrington by Shaun A. Wimberly, Sr.. Certificate of Service: 09/27/2024. [24-5831] (SAW) [Entered: 09/27/2024 01:35 PM]
September 27, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Name of Counsel: Susan K. Rivera ; Tyler Blissett, Jay Dolak, Steve Conrad, John Kirk and Louisville-Jefferson County, KY Metro Government makes the following disclosure: 1. Is said party a subsidiary or affiliate of a publicly owned corporation? NO 2. Is there a publicly owned corporation, not a party to the appeal, with a financial interest in the outcome? NO Certificate of Service: 09/27/2024. [24-5831] (SKR) [Entered: 09/27/2024 11:02 AM]
September 24, 2024 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Tyler Blissett, Steve Conrad, Jay Dolak, John Kirk and Louisville-Jefferson County, KY Metro Government by Susan K. Rivera. Certificate of Service: 09/24/2024. [24-5831] (SKR) [Entered: 09/24/2024 12:06 PM]
September 13, 2024 Filing 3 MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 10/16/2024 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Catherine Geyer. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 09/13/2024 11:06 AM]
September 12, 2024 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Jill Colyer (JEC) [Entered: 09/12/2024 10:54 AM]
September 12, 2024 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Karim Codrington. Transcript needed: n. (JEC) [Entered: 09/12/2024 10:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Karim Codrington v. Jay Dolak, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE CONRAD, Indivudually and in his Official Capacity as Chief of Police for Louisville Metro Government
Represented By: Katherine E. Tapp
Represented By: Susan Klein Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUISVILLE-JEFFERSON COUNTY, KY METRO GOVERNMENT
Represented By: Katherine E. Tapp
Represented By: Susan Klein Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JAY DOLAK, Individually and in his Official Capacity as a Police Officer of Louisville Metro Government
Represented By: Katherine E. Tapp
Represented By: Susan Klein Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER JOHN KIRK, Individually and in his Official Capacity as a Police Officer of Louisville Metro Government
Represented By: Katherine E. Tapp
Represented By: Susan Klein Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER TYLER BLISSETT, Individually and in his Official Capacity as a Police Officer of Louisville Metro Government
Represented By: Katherine E. Tapp
Represented By: Susan Klein Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARIM CODRINGTON
Represented By: Shaun A. Wimberly Sr.
Represented By: Daniel Noah Lerman
Represented By: Paul Brzyski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?