USA v. Shaaban, Shaaban Hafiz Ahmad
Case Number: 06-2801
Filed: October 26, 2007
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 26, 2007 USA v. Shaaban, Shaaban Hafiz Ahmad
January 28, 2008 USA v. Shaaban, Shaaban Hafiz Ahmad
February 4, 2008 USA v. Shaaban, Shaaban Hafiz Ahmad
April 24, 2008 USA v. Shaaban, Shaaban Hafiz Ahmad
May 1, 2008 USA v. Shaaban, Shaaban Hafiz Ahmad

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Opinion
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Opinion
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Opinion
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Opinion
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Opinion
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Shaaban, Shaaban Hafiz Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?