Mary Shepard, et al v. Lisa Madigan, et al

Plaintiff / Appellant: ILLINOIS STATE RIFLE ASSOCIATION and MARY E. SHEPARD
Defendant / Appellee: DAVID LIVESAY, in his official capacity as Sheriff of Union County, Illinois, PATRICK J. QUINN, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Illinois, TYLER R. EDMONDS, in his official capacity as the State's Attorney of Union County, Illinois and LISA MADIGAN, in her official capacity as Illinois Attorney General
Amicus Curiae: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF POLICE OFFICERS, SYBRINA FULTON, KENNETH PACHOLSKI, CHICAGO TRANSIT AUTHORITY, LUCIA MCBATH, parent of Jordan Davis, TRACY MARTIN, MICHAEL HALL, NATIONAL BLACK POLICE ASSOCIATION, BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, KATHRYN TYLER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, WASHINGTON D.C., MAJOR CITIES CHIEFS ASSOCIATON, LEGAL COMMUNITY AGAINST VIOLENCE, CITY OF CHICAGO, BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE CITY OF CHICAGO, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INCORPORATED and RON DAVIS
Case Number: 12-1788
Filed: April 3, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 12/11/2012 Opinion with Mandate and Bill of Costs sent to the District Court Clerk. [6498839-2] [6498839] [12-1269, 12-1788] (RS)
July 9, 2013 78 Mandate issued with bill of costs in the amount of $834.30 & $931.90. No record to be returned. [78] [6498755] [12-1269, 12-1788]--[Edited 07/09/2013 by RS]--[Edited 07/09/2013 by RS] (RS)
June 28, 2013 77 Notice from the Supreme Court that a motion for extension of time to file a Petition for Writ of Certiorari has been GRANTED, extending such time to 07/22/2013. [77] [6497263] [12-1269, 12-1788] (JR)
June 4, 2013 76 Featured Case Order re: 1. Motion to stay mandate for 30 additional days. 2. Opposition to motion to stay mandate for additional 30 days. 3. Plaintiffs-Appellants Mary Shepard and Illinois State Rifle Association's opposition to motion to stay mandate for additional 30 days. The motion to stay mandate for additional 30 days is GRANTED. This court's mandate is STAYED until July 9, 2013. No further extensions to stay the court's mandate will be granted. [ # 73 ] JKL [76] [6490976] [12-1269, 12-1788] (CD)
June 4, 2013 75 Filed Response in Opposition by Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard in 12-1788 Attorney Charles J. Cooper to Motion To Stay Mandate for Additional 30 Days. [75][6490876] [12-1788, 12-1269] (Cooper, Charles)
June 4, 2013 74 Filed Response in Opposition by Appellants Peggy Fechter, Charles Hooks, Jon Maier, Michael Moore and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 12-1269 Attorney David G. Sigale to Motion for 30 Day Extension of Stay of Mandate. [74][6490718] [12-1269, 12-1788] (Sigale, David)
June 3, 2013 73 Motion filed by Appellees Hiram Grau and Lisa Madigan in 12-1269, Appellee Lisa Madigan in 12-1788 for stay Mandate For Additional 30 Days. [73] [6490659] [12-1269, 12-1788] (Triebel, Karl)
May 8, 2013 72 Notice from the Supreme Court that a motion for extension of time to file a Petition for Writ of Certiorari has been GRANTED, extending such time to 06/24/2013. [72] [6484717] [12-1269, 12-1788] (JR)
March 14, 2013 71 Filed notice of change of address for William N. Howard. [71] [6471163] [12-1788, 12-1269] (Howard, William)
February 22, 2013 70 Filed opinion of the court DENYING Appellees Hiram Grau and Lisa Madigan in 12-1269, Appellees Tyler R. Edmonds, David Livesay, Lisa Madigan and Patrick J. Quinn in 12-1788 Petition for Rehearing and Petition for Rehearing Enbanc. Frank H. Easterbrook, Chief Judge; Richard A. Posner, Circuit Judge; Joel M. Flaum, Circuit Judge; Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge; Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge, dissenting; Diane P. Wood, Circuit Judge, dissenting; Ann Claire Williams, Circuit Judge, dissenting; Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge; John Daniel Tinder, Circuit Judge and David F. Hamilton, Circuit Judge, dissenting. * Judge Michael S. Kanne did not participate in the consideration of the petition for rehearing en banc. [70] [6466042] [12-1269, 12-1788] (AD)
January 24, 2013 68 Submitted Answer to Petition for Rehearing Enbanc Filed Response in Opposition by Appellants Peggy Fechter, Charles Hooks, Jon Maier, Michael Moore and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 12-1269 Attorney David G. Sigale to Appellees' Petition for Rehearing En Banc. [68][6459227] [12-1269, 12-1788]--[Edited 01/25/2013 by JAD to reflect proper title of document.] (Sigale, David)
January 24, 2013 66 Submitted Filed Response in Opposition by Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard in 12-1788 to State's Petition for Rehearing En Banc. [66][6459004] [12-1269, 12-1788]--[Text edited 01/24/2013 by JR] (Cooper, Charles)
January 23, 2013 69 Filed Answer to Petition for Rehearing by Appellants Peggy Fechter, Charles Hooks, Jon Maier, Michael Moore and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 12-1269. [69] [6459268] Paper copies due on 01/28/2013 [12-1269, 12-1788] (SK)
January 23, 2013 67 Filed Answer to Petition for Rehearing by Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard in 12-1788. [67] [6459040] Paper copies due on 01/28/2013 [12-1269, 12-1788] (SK)
January 23, 2013 65 Brief deficiency letter sent to Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard in 12-1788. [65] [6458916] [12-1269, 12-1788] (SK)
January 23, 2013 64 Brief deficiency letter sent to Appellants Peggy Fechter, Charles Hooks, Jon Maier, Michael Moore and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 12-1269. [64] [6458910] [12-1269, 12-1788] (RT)
January 23, 2013 63 Submitted Filed Response in Opposition by Appellants Peggy Fechter, Charles Hooks, Jon Maier, Michael Moore and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 12-1269 Attorney David G. Sigale to Appellees' Petition for Rehearing En Banc. [63][6458892] [12-1269, 12-1788]--[Text edited 01/24/2013 by JR] (Sigale, David)
January 23, 2013 62 Submitted Filed Response in Opposition by Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard in 12-1788 Attorney Charles J. Cooper to DEFENDANTS-APPELLEES' PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC. [62][6458851] [12-1788, 12-1269]--[Text edited 01/24/2013 by JR] (Cooper, Charles)
January 10, 2013 61 Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Alexander D. Marks for Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence in 12-1269. [61] [6455873] [12-1269, 12-1788] (Marks, Alexander)
January 10, 2013 60 Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Suzanne Loose on behalf of Attorney Jonathan K. Baum for Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence (name of organization revised from Legal Community Against Violence). [60] [6455857] [12-1269, 12-1788]--[Edited 01/10/2013 by CD to reflect attorney and party on attached disclosure statement.] (Loose, Suzanne)
January 10, 2013 59 Amicus brief in support of Petition for Rehearing En Banc filed by Amici Curiae Board of Education of the City of Chicago, CTA and City of Chicago in 12-1269 & 12-1788, per order. Paper copies due on 01/14/2013. Electronically Transmitted. [59] [6455794] [12-1269, 12-1788] (AB)
January 10, 2013 58 Amicus brief in support of Appellees' Petition for Rehearing En Banc filed by Amici Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Ron Davis, Sybrina Fulton, International Brotherhood of Police Officers, MCCA, Tracy Martin and Lucia McBath in 12-1269 & 12-1788, per order. Paper copies due on 01/14/2013. Electronically Transmitted. [58] [6455781] [12-1269, 12-1788] --[Edited 01/10/2013 by AB to reflect proper title of document.] (AB)
January 10, 2013 57 Featured Case ORDER re: 1. Motion for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae in Support of Appellees' Petition for Rehearing En Banc. 2. Motion for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae in Support of Petition for Rehearing En Banc. 3. Motion to Join in Petition for Rehearing En Banc of State Defendants-Appellees. #1 and #2 are GRANTED. The clerk of this court shall file INSTANTER the submitted amicus briefs in support of the petition for rehearing en banc. #3 is GRANTED. Appellee David Livesay is granted leave to join the petition for rehearing en banc filed on January 8, 2013. [ # 55 ]; [ # 52 ] [ # 53 ] BCM [57] [6455655] [12-1269, 12-1788] (SM)
January 9, 2013 56 Sent clerk's copy of request to Appellants Peggy Fechter, Charles Hooks, Jon Maier, Michael Moore and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 12-1269, Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard in 12-1788 requesting 30 copies of their answer to the Petition for Rehearing and Petition for Rehearing Enbanc filed by Appellees Hiram Grau and Lisa Madigan in 12-1269, Appellees Tyler R. Edmonds, Lisa Madigan and Patrick J. Quinn in 12-1788 on 01/08/2013. Answer to Petition for Rehearing due for Appellants Peggy Fechter, Charles Hooks, Jon Maier, Michael Moore, Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated, Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard by 01/23/2013. [6455189] [12-1269, 12-1788] (CD)
January 8, 2013 55 Motion filed by Appellee David Livesay in 12-1788 Motion to Join State Defendents-Appellees Petition for Rehearing En Banc. [55] [6455139] [12-1269, 12-1788] (Bleyer, Joseph)
January 8, 2013 54 Filed Petition for Rehearing and Petition for Rehearing Enbanc by Appellees Hiram Grau and Lisa Madigan in 12-1269, Appellees Tyler R. Edmonds, Lisa Madigan and Patrick J. Quinn in 12-1788. Paper copies due on 01/11/2013 [54] [6455105] [12-1269, 12-1788] (RT)
January 8, 2013 53 Motion filed by Amicus Curiae City of Chicago in 12-1269, 12-1788 to file Brief Amici Curiae of the City of Chicago, Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Board of Ecucation of the City of Chicago, and Chicago Transit Authority. [53] [6455101] [12-1269, 12-1788] (Loose, Suzanne)
January 8, 2013 52 Motion filed by Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence in 12-1269 to file Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Appellees' Petition for Rehearing En Banc. Brief tendered. [52] [6455036] [12-1269, 12-1788]--[Edited 01/08/2013 by AD to reflect brief tendered.] (Marks, Alexander)
January 8, 2013 51 Submitted petition for rehearing enbanc by Karl R. Triebel for Appellees Hiram Grau and Lisa Madigan in 12-1269, Appellees Tyler R. Edmonds, Lisa Madigan and Patrick J. Quinn in 12-1788. [51] [6454965] [12-1269, 12-1788] (Triebel, Karl)
December 26, 2012 50 Filed Bill of Costs by Appellants Peggy Fechter, Charles Hooks, Jon Maier, Michael Moore and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 12-1269 in the amount of $931.90. [50] [6452612] [12-1269, 12-1788]--[Edited 12/27/2012 by FI to reflect correct amount] (Sigale, David)
December 26, 2012 49 Filed Bill of Costs by Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard in 12-1788 in the amount of $834.30. [49] [6452564] [12-1788, 12-1269] (Howard, William)
December 18, 2012 48 Featured Case Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing en banc. The appellees' petition for rehearing, if any, is due by January 8, 2013. No further extensions of time will be allowed. [ # 47 ] BCM [48] [6450820] [12-1269, 12-1788] (FP)
December 17, 2012 47 Motion filed by Appellees Hiram Grau, Lisa Madigan, Tyler R. Edmonds, David Livesay Lisa Madigan and Patrick J. Quinn to extend time to file petition rehearing [47] [6450668] [12-1269, 12-1788]--[Edited 12/18/2012 by JAD to reflect that this motion was not filed by appellee David Livesay.] (Triebel, Karl)
December 11, 2012 46 Featured Case ORDER: Final judgment filed per opinion. With costs: yes. [46] [6449180] [12-1269, 12-1788] (AD)
December 11, 2012 45 Filed opinion of the court by Judge Posner. REVERSED and REMANDED, with directions; mandate stayed for 180 days. Richard A. Posner, Circuit Judge; Joel M. Flaum, Circuit Judge and Ann Claire Williams, Circuit Judge, dissenting. [45] [6449174] [12-1269, 12-1788] (AD)
December 2, 2012 44 Filed Appellants Peggy Fechter, Charles Hooks, Jon Maier, Michael Moore and Second Amendment Foundation, Incorporated in 12-1269 Citation of Additional Authority, per Circuit Rule 28(e). Argument set for: 06/08/2012. [44] [6446880] [12-1269, 12-1788] (Gura, Alan)
November 30, 2012 43 Filed Response by Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard in 12-1788 to Citation of Additional Authority. [43][6446867] [12-1788, 12-1269] (Cooper, Charles)
November 28, 2012 42 Filed Appellees Hiram Grau and Lisa Madigan in 12-1269, Appellees Tyler R. Edmonds, David Livesay, Lisa Madigan and Patrick J. Quinn in 12-1788 Citation of Additional Authority, per Circuit Rule 28(e). [42] [6445928] [12-1269, 12-1788] (Triebel, Karl)
June 28, 2012 Attorney David A. Simpson for Lisa Madigan and Hiram Grau in 12-1269 and Patrick J. Quinn, Lisa Madigan and Tyler R. Edmonds in 12-1788 terminated, pursuant to appearance form filed by atty. Triebel on 6/27/12. [6409128-2] [6409128] [12-1269, 12-1788] (FP)
June 27, 2012 41 Appearance form filed by Attorney Karl R. Triebel for Appellees Hiram Grau and Lisa Madigan in 12-1269, Appellees Tyler R. Edmonds, Lisa Madigan and Patrick J. Quinn in 12-1788. [41] [6408616] [12-1269, 12-1788] (Triebel, Karl)
June 8, 2012 40 Case argued by Mr. Alan Gura for Appellants Michael Moore, Charles Hooks and Peggy Fechter and Karl R. Triebel for Appellees Lisa Madigan and Hiram Grau in 12-1269, Mr. Charles J. Cooper for Appellants Mary E. Shepard and Illinois State Rifle Association and Karl R. Triebel for Appellees Lisa Madigan, Patrick J. Quinn and Tyler R. Edmonds in 12-1788. [40] [6404295] [12-1269, 12-1788] (RS)
June 8, 2012 39 Case heard and taken under advisement by panel: Richard A. Posner, Circuit Judge; Joel M. Flaum, Circuit Judge and Ann Claire Williams, Circuit Judge. [39] [6404293] [12-1269, 12-1788] (RS)
June 4, 2012 38 Featured Case ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders that these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of oral argument and disposition. The appellants and appellees in both cases will share 20 minutes per side. [38] AB [6403075] [12-1269, 12-1788] (CD)
May 23, 2012 37 Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard. Paper copies due on 05/31/2012 Electronically Transmitted. [6400612][37] [12-1788] (RS)
May 23, 2012 36 Submitted appellant reply brief by Charles J. Cooper for Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard. [36] [6400414] [12-1788] (Cooper, Charles)
May 22, 2012 35 Received argument confirmation from Karl R. Triebel for Appellees Tyler R. Edmonds, Lisa Madigan and Patrick J. Quinn. [35] [6399891] [12-1788] (Triebel, Karl)
May 16, 2012 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 AMCI;. The following are those parties to this cause, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: International Brotherhood of Police Officers, Major Cities Chiefs Association, National Association of Women Law Enforcement Executives, and Police Foundation. [6398805-2] [6398805] [12-1788] (RS)
May 16, 2012 34 Amicus brief filed by Amici Curiae National Black Police Association and Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence by consent. Paper copies due on 05/24/2012 Electronically Transmitted. [6398803] [12-1788]--[Edited 05/17/2012 by RS all other parties listed in party limit entry] (RS)
May 16, 2012 33 Submitted brief by Alexander D. Marks for amicus Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, international Brotherhood of Police Officers, Major Cities Cheifs Association, National Association of Women Law Enforcement Executives, National Black Police Association, and Police Foundation. Consent from all parties contained within brief. [33] [6398617] [12-1788] (Marks, Alexander)
May 16, 2012 32 Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Alexander D. Marks for Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, International Brotherhood of Police Officers, Major Cities Chiefs Association, National Association of Women Law Enforcement Executives, National Black Police Association. Additional Parties: Police Foundation. [32] [6398611] [12-1788] (Marks, Alexander)
May 16, 2012 31 Amicus brief filed by Amici Curiae The Major Cities Chiefs Associaton, Legal Community Against Violence and City of Chicago, CTA and Board of Education of the City of Chicago, by consent. Paper copies due on 05/23/2012 Electronically Transmitted.--[Edited 05/17/2012 by RT] (LJ)
May 16, 2012 30 Amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae District of Columbia, Washington D.C. government filing, no consent necessary. Paper copies due on 05/23/2012 Electronically Transmitted. [6398273] [12-1788] (RT)
May 16, 2012 29 Submitted brief by Suzanne M. Loose for amicus City of Chicago, Legal Community Against Violence, Major Cities Chiefs Association, Board of Education of the City of Chicago, Chicago Transportation Authority. Consent from all parties contained within brief. [29] [6398225] [12-1788] (Loose, Suzanne)
May 16, 2012 28 Submitted brief by Todd Kim for amicus District of Columbia. Federal or state filer (consent unnecessary). [28] [6398214] [12-1788] (Kim, Todd)
May 14, 2012 27 Original record on appeal filed electronically. Contents of record : 2 vol. of pleadings. [27] [6397601] [12-1788] (DW)
May 10, 2012 26 Amicus brief filed by Amici Curiae Michael Hall, National Rifle Association of America, Incorporated, Kenneth Pacholski and Kathryn Tyler, per order. Paper copies due on 05/18/2012 Electronically Transmitted. [6396972] [12-1788] (RT)
May 10, 2012 25 Received argument confirmation from Charles J. Cooper for Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard. [25] [6396860] [12-1788] (Cooper, Charles)
May 10, 2012 24 Featured Case Order issued GRANTING Motion to Joint in Brief of Defendants-appellees Lisa Madigan, Hiram Grau, Tyler R. Edmonds & Patrick J. Quinn. Appellee David Livesay may adopt the brief of the appellees filed on May 9, 2012. A copy of this order shall be distributed to the assigned merits panel. [ # 18 ] CMD [6396698] [12-1788] (AD)
May 10, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER issued GRANTING motion for leave to file brief amici curiae of Michael Hall, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler and the National Rifle Association of America, Inc., in support of plaintiffs-appellants. The clerk of this court shall file INSTANTER, and for distribution to the assigned merits panel, the Brief Amici Curiae of Michael Hall, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler and the National Rifle Association of America, Inc., in Support of Plaintiffs-Appellants, submitted on April 18, 2012. [ # 15 ] AIN [23] [6396653] [12-1788] (CD)
May 9, 2012 22 Appellee's brief filed by Appellees Hiram Grau and Lisa Madigan in 12-1269, Appellees Tyler R. Edmonds, Lisa Madigan and Patrick J. Quinn in 12-1788. Paper copies due on 05/17/2012. Electronically Transmitted. [6396572][22] [12-1269, 12-1788] (AB)
May 9, 2012 21 Submitted appellee brief by David A. Simpson for Appellees Tyler R. Edmonds, Lisa Madigan and Patrick J. Quinn. [21] [6396538] [12-1788] (Simpson, David)
May 9, 2012 20 Notice to the District Court to transmit the record on appeal. [20] [6396300] [12-1788] (AB)
May 9, 2012 19 Argument set for Friday, June 8, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 15 minutes. [19] [6396292] [12-1788] (AB)
May 8, 2012 18 Motion filed by Appellee David Livesay to Join in Brief of Defendants-Appellees. [6396191] [12-1788] (Bleyer, Joseph)
April 26, 2012 17 Featured Case Order re: Motions to consolidate and extend time. The motions to consolidate are DENIED. Appellees do not need a formal order of consolidation in order to file one brief addressing two appeals. They may file one brief, or two, at their option. The motions for an extension of time is GRANTED, but only until May 9, 2012 (in both appeals). This should allow enough time to prepare a single brief covering the two cases. Appellees previously told the court that the two suits are functionally identical. There is accordingly no need for time beyond the 30-day extension already granted, and this one-week increment. The courts last regular sitting of the current term is June 8, 2012. If the court were to delay the appellees briefs until June 1 or June 11 (the alternate dates appellees propose), that would postpone oral argument until next September, an unnecessary delay. Appellees must file their brief (or briefs) in both cases by May 9, and appellants their reply briefs by May 23. That will permit oral argument the last week of May or the first full week of June. [ # 6391924-3 ] [ # 16 ] [ # 6391924-2 ] [ # 16 ] JKL [6392901] [12-1269, 12-1788] (AM)
April 23, 2012 16 Motion filed by Appellees Tyler R. Edmonds, Lisa Madigan and Patrick J. Quinn to extend time to file appellee brief., to consolidate cases. [6391925] [12-1788] (Simpson, David)
April 18, 2012 15 Filed Non-Party Motion for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae by Michael Hall, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler and the National Rifle Association of America, Inc. [6390921] [12-1788]--[Edited 04/19/2012 by KL to reflect amici curiae brief tendered.] (Koukoutchos, Brian)
April 18, 2012 14 Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Brian Koukoutchos for Michael Hall, Kenneth Pacholski, Kathryn Tyler and the National Rifle Association of America, Inc. [14] [6390918] [12-1788] (Koukoutchos, Brian)
April 13, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER: 1. Motion to stay briefing and hold appeal in abeyance, filed on 4/9/12. 2. Plaintiffs' motion to schedule oral argument together with a related case, filed on 4/11/12. The motion to stay briefing is DENIED. Further, the motion to schedule oral argument together is GRANTED. The clerk of this court will schedule this appeal for argument on the same day, and before the same panel, as the argument in appeal no. 12-1269. [ # 3 ][ # 3 ] [ # 11 ] AIN [6389704] [12-1788] (FP)
April 11, 2012 12 Appellant's brief filed by Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/11/2012 for Tyler R. Edmonds, David Livesay, Lisa Madigan and Patrick J. Quinn. Paper copies due on 04/18/2012 Electronically Transmitted. [6389030][12] [12-1788] (LJ)
April 11, 2012 11 Filed Response in Opposition by Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard Attorney Charles J. Cooper to Motion to Stay Briefing and Hold Appeal in Abeyance and motion to schedule oral argument together with related case. [6388960] [12-1788] (Cooper, Charles)
April 11, 2012 10 Submitted appellant brief by Charles J. Cooper for Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard. [10] [6388956] [12-1788] (Cooper, Charles)
April 10, 2012 9 Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Charles J. Cooper for Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard. [9] [6388859] [12-1788]--[Edited 04/11/2012 by JAD to add atty Cooper to the docket.] (Cooper, Charles)
April 10, 2012 8 Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Joseph A. Bleyer for Appellee David Livesay. [8] [6388849] [12-1788] (Bleyer, Joseph)
April 10, 2012 7 Appearance form filed by Attorney Joseph A. Bleyer for Appellee David Livesay. [7] [6388846] [12-1788] (Bleyer, Joseph)
April 10, 2012 6 Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney William N. Howard for Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard. [6] [6388834] [12-1788] (Howard, William)
April 10, 2012 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard. [5] [6388833] [12-1788] (Howard, William)
April 9, 2012 4 Docketing statement filed by Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [6388512] [12-1788] (Howard, William)
April 9, 2012 3 Motion filed by Appellees Tyler R. Edmonds, Lisa Madigan and Patrick J. Quinn to stay briefing and hold appeal in abeyance. [6388448] [12-1788] (Simpson, David)
April 4, 2012 2 Appearance form filed by Attorney David A. Simpson for Appellees Tyler R. Edmonds, Lisa Madigan and Patrick J. Quinn. [Edited by ATM to reflect addition of attorney Simpson and termination of attorney Hughes] [2] [6387259] [12-1788] (Simpson, David)
April 3, 2012 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 04/17/2012. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Illinois State Rifle Association, Mary E. Shepard by 04/09/2012. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/14/2012 for Illinois State Rifle Association and Mary E. Shepard. [1] [6386977] [12-1788] (AD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mary Shepard, et al v. Lisa Madigan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ILLINOIS STATE RIFLE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Represented By: William N. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY E. SHEPARD
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Represented By: William N. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID LIVESAY, in his official capacity as Sheriff of Union County, Illinois
Represented By: Joseph A. Bleyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICK J. QUINN, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Illinois
Represented By: Karl R. Triebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TYLER R. EDMONDS, in his official capacity as the State's Attorney of Union County, Illinois
Represented By: Karl R. Triebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA MADIGAN, in her official capacity as Illinois Attorney General
Represented By: Karl R. Triebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF POLICE OFFICERS
Represented By: Alexander David Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SYBRINA FULTON
Represented By: Alexander David Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KENNETH PACHOLSKI
Represented By: Brian S. Koukoutchos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHICAGO TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By: Stephen L. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LUCIA MCBATH, parent of Jordan Davis
Represented By: Alexander David Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TRACY MARTIN
Represented By: Alexander David Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL HALL
Represented By: Brian S. Koukoutchos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL BLACK POLICE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Alexander David Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Alexander David Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KATHRYN TYLER
Represented By: Brian S. Koukoutchos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, WASHINGTON D.C.
Represented By: Todd Sunhwae Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MAJOR CITIES CHIEFS ASSOCIATON
Represented By: Jonathan Klee Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEGAL COMMUNITY AGAINST VIOLENCE
Represented By: Jonathan Klee Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Suzanne M. Loose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Suzanne M. Loose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Brian S. Koukoutchos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RON DAVIS
Represented By: Alexander David Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?