Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. v. Volvo Trucks North America
Defendant / Appellee: VOLVO TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA, a division of Volvo Group North America, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANDY MOHR TRUCK CENTER, INC.
Case Number: 16-2839
Filed: June 30, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2018 Filing 98 Original record returned to the District Court. Entire record returned consisting of 59 sealed documents on CD. [98] [6939339] [16-2788, 16-2839] (GW) [Entered: 07/19/2018 11:52 AM]
October 11, 2017 Filing 97 Mandate issued.. Record to be returned later 59 sealed documents on CD. [97] [6875507] [16-2788, 16-2839] (FP) [Entered: 10/11/2017 12:26 PM]
October 11, 2017 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 08/28/2017 Opinion, Final Order, PFR denial order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [6875526-2] [6875526] [16-2788, 16-2839] (FP) [Entered: 10/11/2017 12:39 PM]
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839 Petition for Rehearing and Petition for Rehearing Enbanc is DENIED. [96] [6873547] [16-2788, 16-2839] (VG) [Entered: 10/03/2017 01:57 PM]
September 11, 2017 Filing 95 Filed Petition for Rehearing and Petition for Rehearing Enbanc by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. Paper copies due on 09/14/2017 [95] [6868165] [16-2788, 16-2839] (CCG) [Entered: 09/12/2017 09:12 AM]
September 11, 2017 Filing 94 Submitted petition for rehearing enbanc by Robert D. MacGill for Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. [94] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6868147] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 09/11/2017 07:56 PM]
September 11, 2017 Filing 93 Submitted petition for rehearing enbanc by Robert D. MacGill for Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. [93] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6868139] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 09/11/2017 05:11 PM]
August 28, 2017 Filing 92 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation. ATTACHED. [92] [16-2788, 16-2839] (BF) [Entered: 08/28/2017 03:03 PM]
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: Final judgment filed per opinion. Each party is to bear its own costs on appeal. [91] [6864596] [16-2788, 16-2839] (AP) [Entered: 08/28/2017 12:11 PM]
August 28, 2017 Filing 90 Filed opinion of the court by Judge Wood. We REVERSE the denial of judgment as a matter of law for Volvo, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(b), for the unfair discrimination claim that went to trial, and order that judgment be entered in Volvos favor on this part of the case. We AFFIRM the courts summary judgment in Mohrs favor on the new-facility claim, and we AFFIRM its judgment under Rule 12(c) in Volvos favor on the Mack claim. Diane P. Wood, Chief Judge; Joel M. Flaum, Circuit Judge and David F. Hamilton, Circuit Judge. [90] [6864589] [16-2788, 16-2839] (AP) [Entered: 08/28/2017 12:08 PM]
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER issued GRANTING Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance of Justin D. Rumer. [ # 88 ] Attorney Justin D. Rumer is granted leave to withdraw his appearance on behalf of the appellee/cross-appellant. Attorney Robert D. MacGill shall continue to serve as counsel of record for the appellee/cross-appellant. JKL [89] [6842714] [16-2788, 16-2839] (AD) [Entered: 05/22/2017 02:53 PM]
May 22, 2017 Filing 88 Motion filed by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839 to withdraw as counsel [88] [6842539] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Rumer, Justin) [Entered: 05/22/2017 10:37 AM]
April 5, 2017 Filing 87 Case argued by Mr. Thomas David Warren for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America and Mr. Robert Dean MacGill for Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Mr. Robert Dean MacGill for Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. and Mr. Thomas David Warren for Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [87] [6831577] [16-2788, 16-2839] (RT) [Entered: 04/05/2017 10:25 AM]
April 5, 2017 Filing 86 Case heard and taken under advisement by panel: Diane P. Wood, Chief Judge; Joel M. Flaum, Circuit Judge and David F. Hamilton, Circuit Judge. [86] [6831575] [16-2788, 16-2839] (RT) [Entered: 04/05/2017 10:24 AM]
March 27, 2017 Filing 85 Received argument confirmation from Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [85] [6829123] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 03/27/2017 05:43 PM]
March 27, 2017 Filing 84 Received argument confirmation from Robert D. MacGill for Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. [84] [6828926] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 03/27/2017 01:28 PM]
March 13, 2017 Filing 83 Filed Notice of Public Versions of Trial Court Docket by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [83] [6825480] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 03/13/2017 07:25 PM]
March 9, 2017 Filing 82 Supplemental paper record on appeal filed. Contents of record : 59 sealed documents on CD. [82] [6824439] [16-2788, 16-2839] (SP) [Entered: 03/09/2017 11:34 AM]
March 9, 2017 Filing 81 Filed electronic transcript of proceedings held on 07/06/15. 07/28/15, 08/10/15, 08/11/15, 08/12/15, 08/13/15, 08/14/15, 08/17/15. [81] [6824436] THIS TRANSCRIPT IS FOR INTERNAL COURT USE ONLY. Remote electronic access to the transcript is ONLY available through the District Court's PACER system. [16-2788, 16-2839] (SP) [Entered: 03/09/2017 11:28 AM]
March 8, 2017 Filing 80 Supplemental record on appeal filed electronically. Contents of record : 12 vol. of Oversized Documents. [80] [6824127] [16-2788, 16-2839] (SP) [Entered: 03/08/2017 12:31 PM]
March 8, 2017 Filing 79 Supplemental record on appeal filed electronically. Contents of record : 29 vol. of Oversized Documents. [79] [6824084] [16-2788, 16-2839] (SP) [Entered: 03/08/2017 11:14 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 78 Supplemental record on appeal filed electronically. Contents of record : 29 vol. of pleadings. [78] [6823811] [16-2788, 16-2839] (SP) [Entered: 03/07/2017 11:15 AM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 77 Original record returned to the District Court. Entire record returned consisting of : 1 CD containing pleadings, sealed documents, oversized documents and transcripts. [77] [6823347] [16-2788, 16-2839] (RT) [Entered: 03/06/2017 11:43 AM]
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER re: 1. Appellant's unopposed motion to maintain under seal portions of the jury trial court record and to return the unredacted jury verdict from the district court. 2. Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc.'s motion to maintain dkt. nos. 1-1 and 1-2 from the district court under seal. 3. Supplement to Volvo's unopposed motion to maintain under seal portions of the trial court record and to return the unredacted jury verdict from the district court. The district court has transmitted the record on appeal to this court on a single CD that includes both sealed and unsealed materials, and the parties ask this court to maintain certain documents on the CD under seal in this court. In order to permit the remaining documents to be placed in the public record, the clerk of this court shall return the CD with the record to the district court, and the district court shall resend the record on two separate CDs, one containing the documents to be placed in the public record and the other containing only the documents to be maintained under seal in this court. Because oral argument in this appeal is scheduled for April 5, 2017, it is requested that the district court retransmit the record before that date. Specifically, the parties' motions to maintain certain documents under seal are GRANTED to the extent that the CD containing the documents to be kept under seal in this court shall include: Docs. 1-1 & 1-2, Docs. 91-7 & 91-8, Doc. 166-1, Docs. 207-1 to 207-5, Doc. 211, Doc. 226, Docs. 228-3 to 228-7, Doc. 230, Doc. 258, Doc. 259, Doc. 286, Docs. 287-1 & 287-2, Doc. 314, Doc. 316-23, Doc. 324, Doc. 327, Doc. 332, Doc. 334-20, Doc. 354, Docs. 356-1 to 356-6, Doc. 390, Doc. 416, Doc. 418, Doc. 431, Doc. 459, Doc. 464, Doc. 466, Doc. 473, Doc. 476-1, Doc. 513, and Doc. 525. The CD containing the public documents shall include, in addition to other public documents previously included in the record on appeal, the following redacted documents: Doc. 25-1, Doc. 239, Doc. 246, Doc. 262, Doc. 281-1, Doc. 358, and Doc. 359. The district court also shall include on this CD Doc. 455, which shall not be kept under seal in this court. The district court need not resend Doc. 504 with the record. Appellant/Cross-Appellee Volvo Trucks North America shall submit public versions of the following documents with all sensitive pricing information and names and personal information of venire members redacted: Docs. 91-7 & 91-8, Doc. 166-1, Docs. 207-1-to 207-5, Doc. 211, Doc. 416, Doc. 459, Doc. 464, Doc. 466, Doc. 473, Doc. 476-1, and Doc. 513. The redacted versions should be submitted no later than March 13, 2017. [ # 67 ] [ # 66 ] [ # 70 ] SHC [76] [6821795] [16-2788, 16-2839] (CR) [Entered: 02/27/2017 03:21 PM]
February 21, 2017 Filing 75 Filed Response by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839 to Volvo's Citation of Additional Authority of 2/9/2017. [75][6820394] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 02/21/2017 04:37 PM]
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order issued DENYING appellant's first motion to reschedule oral argument and notice regarding oral argument rescheduling. [ # 73 ] in 16-2788 CF [74] [6819896] [16-2788, 16-2839] (RS) [Entered: 02/17/2017 03:59 PM]
February 16, 2017 Filing 73 Motion filed by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839 to reschedule oral argument. [73] [6819394] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 02/16/2017 12:17 PM]
February 15, 2017 Filing 72 Argument set for Wednesday, April 5, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 25 minutes. [72] [6819070] [16-2788, 16-2839] (RS) [Entered: 02/15/2017 11:31 AM]
February 9, 2017 Filing 71 Filed Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839 Citation of Additional Authority, per Circuit Rule 28(e). [71] [6817891] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 02/09/2017 05:39 PM]
February 6, 2017 Filing 70 Motion Supplement filed by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839 Supplement to Motion to Maintain Under Seal Portions of the Trial Court Record. [70] [6816772] [16-2788, 16-2839]--[Edited 02/07/2017 by FP to reflect correct document type.] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 02/06/2017 06:17 PM]
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re: Appellant's unopposed motion to maintain under seal portions of the trial court record and to return the unredacted jury verdict form the district court. The appellant/cross-appellee shall SUPPLEMENT its motion to explain, for each of the 30 documents it wishes to keep under seal, the following: (1) for which of the documents have the parties already submitted redacted versions in the district court, (2) where each of the redacted versions is located in the district court docket and whether it is included in the record on appeal, and (3) for any document the parties have not already submitted redacted versions, whether it would be possible to do so. The supplement is due by Monday, February 6. SHC [69] [6814623] [16-2788, 16-2839] (CR) [Entered: 01/27/2017 10:07 AM]
January 26, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE: Attorney Mr. Robert Dean MacGill for Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788 will not be available for oral argument February 22-24 February 27 March 9-10 March 13-16 March 21-22 May 22-26. [68] [6814307] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 01/26/2017 10:27 AM]
January 20, 2017 Attorney Elliot Daniel Morrison for Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788 and Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839 terminated, pursuant to telephonic notification from counsel. [6812937-2] [6812937] [16-2788, 16-2839] (CMD) [Entered: 01/20/2017 09:12 AM]
January 17, 2017 Filing 67 Motion filed by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839 To Maintain Certain Portions of the Trial Record Under Seal. [67] [6812052] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 01/17/2017 03:34 PM]
January 17, 2017 Filing 66 Motion by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839 to seal Portions of the Trial Court Record. [66] [6812020] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 01/17/2017 03:22 PM]
January 11, 2017 Filing 65 Reply brief in Cross Appeal filed by Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc... Paper copies due on 01/18/2017 Electronically Transmitted. [65] [6810929] [16-2839] (RS) [Entered: 01/11/2017 03:55 PM]
January 11, 2017 Filing 64 Filed Reply by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839 to Reply on Cross-Appeal. [64][6810897] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 01/11/2017 03:24 PM]
January 4, 2017 Filing 63 Filed Notice Regarding Oral Argument Rescheduling by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [63] [6809086] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 01/04/2017 03:40 PM]
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: GRANTING first motion to move oral argument [ # 60 ] in 16-2788 The argument in this appeal set for 02/22/2017 is VACATED. CF [6808555] [16-2788, 16-2839] (RS) [Entered: 01/03/2017 11:25 AM]
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: This Court has received electronic files under seal from the district court. All documents filed in this Court, except those required to be sealed by statute or rule are considered public. Pursuant to 7th Circuit Operating Procedure 10(b), documents sealed in the district court will be maintained under seal in this Court for 14 days, to afford time to request the approval required by section (a) of this operating procedure. Absent a motion from a party these sealed documents will be placed in the public record on 01/18/2017. Motion shall be filed by 01/17/2017 [61] [6808526] [16-2788, 16-2839] (RT) [Entered: 01/03/2017 10:46 AM]
December 30, 2016 Filing 60 Motion filed by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839 to reschedule oral argument. [60] [6808299] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 12/30/2016 11:44 AM]
December 30, 2016 Filing 59 Original record on appeal filed. Contents of record : 1 CD containing pleadings, sealed documents, oversized documents and transcripts [59] [6808288] [16-2788, 16-2839] (SK) [Entered: 12/30/2016 11:20 AM]
December 29, 2016 Filing 58 Argument set for Wednesday, February 22, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 25 minutes. [58] [6808068] [16-2788, 16-2839] (RS) [Entered: 12/29/2016 02:03 PM]
December 19, 2016 Filing 57 SEALED Supplemental Appendix filed by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [57] [6806082] Paper copies due on 12/28/2016 [16-2788, 16-2839] (AB) [Entered: 12/21/2016 10:42 AM]
December 19, 2016 Filing 56 Filed REDACTED Supplemental Appendix by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [56] [6806081] Paper copies due on 12/28/2016 [16-2788, 16-2839] (AB) [Entered: 12/21/2016 10:41 AM]
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re: Appellant's motion to seal portions of the supplemental appendix. The appellant may file a supplemental appendix. The motion to seal the supplemental appendix is GRANTED. The clerk of this court shall file INSTANTER the unredacted version of the supplemental appendix under seal and shall publicly file the redacted version. [ # 47 ] SHC [55] [6805524] [16-2788, 16-2839] (CR) [Entered: 12/19/2016 02:57 PM]
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's reply, cross-appellee brief. [ # 49 ] Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due on or before 01/11/2017 for Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. CMD [54] [6805266] [16-2788, 16-2839] (CMD) [Entered: 12/16/2016 04:34 PM]
December 16, 2016 Filing 53 Notice to the District Court to transmit the record on appeal. [53] [6805080] [16-2788, 16-2839] (RS) [Entered: 12/16/2016 11:32 AM]
December 15, 2016 Filing 51 Re-Submitted appellant reply/cross-appellee brief by Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [51] [6804743] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 12/15/2016 11:12 AM]
December 14, 2016 Filing 52 Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief filed by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839.. Paper copies due on 12/27/2016 Electronically Transmitted. [52] [6804981] [16-2788, 16-2839]-- (RS) [Entered: 12/16/2016 08:52 AM]
December 14, 2016 Filing 50 Brief deficiency letter sent to Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [50] [6804688] [16-2788, 16-2839] (RS) [Entered: 12/15/2016 09:13 AM]
December 14, 2016 Filing 49 Motion filed by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839 to extend time to file appellee reply in cross-appeal brief. [49] [6804641] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 12/14/2016 07:57 PM]
December 14, 2016 Filing 48 Submitted appellant reply/cross-appellee brief by Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [48] [6804635] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 12/14/2016 05:48 PM]
December 14, 2016 Filing 47 Motion by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839 to seal Supplemental Appendix. [47] [6804612] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 12/14/2016 04:27 PM]
November 9, 2016 Filing 46 CORRECTED SEALED Appellee Cross-Appellant brief filed by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839.. Electronically Transmitted. [46] [6796503] Paper copies due on 11/16/2016 [16-2788, 16-2839] (LJ) [Entered: 11/09/2016 09:45 AM]
November 9, 2016 Filing 45 CORRECTED REDACTED Appellee Cross-Appellant brief filed by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839.. Paper copies due on 11/16/2016 Electronically Transmitted. [45] [6796502] [16-2788, 16-2839] (LJ) [Entered: 11/09/2016 09:43 AM]
November 8, 2016 Filing 44 Re-Submitted Redacted appellee/cross-appellant brief by Robert D. MacGill for Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. [44] [6796393] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 11/08/2016 03:42 PM]
November 8, 2016 Filing 43 Re-Submitted sealed appellee/cross-appellant brief by Robert D. MacGill for Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. Permission to submit a sealed brief was granted 10/18/2016. [43] [6796388] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 11/08/2016 03:40 PM]
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: The brief of appellee/cross-appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. is STRICKEN. It must file a new brief on or before November 10, 2016, which contains a jurisdictional statement that complies with all the requirements of both Circuit Rules 28(a) and (b). Counsel for Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. are reminded that they may not change any other portion of the brief. DW [42] [6795596] [16-2788, 16-2839] (AD) [Entered: 11/04/2016 03:24 PM]
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re: Motion for extension of time. The motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file their combined reply brief, if any, in the main appeal and responsive brief in the crossappeal on or before December 14, 2016. Plaintiff shall file its reply brief, if any, in the crossappeal on or before December 28, 2016. [ # 40 ] CMD [41] [6792784] [16-2788, 16-2839] (AP) [Entered: 10/25/2016 03:31 PM]
October 25, 2016 Filing 40 Motion filed by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839 to extend time to file appellant reply/cross-appellee brief. [40] [6792623] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 10/25/2016 11:07 AM]
October 18, 2016 Filing 39 SEALED Appendix filed by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. per order [39] [6791794] Paper copies due on 10/28/2016 [16-2788, 16-2839] (RS) [Entered: 10/21/2016 10:54 AM]
October 18, 2016 Filing 38 SEALED Appellee Cross-Appellant brief filed by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839.. Electronically Transmitted. [38] [6791790] Paper copies due on 10/28/2016. per order. [16-2788, 16-2839]--[Edited 11/04/2016 by AD] STRICKEN, per the court's 11/4/16 order. (RS) [Entered: 10/21/2016 10:52 AM]
October 18, 2016 Filing 37 Filed Appendix Vol 2 by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. [37] [6791781] Paper copies due on 10/28/2016 [16-2788, 16-2839]--[Edited 10/21/2016 by RS]--[Edited 10/21/2016 by RS] (RS) [Entered: 10/21/2016 10:30 AM]
October 18, 2016 Filing 36 Filed Appendix Vol 1 by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. [36] [6791780] Paper copies due on 10/28/2016 [16-2788, 16-2839]--[Edited 10/21/2016 by RS]--[Edited 10/21/2016 by RS] (RS) [Entered: 10/21/2016 10:26 AM]
October 18, 2016 Filing 35 Redacted Appellee Cross-Appellant brief filed by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839.. Electronically Transmitted. Paper copies due on 10/28/2016 [35] [6791774] [16-2788, 16-2839]--[Edited 11/04/2016 by AD] STRICKEN, per the court's 11/4/16 order. (RS) [Entered: 10/21/2016 10:22 AM]
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: 1. Motion to seal portions of its opening brief and appendix, filed on 10/14/16. 2. Appellees motion to seal portions of its opening brief and accompanying appendix in conjunction with motion to seal orignally filed as document 30, filed on 10/14/16. The motion is GRANTED. The clerk of this court shall file INSTANTER the unredacted version of appellee's brief and appendix under seal. [ # 31 ] [ # 30 ] SHC [34] [6790989] [16-2788, 16-2839] (FP) [Entered: 10/18/2016 01:38 PM]
October 14, 2016 Filing 33 Submitted Appendix by Robert D. MacGill for Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. [33] [6790373] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 10/14/2016 06:19 PM]
October 14, 2016 Filing 32 Submitted Redacted appellee/cross-appellant brief by Robert D. MacGill for Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. [32] [6790372] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 10/14/2016 06:17 PM]
October 14, 2016 Filing 31 Motion by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839 to seal Appendix, in conjunction with Motion to Seal originally filed as Document 30.. [31] [6790371] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 10/14/2016 06:12 PM]
October 14, 2016 Filing 30 Motion by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839 to seal brief and appendix. [30] [6790369] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 10/14/2016 05:15 PM]
September 19, 2016 Filing 29 SEALED Appendix filed by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America. [29] [6783580] Paper copies due on 09/26/2016 [16-2788] (GW) [Entered: 09/19/2016 02:24 PM]
September 19, 2016 Filing 28 SEALED Appellant's brief on main appeal filed by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America.. Electronically Transmitted. [28] [6783578] Paper copies due on 09/26/2016 [16-2788] (GW) [Entered: 09/19/2016 02:22 PM]
September 19, 2016 Filing 27 INSTANTER ORDER re: Appellant's Motion to Seal Portions of the Opening Brief and Accompanying Appendix. The motion is GRANTED. The clerk of this court shall file INSTANTER the unredacted version of appellant's opening brief and appendix under seal. SHC [ # 15 ] [27] [6783374] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MM) [Entered: 09/19/2016 08:19 AM]
September 15, 2016 Filing 24 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David R. Jarrett for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [24] [6782887] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [16-2788, 16-2839]--[Edited 09/15/2016 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Jarrett, David) [Entered: 09/15/2016 02:34 PM]
September 15, 2016 Filing 23 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Billy M. Donley for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [23] [6782880] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [16-2788, 16-2839]--[Edited 09/15/2016 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Donley, Billy) [Entered: 09/15/2016 02:29 PM]
September 15, 2016 Filing 22 Re-Submitted appellant brief by Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [22] [6782863] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 09/15/2016 01:57 PM]
September 15, 2016 Filing 21 Re-Submitted sealed appellant brief by Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. Permission to submit a sealed brief was granted 09/14/2016. [21] [6782861] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 09/15/2016 01:55 PM]
September 15, 2016 Filing 20 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney G. Karl Fanter for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [20] [6782814] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [16-2788, 16-2839]--[Edited 09/15/2016 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Fanter, Guenther) [Entered: 09/15/2016 12:42 PM]
September 15, 2016 Filing 19 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Elliot D. Morrison for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [19] [6782806] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [16-2788, 16-2839]--[Edited 09/15/2016 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Morrison, Elliot) [Entered: 09/15/2016 12:37 PM]
September 14, 2016 Filing 26 Filed Appendix by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America. [26] [6782955] Paper copies due on 09/22/2016 [16-2788] (GW) [Entered: 09/15/2016 03:59 PM]
September 14, 2016 Filing 25 Appellant's brief on main appeal filed by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America. Paper copies due on 09/22/2016 Electronically Transmitted. [25] [6782954] [16-2788] (GW) [Entered: 09/15/2016 03:58 PM]
September 14, 2016 Filing 18 Brief deficiency letter sent to Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [18] [6782649] [16-2788, 16-2839] (GW) [Entered: 09/15/2016 09:11 AM]
September 14, 2016 Filing 17 Submitted Redacted appellant brief by Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [17] [6782596] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 09/14/2016 04:18 PM]
September 14, 2016 Filing 16 Submitted sealed appellant brief by Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. Permission to submit a sealed brief was granted 09/14/2016. [16] [6782593] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 09/14/2016 04:15 PM]
September 14, 2016 Filing 15 Motion by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839 to seal Opening Brief and Appendix. [15] [6782589] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 09/14/2016 04:11 PM]
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Main appeal brief due on or before 09/14/2016 for Volvo Trucks North America. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 10/14/2016 for Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc.. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 11/14/2016 for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 11/28/2016 for Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. JB [6771251] [16-2788, 16-2839]--[Edited 08/01/2016 by CD to correct deadlines.] (FP) [Entered: 07/28/2016 10:08 AM]
July 18, 2016 Filing 13 Added Attorney(s) Justin David Rumer for party(s) Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc., in case 16-2788 Attorney(s) Justin David Rumer for party(s) Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc., in case 16-2839 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Justin D. Rumer for Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. [13] [6768136] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [16-2788, 16-2839]--[Edited 07/18/2016 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Rumer, Justin) [Entered: 07/18/2016 04:27 PM]
July 18, 2016 Filing 12 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Alexander P. Orlowski for Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. [12] [6768102] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [16-2788, 16-2839] (Orlowski, Alexander) [Entered: 07/18/2016 04:10 PM]
July 18, 2016 Filing 11 Added Attorney(s) Robert Dean MacGill for party(s) Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc., in case 16-2788 Attorney(s) Robert Dean MacGill for party(s) Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc., in case 16-2839 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jessica M. Lindemann for Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. [11] [6768096] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [16-2788, 16-2839]--[Edited 07/18/2016 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Lindemann, Jessica) [Entered: 07/18/2016 04:05 PM]
July 18, 2016 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert D. MacGill for Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. [10] [6768092] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 07/18/2016 04:02 PM]
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file brief. [ # 8 ], Main appeal brief due on or before 09/14/2016 for Volvo Trucks North America. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 10/14/2016 for Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc.. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 11/14/2016 for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 11/28/2016 for Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. CMD [9] [6766726] [16-2788, 16-2839] (CR) [Entered: 07/13/2016 12:10 PM]
July 13, 2016 Filing 8 Motion filed by Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839 to extend time to file appellant brief. [8] [6766657] [16-2788, 16-2839] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 07/13/2016 10:44 AM]
July 12, 2016 Filing 7 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc.. [7] [6766522] [16-2839] (AD) [Entered: 07/12/2016 04:03 PM]
July 12, 2016 Filing 6 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellee Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2788, Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. in 16-2839. [6] [6766513] [16-2788, 16-2839] (MacGill, Robert) [Entered: 07/12/2016 03:49 PM]
July 7, 2016 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas D. Warren for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2788, Appellee Volvo Trucks North America in 16-2839. [5] [6765444] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [16-2788, 16-2839]--[Edited 07/07/2016 by FP to reflect that atty. Riley is termed and atty. Warren is added to the docket.] (Warren, Thomas) [Entered: 07/07/2016 04:27 PM]
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Main appeal brief due on or before 08/15/2016 for Volvo Trucks North America. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 09/14/2016 for Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc.. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 10/14/2016 for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 10/28/2016 for Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. JB [6764318] [16-2788, 16-2839] (CMD) [Entered: 07/01/2016 04:32 PM]
July 1, 2016 Filing 3 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 settlement conference issued. The conference will be conducted by phone, Thursday, July 14, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [3] [6764316] [16-2788, 16-2839] (CMD) [Entered: 07/01/2016 04:29 PM]
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The court orders these appeals CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition: Main appeal brief due on or before 08/08/2016 for Volvo Trucks North America. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 09/07/2016 for Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 10/07/2016 for Appellant Volvo Trucks North America. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 10/21/2016 for Appellant Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. DW [2] [6764259] [16-2788, 16-2839] (CMD) [Entered: 07/01/2016 02:46 PM]
June 30, 2016 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 07/14/2016. Appellant's brief due on or before 08/09/2016 for Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. [1] [6763882] [16-2839] (VG) [Entered: 06/30/2016 03:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Andy Mohr Truck Center, Inc. v. Volvo Trucks North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VOLVO TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA, a division of Volvo Group North America, LLC
Represented By: James W. Riley Jr.
Represented By: Billy Martin Donley
Represented By: Thomas David Warren
Represented By: David R. Jarrett
Represented By: Guenther Karl Fanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANDY MOHR TRUCK CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Robert Dean MacGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?