Frederick Cashner, Jr. v. John Widup, et al
Plaintiff - Appellant: FREDERICK C. CASHNER, JR.
Defendant - Appellee: JOHN J. WIDUP, Warden, Porter County Jail, NADIR H. AL-SHAMI, Doctor and KIMBERLY WHITE, Head Nurse, Porter County Jail
Case Number: 17-1079
Filed: January 12, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 28, 2017 Frederick Cashner, Jr. v. John Widup
November 29, 2017 Summary Frederick Cashner, Jr. v. John Widup
November 30, 2017 Frederick Cashner, Jr. v. John Widup

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 703118700 Filed Nonprecedential Disposition PER CURIAM. AFFIRMED. Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; Daniel A. Manion, Circuit Judge and Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge. [6886957-1] [6886957] [17-1079]
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 703117763 ORDER: The nonprecedential disposition and judgment dated November 28, 2017, are VACATED as improvidently issued. This appeal remains under consideration by the court. JR [6886563-1] [6886563] [17-1079]
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 703116980 Filed Nonprecedential Disposition PER CURIAM. AFFIRMED. Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; Daniel A. Manion, Circuit Judge and Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge. [6886266-1] [6886266] [17-1079]--[Edited 11/29/2017 by AP- VACATED per the court's 11/29/17 order]
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Frederick Cashner, Jr. v. John Widup, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: FREDERICK C. CASHNER, JR.
Represented By: Frederick C. Cashner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: JOHN J. WIDUP, Warden, Porter County Jail
Represented By: Byron D. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: NADIR H. AL-SHAMI, Doctor
Represented By: Carol A. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: KIMBERLY WHITE, Head Nurse, Porter County Jail
Represented By: Carol A. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?