David McDaniel v. Progress Rail Locomotive, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID MCDANIEL
Defendant / Appellee: PROGRESS RAIL LOCOMOTIVE, INC.
Case Number: 18-3565
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 32 Mandate issued. No record to be returned. [32] [7040638] [18-3565] (CAH) [Entered: 10/31/2019 11:44 AM]
October 31, 2019 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 10/09/2019 Opinion with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7040644-2] [7040644] [18-3565] (CAH) [Entered: 10/31/2019 11:49 AM]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Final judgment filed per opinion. With costs: yes. [31] [7035600] [18-3565] (AG) [Entered: 10/09/2019 09:38 AM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 30 Filed opinion of the court by Judge St. Eve. The judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED. Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge; Michael Y. Scudder, Circuit Judge and Amy J. St. Eve, Circuit Judge. [30] [7035597] [18-3565] (AG) [Entered: 10/09/2019 09:34 AM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 29 Case argued by Mr. Robert D. Sweeney for Appellant David McDaniel and Mr. David Lawrence Schenberg for Appellee Progress Rail Locomotive, Inc.. [29] [7027912] [18-3565] (MAN) [Entered: 09/04/2019 01:24 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 28 Case heard and taken under advisement by panel: Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge; Michael Y. Scudder, Circuit Judge and Amy J. St. Eve, Circuit Judge. [28] [7027911] [18-3565] (MAN) [Entered: 09/04/2019 01:24 PM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 27 Received argument confirmation per argument email form for Attorney Mr. Robert D. Sweeney for Appellant David McDaniel. [27] [7026338] [18-3565] (CAH) [Entered: 08/27/2019 03:22 PM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 26 Received argument confirmation per argument email form for Attorney Mr. David Lawrence Schenberg for Appellee Progress Rail Locomotive, Inc.. [26] [7026182] [18-3565] (CAH) [Entered: 08/27/2019 10:49 AM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 25 Received argument confirmation from David L. Schenberg for Appellee Progress Rail Locomotive, Inc.. [25] [7022334] [18-3565] (Schenberg, David) [Entered: 08/07/2019 04:56 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 24 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David L. Schenberg for Appellee Progress Rail Locomotive, Inc.. [24] [7021024] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [18-3565] [Edited 08/02/2019 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Schenberg, David) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:29 AM]
June 13, 2019 Filing 23 Argument set for Wednesday, September 4, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 15 minutes. [23] [7011187] [18-3565] (DRS) [Entered: 06/13/2019 03:14 PM]
June 10, 2019 Filing 22 Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellant David McDaniel. Paper copies due on 06/18/2019. Electronically Transmitted. [22] [7010400] [18-3565] (CM) [Entered: 06/11/2019 09:41 AM]
June 10, 2019 Filing 21 Resubmitted reply brief by Robert D. Sweeney for Appellant David McDaniel. NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [21] [7010348] [18-3565] (Sweeney, Robert) [Entered: 06/10/2019 09:29 PM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 Brief deficiency letter sent to Appellant David McDaniel. [20] [7008961] [18-3565] (CM) [Entered: 06/04/2019 12:59 PM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 Submitted reply brief by Robert D. Sweeney for Appellant David McDaniel. NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [19][7008764] [18-3565] (Sweeney, Robert) [Entered: 06/03/2019 11:12 PM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 18 Appellee's brief filed by Appellee Progress Rail Locomotive, Inc.. Paper copies due on 05/21/2019 Electronically Transmitted. [18] [7004411] [18-3565] (CAH) [Entered: 05/14/2019 09:13 AM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 17 Filed Response in Opposition by Appellee Progress Rail Locomotive, Inc. to Plaintiff-Appellant David McDaniel's Brief. [17][7004261] [18-3565] (Colvin, Jennifer) [Entered: 05/13/2019 03:24 PM]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re: Movant's motion to withdraw as counsel in a civil appeal. [ # 15 ] The motion is GRANTED and attorney Zachary M. Slavens may withdraw from further involvement in this matter. Attorney Robert D. Sweeney will continue to serve as counsel of record for the appellant. The clerk will update the docket accordingly. CMD [16] [7001691] [18-3565] (PS) [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:33 AM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 15 Attorney Motion filed by Zachary Slavens Appellant David McDaniel to withdraw as counsel [15] [7001321] [18-3565]--[Edited 04/30/2019 by AP- to reflect attorney filer] (Slavens, Zachary) [Entered: 04/29/2019 05:06 PM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 Appellant's brief filed by Appellant David McDaniel. Paper copies due on 04/19/2019 Electronically Transmitted. [14] [6997591] [18-3565] (CCG) [Entered: 04/12/2019 09:52 AM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 Submitted appellant brief by Zachary M. Slavens for Appellant David McDaniel. [13] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6997536] [18-3565] (Slavens, Zachary) [Entered: 04/11/2019 06:19 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John J. Scharkey for Appellant David McDaniel. [12] [6997074] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [18-3565]--[Edited 04/10/2019 by FP to reflect that atty. Scharkey is added to the docket.] (Scharkey, John) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:54 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Zachary M. Slavens for Appellant David McDaniel. [11] [6997073] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [18-3565] (Slavens, Zachary) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:52 PM]
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, Appellant's counsel, Robert D. Sweeney, is directed to make a written status report to the Circuit Mediation Office on or before April 12, 2019. The report shall be sent by electronic mail directly Circuit Mediator Rocco J. Spagna in the Circuit Mediation Office and not to the Clerk of the Court. RJS [6995971] [18-3565] (AP) [Entered: 04/05/2019 03:46 PM]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/11/2019 for David McDaniel. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/13/2019 for Progress Rail Locomotive, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/03/2019 for Appellant David McDaniel. RJS [6986750] [18-3565] (FP) [Entered: 02/25/2019 02:13 PM]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/08/2019 for David McDaniel. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/09/2019 for Progress Rail Locomotive, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/30/2019 for Appellant David McDaniel. RJS [6975832] [18-3565] (CG) [Entered: 01/07/2019 09:10 AM]
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant David McDaniel. [7] [6972551] [18-3565] (Sweeney, Robert) [Entered: 12/17/2018 07:27 PM]
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert D. Sweeney for Appellant David McDaniel. [6] [6972550] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [18-3565]--[Edited 12/18/2018 by FP to reflect that atty. Sweeney is added to the docket.] (Sweeney, Robert) [Entered: 12/17/2018 07:21 PM]
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 02/07/2019 for David McDaniel. Appellee's brief due on or before 03/11/2019 for Progress Rail Locomotive, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/01/2019 for Appellant David McDaniel. RJS [6971799] [18-3565] (PS) [Entered: 12/13/2018 02:39 PM]
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted in Room 1120, Monday, January 7, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [4] [6971794] [18-3565] (PS) [Entered: 12/13/2018 02:31 PM]
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Norma Manjarrez for Appellee Progress Rail Locomotive, Inc.. [3] [6971476] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [18-3565]--[Edited 12/12/2018 by FP to reflect that atty. Manjarrez is added to the docket.] (Manjarrez, Norma) [Entered: 12/12/2018 01:45 PM]
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jennifer Colvin for Appellee Progress Rail Locomotive, Inc.. [2] [6971118] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [18-3565] (Colvin, Jennifer) [Entered: 12/11/2018 10:55 AM]
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 12/17/2018. Appellant's brief due on or before 01/14/2019 for David McDaniel. [1] [6969564] [18-3565] (CG) [Entered: 12/04/2018 09:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: David McDaniel v. Progress Rail Locomotive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID MCDANIEL
Represented By: John J. Scharkey III
Represented By: Robert D. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PROGRESS RAIL LOCOMOTIVE, INC.
Represented By: David Lawrence Schenberg
Represented By: Norma Manjarrez
Represented By: Jennifer L. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?