John Zemater, Jr. v. Village of Waterman, et al
Defendant / Appellee: VILLAGE OF WATERMAN and CHARLES BREEZE, Former Chief of Police of the Village of Waterman Police Department, Badge No. 1, also known as CHUCK
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHN R. ZEMATER, JR.
Case Number: 19-1013
Filed: January 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief only to the extent that the appellant's brief is due on or before 04/05/2019 for John R. Zemater Jr. CMD [ # 9 ] [10] [6986330] [19-1013] (AG) [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:37 AM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 Pro se motion filed by Appellant John R. Zemater, Jr. to extend time to file appellant's brief. [9] [6986171] [19-1013] (AP) [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:49 PM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant John R. Zemater, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [6986169] [19-1013] (AP) [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:47 PM]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Appellant John R. Zemater, Jr. is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant John R. Zemater Jr. by 02/20/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 0526. JR[7] [6982591] [19-1013] (MM) [Entered: 02/06/2019 12:41 PM]
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 02/21/2019 for John R. Zemater Jr. JR [6979222] [19-1013] (CMD) [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:45 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Filed District Court order dated 01/08/2019. To the extent that plaintiffs notice of appeal is late, he has show good cause under Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(5). Consequently, his motion to file a late notice of appeal [9] is granted. The notice of appeal [10] is therefore timely. Forwarded to DW. [5] [6978743] [19-1013] (JR) [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:36 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant John R. Zemater, Jr. leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 01/16/2019. [4] [6978386] [19-1013] (CAG) [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:19 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Filed notice from the District Court that a motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending. [3] [6977651] [19-1013] (CAG) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:07 PM]
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [6975283] [19-1013] (PS) [Entered: 01/03/2019 09:46 AM]
January 2, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant John R. Zemater Jr. by 01/09/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 01/16/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 01/16/2019 for Appellant John R. Zemater Jr. [1] [6975271] [19-1013] (PS) [Entered: 01/03/2019 09:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: John Zemater, Jr. v. Village of Waterman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VILLAGE OF WATERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES BREEZE, Former Chief of Police of the Village of Waterman Police Department, Badge No. 1, also known as CHUCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN R. ZEMATER, JR.
Represented By: John R. Zemater Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?