Freddie Johnson v. USA
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff / Appellant: FREDDIE JOHNSON
Case Number: 19-1041
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 3 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 03/21/2019 for Freddie Johnson. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/22/2019 for United States of America. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/13/2019 for Appellant Freddie Johnson. SCR [4] [6984097] [19-1041] (CAG) [Entered: 02/13/2019 09:06 AM]
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Motion filed by Appellant Freddie Johnson to extend time to file appellant brief. [3] [6983998] [19-1041] (Hamilton, Torreya) [Entered: 02/12/2019 03:07 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Freddie Johnson. [2] [6979388] [19-1041] (Hamilton, Torreya) [Entered: 01/22/2019 05:19 PM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 01/22/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/19/2019 for Freddie Johnson. [1] [6976172] [19-1041] (AD) [Entered: 01/07/2019 03:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Freddie Johnson v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Joseph A. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FREDDIE JOHNSON
Represented By: Thomas P. Needham
Represented By: Torreya L. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?