Lexington Insurance Company v. Chicago Flameproof & Wood Spec
Defendant / Appellant: CHICAGO FLAMEPROOF & WOOD SPECIALTIES CORPORATION
Plaintiff / Appellee: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 19-1062
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 45 Mandate issued. No record to be returned. [45] [7069778] [19-1062] (CAH) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:13 AM]
March 20, 2020 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 02/27/2020 Opinion with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7069780-2] [7069780] [19-1062] (CAH) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:17 AM]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Final judgment filed per opinion. With costs: yes. [44] [7065499] [19-1062] (FP) [Entered: 02/27/2020 03:41 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 43 Filed opinion of the court by Judge Flaum. AFFIRMED. Joel M. Flaum, Circuit Judge; Daniel A. Manion, Circuit Judge and Amy C. Barrett, Circuit Judge. [43] [7065496] [19-1062] (FP) [Entered: 02/27/2020 03:39 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 42 Case argued by Catherine Basque Weiler for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation and Mr. Mark John Sobczak for Appellee Lexington Insurance Company. [42] [7062206] [19-1062] (SK) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:20 AM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 41 Case heard and taken under advisement by panel: Joel M. Flaum, Circuit Judge; Daniel A. Manion, Circuit Judge and Amy C. Barrett, Circuit Judge. [41] [7062200] [19-1062] (SK) [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:07 AM]
February 7, 2020 Filing 40 Filed Appellee Lexington Insurance Company Citation of Additional Authority, per Circuit Rule 28(e). Argument set for: 02/13/2020. [40] [7060921] [19-1062] (Sobczak, Mark) [Entered: 02/07/2020 09:25 AM]
February 6, 2020 Filing 39 Received argument confirmation per argument email form for Attorney Mr. Mark John Sobczak for Appellee Lexington Insurance Company. [39] [7060869] [19-1062] (CAH) [Entered: 02/06/2020 04:11 PM]
February 6, 2020 Filing 38 Received argument confirmation per argument email form for Attorney Catherine Basque Weiler for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. [38] [7060860] [19-1062] (CAH) [Entered: 02/06/2020 04:06 PM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 37 Received argument confirmation from Catherine Basque Weiler for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. [37] [7060446] [19-1062] (Weiler, Catherine) [Entered: 02/05/2020 09:48 AM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 36 Received argument confirmation from Mark J. Sobczak for Appellee Lexington Insurance Company. [36] [7060405] [19-1062] (Sobczak, Mark) [Entered: 02/05/2020 08:24 AM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 35 Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. [35] [7053478] [19-1062] (MAN) [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:58 PM]
December 27, 2019 Filing 34 Argument set for Thursday, February 13, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 15 minutes. [34] [7052553] [19-1062] (DRS) [Entered: 12/27/2019 03:37 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 33 Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. Paper copies due on 12/27/2019. Electronically Transmitted. [33] [7051789] [19-1062] (MAN) [Entered: 12/23/2019 08:57 AM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 32 Submitted appellant reply brief by Catherine Basque Weiler for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. [32] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7051745] [19-1062] (Weiler, Catherine) [Entered: 12/20/2019 04:55 PM]
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: GRANTING motion to reschedule oral argument [ # 30 ] The argument in this appeal set for 01/22/2020 is VACATED. CF [7049465] [19-1062] (CAH) [Entered: 12/11/2019 03:05 PM]
December 11, 2019 Filing 30 Motion filed by Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation to reschedule oral argument. [30] [7049340] [19-1062] (Weiler, Catherine) [Entered: 12/11/2019 10:37 AM]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's reply brief. [ # 27 ] Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/20/2019 for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. SCR [29] [7049126] [19-1062] (ER) [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:27 PM]
December 10, 2019 Filing 28 Argument set for Wednesday, January 22, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721. Each side limited to 15 minutes. [28] [7049111] [19-1062] (SK) [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:08 PM]
December 10, 2019 Filing 27 Motion filed by Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation to extend time to file Reply Brief. [27] [7048983] [19-1062] (Weiler, Catherine) [Entered: 12/10/2019 10:05 AM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 26 Paper copies of appellee brief filed by Appellee Lexington Insurance Company. [26] [7047051] [19-1062] (PNR) [Entered: 12/02/2019 01:32 PM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 25 Appellee's brief filed by Appellee Lexington Insurance Company. Paper copies due on 12/04/2019 Electronically Transmitted. [25] [7046696] [19-1062] (PNR) [Entered: 11/27/2019 09:59 AM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 24 Submitted appellee brief by Mark J. Sobczak for Appellee Lexington Insurance Company. [24] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7046690] [19-1062] (Sobczak, Mark) [Entered: 11/27/2019 09:46 AM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 23 Submitted appellee brief by Mark J. Sobczak for Appellee Lexington Insurance Company. [23] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7046687] [19-1062] (Sobczak, Mark) [Entered: 11/27/2019 09:39 AM]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellee's brief. [ # 21 ] Appellee's brief due on or before 11/27/2019 for Lexington Insurance Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/18/2019 for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. CMD [22] [7036376] [19-1062] (PS) [Entered: 10/11/2019 03:24 PM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 21 Motion filed by Appellee Lexington Insurance Company to extend time to file appellee brief. [21] [7036251] [19-1062] (Sobczak, Mark) [Entered: 10/11/2019 10:50 AM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 20 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. [20] [7030224] [19-1062] (GW) [Entered: 09/13/2019 04:09 PM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 18 Re-Submitted appellant brief by Catherine Basque Weiler for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. [18] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7029376] [19-1062] (Weiler, Catherine) [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:43 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. Paper copies due on 09/17/2019. Electronically Transmitted. [19] [7029404] [19-1062] (GW) [Entered: 09/10/2019 03:25 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 Brief deficiency letter sent to Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. [17] [7028903] [19-1062] (GW) [Entered: 09/09/2019 12:48 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 Submitted appellant brief by Catherine Basque Weiler for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. [16] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7028755] [19-1062] (Weiler, Catherine) [Entered: 09/06/2019 07:05 PM]
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 09/06/2019 for Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. Appellee's brief due on or before 11/06/2019 for Lexington Insurance Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/27/2019 for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation RJS [7017912] [19-1062] (AP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:00 PM]
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 07/22/2019 for Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/21/2019 for Lexington Insurance Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/11/2019 for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. RJS [7009743] [19-1062] (CG) [Entered: 06/07/2019 09:40 AM]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/13/2019 for Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/15/2019 for Lexington Insurance Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/05/2019 for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. RJS [7003199] [19-1062] (VG) [Entered: 05/08/2019 11:06 AM]
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/13/2019 for Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/12/2019 for Lexington Insurance Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/03/2019 for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. RJS [6985955] [19-1062] (PS) [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:26 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Rebecca E. Bennett for Appellee Lexington Insurance Company. [11] [6983310] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1062]--[Edited 02/11/2019 by FP to reflect that atty. Bennett is added to the docket.] (Bennett, Rebecca) [Entered: 02/08/2019 03:47 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. [10] [6980481] [19-1062] (JR) [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:20 AM]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/20/2019 for Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/19/2019 for Lexington Insurance Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/10/2019 for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. RJS [6980084] [19-1062] (FP) [Entered: 01/25/2019 09:02 AM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Matthew J. Fink for Appellee Lexington Insurance Company. [8] [6979615] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1062] [Edited 01/23/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Sobczak, Mark) [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:14 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Amy J. Collins Cassidy for Appellee Lexington Insurance Company. [7] [6979612] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1062] [Edited 01/23/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Sobczak, Mark) [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:11 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Mark J. Sobczak for Appellee Lexington Insurance Company. [6] [6979607] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1062] [Edited 01/23/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Sobczak, Mark) [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:04 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [6979247] [19-1062] (Weiler, Catherine) [Entered: 01/22/2019 01:00 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Catherine Basque Weiler for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. [4] [6979189] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-1062] --[Edited 01/22/2019 by AP- to reflect termination and addition of counsel] (Weiler, Catherine) [Entered: 01/22/2019 10:29 AM]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 02/28/2019 for Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/01/2019 for Lexington Insurance Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/22/2019 for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. RJS [6977749] [19-1062] (VG) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:43 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Monday, January 28, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [2] [6977742] [19-1062] (VG) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:41 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation by 01/16/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 01/24/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/19/2019 for Chicago Flameproof & Wood Specialties Corporation. [1] [6977085] [19-1062] (AG) [Entered: 01/10/2019 02:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lexington Insurance Company v. Chicago Flameproof & Wood Spec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHICAGO FLAMEPROOF & WOOD SPECIALTIES CORPORATION
Represented By: Catherine Basque Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Mark John Sobczak
Represented By: Matthew J. Fink
Represented By: Amy J. Collins Cassidy
Represented By: Rebecca E. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?