Jeffrey Blaney v. Jacqueline Lashbrook, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JEFFREY BLANEY
Defendant / Appellee: JACQUELINE LASHBROOK, Warden, JOHN R. BALDWIN, BETSY SPILLER, Former Menard Correctional Center Law Librarian, PATRICIA STEWART, Menard Correctional Center Law Librarian and ODIE WASHINGTON, Former IDOC Director
Case Number: 19-1063
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Jeffrey Blaney leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 02/19/2019. District Court has assessed a $31.29 initial partial filing fee. [11] [6985342] PLRA initial partial filing fee due by 03/21/2019. [19-1063] (DSL) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:18 PM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 Filed notice from the District Court that a motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending. [10] [6984176] [19-1063] (DSL) [Entered: 02/13/2019 11:23 AM]
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. JR [9] [6984017] [19-1063] (MM) [Entered: 02/12/2019 03:39 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 Prose motion filed by Appellant Jeffrey Blaney to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Trust account statement included with motion. [8] [6983723] [19-1063] (MM) [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:42 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Jeffrey Blaney Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [7] [6983720] [19-1063] (MM) [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:38 PM]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: Motion for appointment of counsel. This appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). A review of the docket indicates that the appellant's fee status has not yet been determined. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED without court action, pursuant to this court's fee notice and order dated January 10, 2019. Further, the appellant is reminded that he must either pay the $505.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis with the district court by February 11, 2019. [ # 4 ] [6] [6980483] CMD [19-1063] (VG) [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:21 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Jeffrey Blaney. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [6980413] [19-1063] (AG) [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:57 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Jeffrey Blaney for appointment of counsel. [4] [6980411] [19-1063] (AG) [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:56 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [3] [6977243] (Note: The Office of the IL Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [19-1063] (MM) [Entered: 01/11/2019 09:48 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: John/Jane Does - Former IDOC Directors, Thomas Page, John/Jane Does - Former Menard Correctional Center Wardens, Mary West, John/Jane Does - Former Menard Correctional Center Law Librarians, John/Jane Does - Current Menard Correctional Center Law Librarians, John/Jane Does - Current IDOC Administrative Review Board Committee Personnel, John/Jane Does - Menard Correctional Center Grievance Officers (former and current), John/Jane Does - Menard Correctional Center Counselors (former and current), John/Jane Does - Menard Correctional Center Property Room Correctional Officers (former and current), John/Jane Does - Menard Correctional Center Tactical Response Team Correctional Officers (former and current), State of Illinois, State of Virginia, City of Virginia Beach, Meyera Oberndorf, Robert Humphreys, Curtis Furit, Frank Drew, G.F. Driscoll and John/Jane Does - Former Virginia Beach Correctional Center Officers. [2] [6977242] [19-1063] (MM) [Entered: 01/11/2019 09:47 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jeffrey Blaney by 01/17/2019. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 02/11/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 01/24/2019. [1] [6977223] [19-1063] (MM) [Entered: 01/11/2019 09:20 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jeffrey Blaney v. Jacqueline Lashbrook, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY BLANEY
Represented By: Jeffrey Blaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQUELINE LASHBROOK, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN R. BALDWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BETSY SPILLER, Former Menard Correctional Center Law Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICIA STEWART, Menard Correctional Center Law Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ODIE WASHINGTON, Former IDOC Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?