Andrew Slabon v. Thomas Dart, et al

Defendant / Appellee: JOHN DOES 1-6, Unknown Correctional Officers, OFFICER JONES, THOMAS J. DART, OFFICER LUDWIG and OFFICER YAN
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANDREW SLABON
Case Number: 19-1072
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: re: Affidavit accompanying motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis. [ # 5 ] The motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is DENIED. Slabon has not raised a potentially meritorious argument that the district judge abused his discretion in dismissing his case as a sanction. Slabon shall pay the required docketing fee within 14 days, or else this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7016 0340 0001 1334 9824. RFG [10] [6989472] [19-1072] (CAG) [Entered: 03/07/2019 04:02 PM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Sir Andrew Slabon. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [9] [6988475] [19-1072] (AD) [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:36 PM]
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Appellant Sir Andrew Slabon is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Andrew Slabon by 02/27/2019. JR[8] [6984329] [19-1072] (MM) [Entered: 02/13/2019 04:35 PM]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: Motion for leave to file electronically. IT IS ORDERED that the motion to become an electronic filer is GRANTED. Andrew Slabon is granted permission to electronically file documents in this appeal. This court's Electronic Case Filing Procedures, the Electronic Case Filing User Manual, and answers to frequently asked questions regarding Electronic Case Filing are available at the Seventh Circuit's website: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov. The court will terminate Slabon's filing user status upon the termination of the case, termination of his pro se status, or for any abuse of filing privileges. [ # 6 ] RFG [7] [6980454] [19-1072] (AP) [Entered: 01/28/2019 08:51 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Sir Andrew Slabon for leave to file electronically. [6] [6980085] [19-1072] (MM) [Entered: 01/25/2019 09:03 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 Prose motion filed by Appellant Sir Andrew Slabon to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [5] [6980082] [19-1072] (MM) [Entered: 01/25/2019 09:02 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Sir Andrew Slabon leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 01/16/2019. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 02/15/2019 for Appellant Andrew Slabon [6978466] [4] [6978466] [19-1072] (CAG) [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:44 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [3] [6977386] [19-1072] (PS) [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:29 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Swanigan, Social Worker; Booker, Social Worker; Unknown Employees, Cook County Department of Corrections. [2] [6977384] [19-1072] (PS) [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:28 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Andrew Slabon by 01/17/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 01/25/2019. [1] [6977370] [19-1072] (PS) [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew Slabon v. Thomas Dart, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOES 1-6, Unknown Correctional Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS J. DART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER LUDWIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER YAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANDREW SLABON
Represented By: Andrew Slabon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?