E.F. Transit, Inc. v. Indiana Alcohol and Tobacco Co, et al

Defendant / Appellee: DALE GRUBB, MARJORIE MAGINN, DAVID COLEMAN, DAVID COOK and INDIANA ALCOHOL AND TOBACCO COMMISSION
Plaintiff / Appellant: E.F. TRANSIT, INC.
Case Number: 19-1075
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The court, on its own initiative, CONSOLIDATES these appeals for the purposes of briefing and disposition. These appeals shall proceed to briefing. The briefing schedule is as follows: Appellant's consolidated brief due on or before 03/19/2019 for E.F. Transit, Inc. Appellees' joint consolidated brief due on or before 04/18/2019 for David Coleman, David Cook, Dale Grubb, Indiana Alcohol and Tobacco Commission and Marjorie Maginn. Appellant's consolidated reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/09/2019 for Appellant E.F. Transit, Inc. DW [14] [6985430] [19-1075, 19-1292] (CMD) [Entered: 02/19/2019 02:24 PM]
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: re: Status report of 02/08/2019. This appeal shall proceed to briefing. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/19/2019 for E.F. Transit, Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/18/2019 for David Coleman, David Cook, Dale Grubb, Indiana Alcohol and Tobacco Commission and Marjorie Maginn. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/09/2019 for Appellant E.F. Transit, Inc. DW [6983649] [19-1075] (CAG) [Entered: 02/11/2019 03:37 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 Filed status report by Appellant E.F. Transit, Inc.. [12] [6983220] [19-1075] (Saharia, Amy) [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:20 PM]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: Amended Status Report of 02/06/2019. Plaintiff-Appellant shall file on or before February 22, 2019, a further Status Report regarding the disposition of a plaintiff-appellants motion to alter or amend the judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e). Again, if the district court has not issued its ruling, counsel should inquire of the district judge when a ruling is expected. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. DW [11] [6982856] [19-1075] (PS) [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:25 AM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 Filed status report by Appellant E.F. Transit, Inc.. [10] [6982762] [19-1075] (Saharia, Amy) [Entered: 02/06/2019 05:18 PM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 Filed status report by Appellant E.F. Transit, Inc.. [9] [6982618] [19-1075] (Saharia, Amy) [Entered: 02/06/2019 01:39 PM]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: re: Status report of 01/25/2019. plaintiff-appellant shall file, on or before February 6, 2019, a Status Report regarding the disposition of a plaintiff-appellants motion to alter or amend the judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e). Again, if the district court has not issued its ruling, counsel should inquire of the district judge when a ruling is expected. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. DW [8] [6980559] [19-1075] (CAG) [Entered: 01/28/2019 11:52 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Eden Schiffmann for Appellant E.F. Transit, Inc.. [7] [6980423] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1075]-[Edited 01/28/2019 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Schiffmann, Eden) [Entered: 01/25/2019 05:34 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Filed status report by Appellant E.F. Transit, Inc.. [6] [6980422] [19-1075] (Saharia, Amy) [Entered: 01/25/2019 05:31 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Katherine Moran Meeks for Appellant E.F. Transit, Inc.. [5] [6980300] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1075]--[Edited 01/25/2019 by FP to reflect that atty. Meeks is added to the docket.] (Meeks, Katherine) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:02 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Amy Mason Saharia for Appellant E.F. Transit, Inc.. [4] [6980071] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-1075] [Edited 01/25/2019 by CAG to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Saharia, Amy) [Entered: 01/25/2019 08:10 AM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Aaron T. Craft for Appellee Indiana Alcohol and Tobacco Commission. [3] [6979403] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1075] [3] [6979403] [19-1075]--[Edited 01/23/2019 by CD to reflect addition of counsel.] (Craft, Aaron) [Entered: 01/23/2019 07:36 AM]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The plaintiff-appellant shall file, on or before January 25, 2019, a Status Report regarding the disposition of a plaintiff-appellants motion to alter or amend the judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e). Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for details.) DW [2] [6977703] [19-1075] (CAG) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:15 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet filed. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/20/2019 for E.F. Transit, Inc. [1] [6977376] [19-1075] (AP) [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.F. Transit, Inc. v. Indiana Alcohol and Tobacco Co, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DALE GRUBB
Represented By: Jefferson Stewart Garn
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARJORIE MAGINN
Represented By: Jefferson Stewart Garn
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID COLEMAN
Represented By: Jefferson Stewart Garn
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID COOK
Represented By: Jefferson Stewart Garn
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INDIANA ALCOHOL AND TOBACCO COMMISSION
Represented By: Jefferson Stewart Garn
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: E.F. TRANSIT, INC.
Represented By: Eden Schiffmann
Represented By: Amy Mason Saharia
Represented By: Katherine Moran Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?