Patricia Koehn v. Delta Outsource Group, Incorpo, et al

Defendant / Appellee: DELTA OUTSOURCE GROUP, INCORPORATED, a Missouri Corporation and JOHN DOES
Plaintiff / Appellant: PATRICIA ANN KOEHN, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Case Number: 19-1088
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/01/2019 for Patricia Ann Koehn. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/01/2019 for Delta Outsource Group, Incorporated. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/22/2019 for Appellant Patricia Ann Koehn. JB [6981267] [19-1088] (CMD) [Entered: 01/31/2019 03:19 PM]
January 19, 2019 Filing 11 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Patricia Ann Koehn. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [11] [6979124] [19-1088] (Thomasson, Andrew) [Entered: 01/19/2019 10:51 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Katherine M. Saldanha Olson for Appellee Delta Outsource Group, Incorporated. [10] [6978788] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1088]--[Edited 01/18/2019 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Saldanha Olson, Katherine) [Entered: 01/17/2019 04:35 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Nicole Strickler for Appellee Delta Outsource Group, Incorporated. [9] [6978786] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1088] (Strickler, Nicole) [Entered: 01/17/2019 04:31 PM]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/01/2019 for Patricia Ann Koehn. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/01/2019 for Delta Outsource Group, Incorporated. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/22/2019 for Appellant Patricia Ann Koehn. JB [6978654] [19-1088] (VG) [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:23 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, January 31, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB [7] [6978650] [19-1088] (VG) [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:19 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Patricia Ann Koehn. [6] [6977807] [19-1088] (Thomasson, Andrew) [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:48 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) Philip D. Stern for party(s) Appellant Patricia Ann Koehn, in case 19-1088 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Philip D. Stern for Appellant Patricia Ann Koehn. [5] [6977783] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1088]--[Edited 01/14/2019 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Stern, Philip) [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:27 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Added Attorney(s) Francis R. Greene for party(s) Appellant Patricia Ann Koehn, in case 19-1088 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Francis R. Greene [4] [6977776] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1088]--[Edited 01/14/2019 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Greene, Francis) [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:21 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrew T. Thomasson for Appellant Patricia Ann Koehn. [3] [6977769] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1088] (Thomasson, Andrew) [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:12 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 No attorney(s) added for Appellee John Does, per District Court docket and information sheet. [2] [6977741] [19-1088] (AD) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:40 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 01/28/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Patricia Ann Koehn by 01/22/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/25/2019 for Patricia Ann Koehn. [1] [6977694] [19-1088] (AD) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patricia Koehn v. Delta Outsource Group, Incorpo, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DELTA OUTSOURCE GROUP, INCORPORATED, a Missouri Corporation
Represented By: Nicole Marie Strickler
Represented By: Katherine Maria Saldanha Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICIA ANN KOEHN, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Philip D. Stern
Represented By: Francis R. Greene
Represented By: Andrew T. Thomasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?