Gloria Mayfield v. Victoria Lipnic, et al
Defendant / Appellee: WENDY MARTIN, in her individual capacity and official capacity as EEOC Chicago District Enforcement Supervisor, PATRICIA JARAMILLO, in her individual capacity and official capacity as EEOC Chicago District Enforcement Manager, JULIANNE BOWMAN, in her individual capacity and official capacity as EEOC Chicago District Director and VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, Acting Chair, United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, doing business as EEOC
Plaintiff / Appellant: GLORIA M. MAYFIELD
Case Number: 19-1250
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 Filed Response by Appellee Victoria A. Lipnic to Defendant-Appellee's Response Regarding Jurisdiction. [8][6996148] [19-1250] (Lindland, Kurt) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:43 AM]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: In light of appellant Gloria M. Mayfields failure to respond to the courts orders of February 11, 2019, and March 5, 2019, appellees shall file, on or before April 12, 2019, a responsive memorandum addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the court's order of February 11, 2019. DW [7] [6994933] [19-1250] (AD) [Entered: 04/02/2019 03:47 PM]
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Gloria M. Mayfield. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [6991125] [19-1250] (MM) [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:58 PM]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Appellant Gloria M. Mayfield is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Gloria M. Mayfield by 03/21/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 0960. JR[5] [6989429] [19-1250] (MM) [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:18 PM]
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff-appellant Gloria M. Mayfield to show cause for her failure to respond to the courts order of February 11, 2019. Plaintiff-Appellant Mayfield shall file her response on or before March 19, 2019. Appellant is advised that failure to respond may result in the dismissal of this appeal. The clerk is directed to attach a copy of the courts order of February 11, 2019, to appellants copy of this order. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7016 0340 0001 1334 9817. DW [4] [6988825] [19-1250] (CAG) [Entered: 03/05/2019 04:09 PM]
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Appellant, on or before February 25, 2019, shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be LIMITED to a review of the order entered on December 11, 2018, denying appellant Gloria M. Mayfields Motion for Reconsideration. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) DW [6983700] [3] [6983700] [19-1250] (PS) [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:20 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 No attorney(s) added for Appellees Julianne Bowman, Patricia Jaramillo and Wendy Martin, per District Court docket and information sheet. [2] [6983367] [19-1250] (PS) [Entered: 02/08/2019 05:03 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 U.S. civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Gloria M. Mayfield by 02/14/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 02/22/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/20/2019 for Gloria M. Mayfield. [1] [6983366] [19-1250] (PS) [Entered: 02/08/2019 04:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gloria Mayfield v. Victoria Lipnic, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WENDY MARTIN, in her individual capacity and official capacity as EEOC Chicago District Enforcement Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICIA JARAMILLO, in her individual capacity and official capacity as EEOC Chicago District Enforcement Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JULIANNE BOWMAN, in her individual capacity and official capacity as EEOC Chicago District Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, Acting Chair, United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, doing business as EEOC
Represented By: Kurt Lindland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLORIA M. MAYFIELD
Represented By: Gloria M. Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?