Ernest Coffey v. John Baldwin, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: ERNEST COFFEY
Defendant / Appellee: SYLVIA MAHONE, ROBERTA FEWS, Deputy Diretor of Department of Corrections, MELVIN HINTON, Chief of Mental Health and Psychiatric Services, JOHN R. BALDWIN, Acting IDOC Director and MICHAEL DEMPSEY, Doctor
Case Number: 19-1546
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 05/24/2019 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7007081-2] [7007081] [19-1546] (DS) [Entered: 05/24/2019 01:37 PM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is DISMISSED for failure to pay the required docketing fee pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). The appellant shall remit to the clerk of the district court the $505 appellate fees. Mandate issued, no record to be returned. The pro se appellant was DENIED leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis by the appellate court on 05/02/2019 and was given 14 days to pay the $505 filing fee. The pro se appellant has not paid the $505 appellate fee.[9][7007075] [19-1546] (DS) [Entered: 05/24/2019 01:32 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Brent J. Colbert for Appellees Sylvia Mahone and Michael Dempsey has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [8] [7002949] [19-1546] (LJ) [Entered: 05/07/2019 11:25 AM]
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: Motion to proceed in forma pauperis & Memorandum in support. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. The appellant has not identified a potentially meritorious argument for appeal. The appellant shall pay the required docketing fee within 14 days or else this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). [ # 5 ] Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 1677. [7] [7002033] WLS [19-1546] (AG) [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:49 AM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Ernest Coffey Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [6] [6998652] [19-1546] (AG) [Entered: 04/17/2019 09:48 AM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Prose motion filed by Appellant Ernest Coffey to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. (Note: Trust Fund account statement included) [5] [6998651] [19-1546] (AG) [Entered: 04/17/2019 09:46 AM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Julie A. Teuscher for Appellees Michael Dempsey and Sylvia Mahone. for Wexford Health Sources, Inc., William Alley, Dr. Scott McCormick, Andrea Moss, Todd Nelson,. Additional Parties: Linda Duckworth, Pamela Raber, Jennifer Reed and Stephen Lanterman.. [4] [6996462] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-1546] [Edited 04/09/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] --[Edited 05/07/2019 by JAD- per clarification from counsel, Attorney Brent J. Colbert has been terminated from this docket.] (Teuscher, Julie) [Entered: 04/09/2019 09:33 AM]
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Ernest Coffey leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 03/26/2019. [3] [6993483] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 04/26/2019 [19-1546] (CCG) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:42 AM]
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Randy Pfister, John Garlick, Willard Elyea, Daidra Marano, Andrea Moss, William Alley, Todd Nelso, Linda Duckworth, Pamela Raber, Jennifer Reed, Stephen Lanterman, Gladyse Taylor and Wexford Health Sources, Inc. [2] [6993448] [19-1546] (AD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 10:09 AM]
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Transcript information sheet due by 04/09/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Ernest Coffey by 04/01/2019. [1] [6993440] [19-1546] (AD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 09:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ernest Coffey v. John Baldwin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERNEST COFFEY
Represented By: Ernest Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SYLVIA MAHONE
Represented By: Brent J. Colbert
Represented By: Julie Ann Teuscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERTA FEWS, Deputy Diretor of Department of Corrections
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELVIN HINTON, Chief of Mental Health and Psychiatric Services
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN R. BALDWIN, Acting IDOC Director
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL DEMPSEY, Doctor
Represented By: Brent J. Colbert
Represented By: Julie Ann Teuscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?