Jose Cossio, Jr. v. Patrick Blanchard, et al

Plaintiff / Appellant: JOSE ANTONIO COSSIO, JR.
Defendant / Appellee: COOK COUNTY, ILLINOIS, KIMBERLY M. FOXX, NILE N. MILLER, COOK COUNTY DOE EMPLOYEES and PATRICK M. BLANCHARD
Case Number: 19-1620
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 04/19/2019 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [6999255-2] [6999255] [19-1620] (AP) [Entered: 04/19/2019 02:41 PM]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [ # 11 ][12][6999252] [19-1620] (AP) [Entered: 04/19/2019 02:35 PM]
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mr. Jose Antonio Cossio, Jr. to dismiss appeal. [11] [6999221] [19-1620] (VG) [Entered: 04/19/2019 01:45 PM]
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Mr. Jose Antonio Cossio, Jr. leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis without prejudice. Date IFP denied: 04/17/2019. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 05/17/2019 for Appellant Jose Antonio Cossio Jr. [6998759] [10] [6998759] [19-1620] (VG) [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:17 PM]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: Motion to file electronically. IT IS ORDERED that the pro se appellant's motion to become an electronic filer is DENIED. [ # 6 ] WLS [9] [6998667] [19-1620] (AP) [Entered: 04/17/2019 10:42 AM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 Filed notice from the District Court that a motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending. [8] [6998479] [19-1620] (CAG) [Entered: 04/16/2019 02:33 PM]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order issued TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. JR [7] [6998348] [19-1620] (CAG) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:07 AM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mr. Jose Antonio Cossio, Jr. to become an electronic filer. [6] [6998296] [19-1620] (AP) [Entered: 04/16/2019 09:21 AM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Prose motion filed by Appellant Mr. Jose Antonio Cossio, Jr. to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [5] [6998283] [19-1620] (VG) [Entered: 04/16/2019 09:09 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Mr. Jose Antonio Cossio, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 17-1653 [4] [6996557] [19-1620] (FP) [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:14 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Mr. Jose Antonio Cossio, Jr.. [3] [6996554] [19-1620] (FP) [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:12 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 No attorney(s) added for Appellees Cook County Doe Employees, Kimberly M. Foxx and Nile N. Miller, per District Court docket and information sheet. [2] [6995903] [19-1620] (VG) [Entered: 04/05/2019 02:48 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 04/19/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jose Antonio Cossio Jr. by 04/12/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 04/19/2019 for Appellant Jose Antonio Cossio Jr. [1] [6995894] [19-1620] (VG) [Entered: 04/05/2019 02:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jose Cossio, Jr. v. Patrick Blanchard, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE ANTONIO COSSIO, JR.
Represented By: Jose Antonio Cossio Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COOK COUNTY, ILLINOIS
Represented By: Colleen M. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIMBERLY M. FOXX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NILE N. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COOK COUNTY DOE EMPLOYEES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICK M. BLANCHARD
Represented By: Colleen M. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?