James Lewis v. Gary Boughton

Petitioner / Appellant: JAMES A. LEWIS
Respondent / Appellee: GARY A. BOUGHTON
Case Number: 19-1627
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant James A. Lewis. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7001281] [19-1627] (CAG) [Entered: 04/29/2019 04:19 PM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Pro se motion filed by Appellant James A. Lewis for appointment of counsel. [4] [7000724] [19-1627] (PS) [Entered: 04/26/2019 09:17 AM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Pro se motion filed by Appellant James A. Lewis for certificate of appealability. [3] [7000722] [19-1627] (PS) [Entered: 04/26/2019 09:14 AM]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Appellant James A. Lewis is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant James A. Lewis by 05/03/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7016 0340 0001 1335 1506. AD [2] [6999333] [19-1627] (ER) [Entered: 04/19/2019 03:59 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 03/27/2019. IFP. Transcript information sheet due by 04/19/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant James A. Lewis by 04/12/2019.. [1] [6996262] [19-1627] (FP) [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Lewis v. Gary Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JAMES A. LEWIS
Represented By: James A. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: GARY A. BOUGHTON
Represented By: Aaron R. O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?