USA v. Kevin Schaul

Defendant / Appellant: KEVIN W. SCHAUL
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-1632
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Filing 17 Added Attorney(s) Peter W. Henderson for party(s) Appellant Kevin W. Schaul, in case 19-1632 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Peter W. Henderson for Appellant Kevin W. Schaul. [17] [7003789] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1632]--[Edited 05/10/2019 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Henderson, Peter) [Entered: 05/10/2019 10:15 AM]
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: re: Motion to withdraw as counsel of record., filed on April 18, 2019 by attorney D. Peter Wise. [ # 7 ]. The motion to withdraw is GRANTED. Thomas W. Patton, Chief Federal Defender, 401 Main Street, Peoria, IL, 61602, Thomas_Patton@fd.org, is appointed to represent defendant-appellant Kevin W. Schaul. Counsel is directed to contact the defendant-appellant immediately. Briefing shall proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 07/31/2019 for Kevin W. Schaul. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/30/2019 for United States of America. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/20/2019 for Appellant Kevin W. Schaul. The District Court add attorney Thomas W. Patton to their CM/ECF database for purposes of accessing District Court documents. DW [16] [7002217] [19-1632] (CAG) [Entered: 05/02/2019 02:59 PM]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re: Status Report filed by attorney D. Peter Wise of Gates, Wise, Schlosser & Goebel on April 29, 2019. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal shall proceed to a ruling on counsels motion to withdraw. Briefing in this appeal shall continue to be SUSPENDED until further court order. DW [15] [7001852] [19-1632] (PS) [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:29 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 14 Filed status report and transcript information sheet by Appellant Kevin W. Schaul. [14] [7001204] [19-1632] (Wise, D.) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:18 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Kevin W. Schaul leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 04/26/2019. [13] [7000981] [19-1632] (VG) [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:04 AM]
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: This court's order dated April 24, 2019, docketed as item number 11, is VACATED as erroneously issued. The order dated April 24, 2019, docketed as item number 10, shall stand. CMD [12] [7000364] [19-1632] (ER) [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:21 PM]
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order issued TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. JR [11] [7000308] [19-1632]--[Edited 04/24/2019 by ER - VACATED per the court's 4/24/19 order] (CAG) [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:29 PM]
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: On April 24, 2019, counsel for the appellant mistakenly filed a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis with this court. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24(a), a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis should be filed with the district court in the first instance. Accordingly, the clerk shall transfer the motion to the district court for a ruling. CMD [10] [7000291] [19-1632] (CAG) [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:10 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 Motion filed by Appellant Kevin W. Schaul to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [9] [7000218] [19-1632] (Wise, D.) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:04 PM]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: On consideration of the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record filed by counsel for defendant-appellant Kevin Schaul on April 18, 2019, and defendant-appellant Kevin Schauls pro se motion to appoint counsel filed on April 12, 2019, IT IS ORDERED that the motions will be ruled on at a later date. Attorney D. Peter Wise is directed to assist defendant with filing in the district court (and, if denied, in this court) a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). Counsel shall file, on or before April 29, 2019, a Status Report regarding his compliance with this order, attaching a copy of the district courts decision on defendants motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal if available. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that attorney Wise comply with the provisions of Fed. R. App. P. 10(b) regarding the preparation of the transcripts. Counsel shall also file a statement regarding the preparation of the transcripts by April 29, 2019. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. DW. [8] [6999290] [19-1632] (AP) [Entered: 04/19/2019 03:15 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 Motion filed by Attorney Peter D. Wise to withdraw as counsel for Appellant Kevin W. Schaul. [7] [6998914] [19-1632]--[Edited 04/18/2019 by CAG to reflect attorney filer.] (Wise, D.) [Entered: 04/18/2019 09:55 AM]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The motion for appointment of counsel will be ruled on at a later date. Attorney D. Peter Wise is directed to assist defendant with filing in the district court (and, if denied, in this court) a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). Counsel shall file, on or before April 24, 2019, a Status Report regarding his compliance with this corder, attaching a copy of the district courts decision on defendantss motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal if available. Further, attorney Wise shall comply with the provisions of Fed. R. App. P. 10(b) regarding the preparation of transcripts. Counsel shall also file a statement regarding the preparation of transcripts by April 24, 2019. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [6998453] DW. [6] [6998453] [19-1632] (FP) [Entered: 04/16/2019 02:05 PM]
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Kevin W. Schaul. [5] [6997908] [19-1632] (AG) [Entered: 04/15/2019 09:01 AM]
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Kevin W. Schaul for appointment of counsel. [4] [6997891] [19-1632] (AG) [Entered: 04/15/2019 08:28 AM]
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Kevin W. Schaul. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [6997890] [19-1632] (AG) [Entered: 04/15/2019 08:27 AM]
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Defendant filed his notice of appeal pro se in this criminal action although he was represented in the district court by attorney D. Peter Wise. Counsel is reminded of his obligation to represent defendant on appeal unless specifically relieved by this court upon a motion to withdraw. See Circuit Rule 51(a), (c). DW [2] [6996605] [19-1632] (MM) [Entered: 04/09/2019 01:41 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 Criminal case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Kevin W. Schaul by 04/12/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 04/19/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/15/2019 for Kevin W. Schaul. [1] [6996141] [19-1632] (PS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Kevin Schaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KEVIN W. SCHAUL
Represented By: D. Peter Wise
Represented By: Kevin W. Schaul
Represented By: Peter W. Henderson
Represented By: Thomas W. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Greggory R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?