Nana Yaw Amo v. William P. Barr

Petitioner: NANA YAW AMO
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States and MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 19-1637
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re: Various motions. This court has denied petitioner's requests for a stay of removal three times, and also denied his multiple requests to proceed in forma pauperis. His most recent requests contain no new information that the court has not already considered or that would provide a potentially meritorious argument for appeal. Therefore, the motions are DENIED. [ # 16 ] The appellant must pay the required docketing fee or this appeal will be dismissed pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). [ # 15 ]; Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 1721. WLS [18] [7003022] [19-1637] (AG) [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:11 PM]
May 6, 2019 Filing 17 Filed Statement by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo [17] [7002873] [19-1637] (CAG) [Entered: 05/07/2019 09:22 AM]
May 6, 2019 Filing 16 Prose motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [16] [7002830] [19-1637] (CMD) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:07 PM]
May 6, 2019 Filing 15 Pro se motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo for stay of removal. [15] [7002829] [19-1637] (CMD) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:06 PM]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re: Motion to request a stay of removal. This court has denied the petitioner's request for a stay of removal two times, and his third request does not add any new information. Therefore, the motion is DENIED. WLS [ # 13 ] [14] [7001424] [19-1637] (VG) [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:46 AM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 Pro se motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo for stay of removal. [13] [7001181] [19-1637] (VG) [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:46 PM]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: 1. Motion to reconsider stay of removal. 2. Motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that the motions are DENIED. The petitioner is reminded that he must pay the filing fee by May 1, 2019, or else this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). [ # 10 ] [ # 9 ]; Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 2230. WLS [12] [7000804] [19-1637] (AP) [Entered: 04/26/2019 12:08 PM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 Certified Administrative Record filed by the Executive Office for Immigration Review. Petitioner detained: Yes. [7000485] [19-1637] (Executive Office Of Immigration Review, DOJ) [Entered: 04/25/2019 10:40 AM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 Prose motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [10] [6999851] [19-1637] (CMD) [Entered: 04/23/2019 01:39 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 Pro se motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo to reconsider stay of removal. [9] [6999850] [19-1637] (CMD) [Entered: 04/23/2019 01:38 PM]
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: Motion to reconsider motion to appeal in forma pauperis. [ # 7 ] IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. The petitioner's original motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis was not denied for lack of indigence; it was denied because the court concluded that the petitioner failed to identify a potentially meritorious argument for appeal. Nothing in the present motion warrants a different conclusion. The petitioner shall pay the required docketing fee by May 1, 2019, or else this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute in accordance with Circuit Rule 3(b). Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7016 0340 0001 1334 2498. WLS [8] [6999703] [19-1637] (VG) [Entered: 04/23/2019 09:34 AM]
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 Pro se motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo to reconsider permission to appeal in forma pauperis. [7] [6999317] [19-1637] (CAG) [Entered: 04/19/2019 03:34 PM]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: re: 1. Motion to stay removal. 2. Motion for attorney representation. 3. Affidavit accompanying motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis. [ # 4 ] [ # 3 ] [ # 2 ]; The motion for stay of removal is DENIED. The motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. The petitioner shall pay the required docketing fee within 14 days or else this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 70160340000113342481. WLS [6] [6996822] [19-1637] (CAG) [Entered: 04/10/2019 09:18 AM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 Appearance form filed by Attorney Kristin Moresi for Appellee William P. Barr. [5] [6996582] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1637] --[Edited 04/09/2019 by AP- to reflect addition of counsel] (Moresi, Kristin) [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:47 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 Prose motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [4] [6996298] [19-1637] (CAG) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:32 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 Pro se motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo for attorney representation. [3] [6996295] [19-1637] (CAG) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:30 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Pro se motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo for stay of removal. [2] [6996294] [19-1637] (CAG) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:29 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Review docketed with proof of service, pursuant to FRAP 15(c). Fee due. Agency record or certified list due by 05/20/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 04/22/2019 for Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo. [1] [6996280] [19-1637] (CAG) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nana Yaw Amo v. William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Kristin A. Moresi
Represented By: Oil OIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NANA YAW AMO
Represented By: Nana Yaw Amo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?