Amica Mutual Insurance Company v. Joshua Downs, et al
Defendant / Appellant: JOSHUA DOWNS and KIM DOWNS
Plaintiff / Appellee: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 19-1685
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The appellee shall file, on or before June 14, 2019, a response to appellant Kim Downss filing, addressing the jurisdictional issue raised in the court's order of April 17, 2019. DW [12] [7009778] [19-1685] (FP) [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:14 AM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Kim Downs. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [11] [7009407] [19-1685] (AG) [Entered: 06/05/2019 04:06 PM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 Filed Showcause Response by Appellant Kim Downs [ # 5 ]. [10][7009403] [19-1685] (AG) [Entered: 06/05/2019 04:05 PM]
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Kim Downs leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 05/29/2019. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 06/28/2019 for Appellant Kim Downs [7007649] [9] [7007649] [19-1685] (CAG) [Entered: 05/29/2019 10:37 AM]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders defendants-appellants Joshua and Kim Downs to show cause for their failure to respond to the courts order of April 17, 2019. Defendants-appellants shall file their response on or before May 17, 2019. Appellants are advised that failure to respond may result in the dismissal of this appeal. The clerk is directed to attach a copy of the courts order of April 17, 2019, to appellants copy of this order. DW. [8] [7003707] [19-1685] (FP) [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:06 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Joshua Downs and Kim Downs. [7] [7002515] [19-1685] (AP) [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:50 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Kim Downs. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7002513] [19-1685] (AP) [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:49 PM]
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Appellants Joshua Downs and Kim Downs are directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellants Joshua Downs and Kim Downs by 05/17/2019. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 1707. [5] [7002423] [19-1685] (AG) [Entered: 05/03/2019 12:21 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellee Amica Mutual Insurance Company. [4] [7001208] [19-1685] (Cockerham, Robert) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:20 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert W. Cockerham for Appellee Amica Mutual Insurance Company. [3] [7001203] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1685] (Cockerham, Robert) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:18 PM]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Appellants Joshua Downs, Kim Downs and Appellee Amica Mutual Insurance Company shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction or sent back to the district court as was done in the Greenhill case. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [6998784] Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellee Amica Mutual Insurance Company and Appellants Joshua Downs and Kim Downs by 04/30/2019. DW [2] [6998784] [19-1685] (AP) [Entered: 04/17/2019 03:00 PM]
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Transcript information sheet due by 04/26/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Joshua Downs and Kim Downs by 04/18/2019. [1] [6998006] [19-1685] (AD) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Amica Mutual Insurance Company v. Joshua Downs, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOSHUA DOWNS
Represented By: Joshua Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KIM DOWNS
Represented By: Kim Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert William Cockerham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?