Deville McCants v. Cheryl Hansen, et al
Defendant / Appellee: RILIWAN OJELADE, CHERYL HANSEN, Physicians Assistant, HEATHER COX, Grievance Officer and SHELIA MARA
Plaintiff / Appellant: DEVILLE MCCANTS
Case Number: 19-2304
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Prose motion filed by Appellant Deville McCants to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [6] [7024440] [19-2304] (CAG) [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:26 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Deville McCants Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [5] [7024438] [19-2304] (CAG) [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:23 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Deville McCants. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7024435] [19-2304] (CAG) [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:23 PM]
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Julie A. Teuscher for Appellees Cheryl Hansen, Riliwan Ojelade and Shelia Mara. [3] [7019701] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [19-2304] [Edited 07/26/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Teuscher, Julie) [Entered: 07/26/2019 08:54 AM]
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Deville McCants leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 07/15/2019. [2] [7017432] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 08/15/2019. [19-2304] (DSL) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:26 AM]
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Deville McCants by 07/17/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 07/24/2019. [1] [7016510] [19-2304] (CAG) [Entered: 07/10/2019 03:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Deville McCants v. Cheryl Hansen, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RILIWAN OJELADE
Represented By: Alexandra N. Rice
Represented By: Julie Ann Teuscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHERYL HANSEN, Physicians Assistant
Represented By: Alexandra N. Rice
Represented By: Julie Ann Teuscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEATHER COX, Grievance Officer
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHELIA MARA
Represented By: Alexandra N. Rice
Represented By: Julie Ann Teuscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEVILLE MCCANTS
Represented By: Deville McCants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?