William Morgan, et al v. Rickey Williams, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DENNIS GARDNER, Clerk of the Court, RICKEY WILLIAMS, COUNTY OF VERMILION, ILLINOIS, CITY OF DANVILLE and J.B. PRITZKER, Governor of Illinois
Plaintiff / Appellant: PAUL R. FARROW, JR. and WILLIAM MORGAN
Case Number: 19-2383
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. Motion for leave to appeal I.F.P. 2. Motion for I.F.P. 3. Affidavit accompanying motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis. [ # 7 ] [ # 5 ] IT IS ORDERED that the motions are DENIED. The appellants have not identified a potentially meritorious argument for appeal. The appellants shall pay the required docketing fee within 14 days or else this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 3343. WLS [8] [7029366][19-2383] (VG) [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:34 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Pro se motion filed by Appellant William Morgan to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [7] [7027047] [19-2383] (MM) [Entered: 08/29/2019 04:02 PM]
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Paul R. Farrow, Jr. Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [6] [7020900] [19-2383] (CG) [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:41 PM]
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Prose motion filed by Appellant Paul R. Farrow, Jr. to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Trust account statement included. [5] [7020895] [19-2383] (CG) [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:35 PM]
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellants Paul R. Farrow, Jr. and William Morgan leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 07/23/2019. [4] [7020040] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 08/28/2019. [19-2383] (DSL) [Entered: 07/29/2019 09:31 AM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [3] [7019032] (Note: The Office of the IL Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [19-2383] (FP) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:49 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Nancy Fahey, Jaqueline Lacy, Michael Maria, Judge Unknown, John Doe, Public defender, Salazar, Public defender, Shayne Cassidy, Pat Hartshorn, Captain Austenverg. [2] [7019030] [19-2383] (FP) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:49 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Transcript information sheet due by 08/05/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Paul R. Farrow Jr. and William Morgan by 07/29/2019. [1] [7019020] [19-2383] (FP) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: William Morgan, et al v. Rickey Williams, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENNIS GARDNER, Clerk of the Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICKEY WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF VERMILION, ILLINOIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF DANVILLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J.B. PRITZKER, Governor of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAUL R. FARROW, JR.
Represented By: Paul R. Farrow Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM MORGAN
Represented By: William Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?