Eric White v. UAL, et al
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC. and UNITED AIRLINES, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: ERIC WHITE
Case Number: 19-2546
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Matthew Z. Crotty for Appellant Eric White. [11] [7030111] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2546]--[Edited 09/13/2019 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Crotty, Matthew) [Entered: 09/13/2019 01:14 PM]
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 11/04/2019 for Eric White. Appellee's brief due on or before 12/04/2019 for United Airlines, Inc. and United Continental Holdings, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/26/2019 for Appellant Eric White. JNS [7029003] [19-2546] (FP) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:23 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney R. Joseph Barton for Appellant Eric White. [9] [7027480] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2546] --[Edited 09/03/2019 by ER - added Attorney R. Joseph Barton to the court's docket] (Barton, Robert) [Entered: 09/03/2019 11:26 AM]
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 10/21/2019 for Eric White. Appellee's brief due on or before 11/20/2019 for United Airlines, Inc. and United Continental Holdings, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/11/2019 for Appellant Eric White. JNS [7026339] [19-2546] (AD) [Entered: 08/27/2019 03:26 PM]
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Eric White. [7] [7025577] [19-2546] (Romer-Friedman, Peter) [Entered: 08/23/2019 12:31 PM]
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Paul W. Mollica for Appellant Eric White. [6] [7025573] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2546] [Edited 08/23/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Mollica, Paul) [Entered: 08/23/2019 12:27 PM]
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Pooja Shethji for Appellant Eric White. [5] [7025570] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2546] -[Edited 08/23/2019 by ER - Added attorney Pooja Shethji to the court's docket] (Shethji, Pooja) [Entered: 08/23/2019 12:24 PM]
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Peter Romer-Friedman for Appellant Eric White. [4] [7025563] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2546] (Romer-Friedman, Peter) [Entered: 08/23/2019 12:16 PM]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 10/04/2019 for Eric White. Appellees' brief due on or before 11/05/2019 for United Airlines, Inc. and United Continental Holdings, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/26/2019 for Appellant Eric White. JNS [7024329] [19-2546] (CG) [Entered: 08/19/2019 12:43 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday September 4, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [2] [7024328] [19-2546] (CG) [Entered: 08/19/2019 12:41 PM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 08/26/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 09/23/2019 for Eric White. [1] [7023015] [19-2546] (AG) [Entered: 08/12/2019 02:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric White v. UAL, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Michael J. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED AIRLINES, INC.
Represented By: Michael J. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIC WHITE
Represented By: Peter Romer-Friedman
Represented By: Pooja Shethji
Represented By: Paul W. Mollica
Represented By: Matthew Crotty
Represented By: Robert Joseph Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?