Nandorf, Inc., et al v. Applied Underwriters Captive R
Plaintiff / Appellant: KENNETH ALTERMAN, NANDORF, INC., doing business as UNIQUE THRIFT STORE and SOUTHWEST MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Defendant / Appellee: APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK ASSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Case Number: 19-3090
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 02/10/2020 for Kenneth Alterman, Nandorf, Inc. and Southwest Management Company. Appellee's brief due on or before 03/10/2020 for Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/31/2020 for Appellants Kenneth Alterman, Nandorf, Inc. and Southwest Management Company JNS [7042953] [19-3090] (AP) [Entered: 11/12/2019 10:57 AM]
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 12/30/2019 for Kenneth Alterman, Nandorf, Inc. and Southwest Management Company. Appellees' brief due on or before 01/30/2020 for Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/20/2020 for Appellants Kenneth Alterman, Nandorf, Inc. and Southwest Management Company. JNS [7040704] [19-3090] (VG) [Entered: 10/31/2019 01:45 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted in Room 1120, Tuesday, November 26, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS [7] [7040699] [19-3090] (VG) [Entered: 10/31/2019 01:40 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Jurisdiction Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellants Nandorf, Inc., Southwest Management Company and Kenneth Alterman. [6] [7040076] [19-3090]--[Edited 10/30/2019 by PS - to clarify document title.] (Douglass, Richard) [Entered: 10/29/2019 02:46 PM]
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The appellants shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before November 4, 2019. (See order for further details) DW [5] [5] [7039849] [19-3090] (CG) [Entered: 10/28/2019 04:03 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Nandorf, Inc., Southwest Management Company and Kenneth Alterman. [4] [7039785] [19-3090] (Douglass, Richard) [Entered: 10/28/2019 03:24 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Nandorf, Inc., Southwest Management Company and Kenneth Alterman. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7039694] [19-3090] (Douglass, Richard) [Entered: 10/28/2019 01:15 PM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Richard G. Douglass for Appellants Nandorf, Inc., Southwest Management Company and Kenneth Alterman. [2] [7039494] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3090] (Douglass, Richard) [Entered: 10/25/2019 04:42 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Kenneth Alterman, Nandorf, Inc. and Southwest Management Company by 10/29/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 11/06/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/02/2019 for Kenneth Alterman, Nandorf, Inc. and Southwest Management Company. [1] [7038707] [19-3090] (PS) [Entered: 10/23/2019 12:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nandorf, Inc., et al v. Applied Underwriters Captive R
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH ALTERMAN
Represented By: Richard G. Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NANDORF, INC., doing business as UNIQUE THRIFT STORE
Represented By: Richard G. Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SOUTHWEST MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Represented By: Richard G. Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK ASSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Joseph A. Roselius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?