Jose Soto, Jr. v. Nancy White, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOSE S. SOTO, JR.
Defendant / Appellee: JEFFREY MANLOVE, Doctor, NANCY WHITE, BELINDA SCHRUBBE, ANN YORK and DONNA LARSON
Case Number: 19-3135
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 13, 2022 Jose Soto, Jr. v. Nancy White

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Jose S. Soto, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. (Forwarded by the District Court) [6] [7050478] [19-3135] (PS) [Entered: 12/17/2019 09:12 AM]
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 Notification from the District Court that a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis was filed on 12/5/2019 and is currently pending. [7] [7050527] [19-3135] (JR) [Entered: 12/17/2019 10:08 AM]
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 Prose motion filed by Appellant Jose S. Soto, Jr. to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [5] [7048262] [19-3135] (DRS) [Entered: 12/06/2019 09:15 AM]
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: Motion to extend time. This appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). A review of the docket indicates that the appellant's fee status has not been determined. Accordingly, to the extent that the appellant seeks an extension of time, IT IS ORDERED that the request is GRANTED to the extent that the appellant shall file the Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement and the transcript information sheet, if one is necessary, by December 16, 2019. The clerk shall send the appellant a copy of Circuit Rule 3(c) and Circuit Rule 28(a), so the appellant may familiarize himself with the information that must be included in a Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement. The clerk shall also send the appellant a transcript information sheet form. To the extent that the appellant seeks recruitment of counsel, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the request is DENIED without court action, pursuant to this court's fee notice and order dated October 28, 2019. [ # 3 ][4] [7043629] CMD [19-3135] (AP) [Entered: 11/14/2019 08:42 AM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Jose S. Soto, Jr. to extend time to file docket statement and transcript form. [3] [7043562] [19-3135] (CM) [Entered: 11/13/2019 03:32 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Gail Waltz, Amy Gunderson, Ann Scarpita and HSUM Chrystal Marchant. [2] [7040116] [19-3135] (MM) [Entered: 10/29/2019 03:45 PM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jose S. Soto Jr. by 11/04/2019. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 11/27/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 11/12/2019. [1] [7040109] [19-3135] (MM) [Entered: 10/29/2019 03:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jose Soto, Jr. v. Nancy White, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE S. SOTO, JR.
Represented By: Jose S. Soto Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY MANLOVE, Doctor
Represented By: Laure Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NANCY WHITE
Represented By: Laure Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BELINDA SCHRUBBE
Represented By: Laure Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANN YORK
Represented By: Laure Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONNA LARSON
Represented By: Laure Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?