Tim Semmerling v. Cheryl Bormann, et al
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and CHERYL T. BORMANN
Plaintiff / Appellant: TIM JON SEMMERLING
Case Number: 19-3211
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Ms. Amanda Jo Hamilton for Appellee Cheryl T. Bormann has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [10] [7051214] [19-3211] (LJ) [Entered: 12/19/2019 11:37 AM]
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief to the extent that briefing will proceed as follows: [ # 8 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 02/10/2020 for Tim Jon Semmerling. Appellees' briefs due on or before 03/11/2020 for Cheryl T. Bormann and United States of America. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/01/2020 for Appellant Tim Jon Semmerling. CMD [9] [7048513] [19-3211] (PS) [Entered: 12/06/2019 04:19 PM]
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 Motion filed by Appellant Tim Jon Semmerling to extend time to file appellant brief. [8] [7048158] [19-3211] (Wigell, Raymond) [Entered: 12/05/2019 03:30 PM]
November 22, 2019 Added Attorney Alex H. Hartzler as co-counsel for Appellee USA in case 19-3211, pursuant to email notification from the Office of the U.S. Attorney regarding counsel of record. [7045651-2] [7045651] [19-3211] (JR) [Entered: 11/22/2019 11:46 AM]
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/09/2020 for Tim Jon Semmerling. Appellee's brief due on or before 02/10/2020 for Cheryl T. Bormann and United States of America. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/02/2020 for Appellant Tim Jon Semmerling. RJS [7045432] [19-3211] (FP) [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:13 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Monday, December 9, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [6] [7045428] [19-3211] (FP) [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:10 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Tim Jon Semmerling. [5] [7045224] [19-3211] (Wigell, Raymond) [Entered: 11/20/2019 05:58 PM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel F. Konicek for Appellee Cheryl T. Bormann. [4] [7044043] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3211] [Edited 11/15/2019 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Konicek, Daniel) [Entered: 11/15/2019 11:29 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Amanda J. Hamilton for Appellee Cheryl T. Bormann. [3] [7044036] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-3211] (Hamilton, Amanda) [Entered: 11/15/2019 11:19 AM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Tim Jon Semmerling. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7043023] [19-3211] (Wigell, Raymond) [Entered: 11/12/2019 01:53 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 U.S. civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 11/20/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Tim Jon Semmerling by 11/12/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/16/2019 for Tim Jon Semmerling. [1] [7042016] [19-3211] (AD) [Entered: 11/06/2019 12:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tim Semmerling v. Cheryl Bormann, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kathleen M. Flannery
Represented By: Alex H. Hartzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHERYL T. BORMANN
Represented By: Amanda Jo Hamilton
Represented By: Daniel Konicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIM JON SEMMERLING
Represented By: Raymond Wigell
Represented By: Huma Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?