Ronnie Famous v. Sue DeHaan
Respondent / Appellee: SUSAN NOVAK, Warden and SUE DEHAAN
Petitioner / Appellant: RONNIE L. FAMOUS
Case Number: 19-3227
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: Motion to substitute Sue DeHaan as respondent. The clerk shall update the courts docket to reflect that the appellee in this matter is now Sue DeHaan, Director of the Wisconsin Resource Center. CMD [7] [7053566] [19-3227] (AG) [Entered: 01/03/2020 09:38 AM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Ronnie L. Famous to vacate district court's order dismissing petitioner's petition on procedural grounds because district court lacked jurisdiction. [6] [7052133] [19-3227] (DRS) [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:12 AM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Ronnie L. Famous to substitute party. [5] [7051732] [19-3227] (CAH) [Entered: 12/20/2019 04:14 PM]
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Ronnie L. Famous for certificate of appealability. [4] [7048168] [19-3227] (MAN) [Entered: 12/05/2019 03:48 PM]
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Ronnie L. Famous. [3] [7048167] [19-3227] (MAN) [Entered: 12/05/2019 03:47 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Ronnie L. Famous leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 11/08/2019. [2] [7042796] [19-3227] (CG) [Entered: 11/08/2019 04:07 PM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 10/10/2019. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 11/21/2019.. [1] [7042428] [19-3227] (AP) [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronnie Famous v. Sue DeHaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SUSAN NOVAK, Warden
Represented By: Robert G. Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SUE DEHAAN
Represented By: Robert G. Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: RONNIE L. FAMOUS
Represented By: Ronnie L. Famous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?