Anthony Smith, et al v. City of Janesville, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JIMMY G. HOLFORD, III, DAVID J. MOORE, JOEL P. MELTON, CITY OF JANESVILLE and JIMMY G. HOLFORD, JR.
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANTHONY SMITH and FLYING A.J.'S TOWING COMPANY, LLC, a Wisconsin limited liability company
Case Number: 19-3282
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [4] RJS [7051007] [19-3282] (AG) [Entered: 12/18/2019 02:22 PM]
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 01/21/2020 for Flying A.J.'s Towing Company, LLC and Anthony Smith. Appellees' brief due on or before 02/19/2020 for City of Janesville, Jimmy G. Holford III, Jimmy G. Holford Jr., Joel P. Melton and David J. Moore. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/11/2020 for Appellants Flying A.J.'s Towing Company, LLC and Anthony Smith. RJS [7046801] [19-3282] (CG) [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:15 PM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday December 18, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [2] [7046798] [19-3282] (CG) [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:11 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/30/2019 for Flying A.J.'s Towing Company, LLC and Anthony Smith. Transcript information sheet due by 12/02/2019. [1] [7044442] [19-3282] (VG) [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Smith, et al v. City of Janesville, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIMMY G. HOLFORD, III
Represented By: Ann C. Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID J. MOORE
Represented By: Ann C. Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOEL P. MELTON
Represented By: Ann C. Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF JANESVILLE
Represented By: Ann C. Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIMMY G. HOLFORD, JR.
Represented By: Ann C. Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY SMITH
Represented By: Allen Steven Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FLYING A.J.'S TOWING COMPANY, LLC, a Wisconsin limited liability company
Represented By: Allen Steven Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?