Marshaun Boykin v. Mark Fischer, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARSHAUN BOYKIN
Defendant / Appellee: RAMON MARQUEZ, Doctor and MARK FISCHER, Doctor
Case Number: 19-3475
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 01/13/2020 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7060191-2] [7060191] [19-3475] (PNR) [Entered: 02/04/2020 10:27 AM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 Mandate issued. No record to be returned. [7] [7060190] [19-3475] (PNR) [Entered: 02/04/2020 10:22 AM]
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This court has reviewed the record on appeal and Boykinss filings in this court. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is CLOSED pursuant to this courts order issued on January 25, 2019, in appeal no. 18-3346, ordering that the clerks of all courts in this circuit shall return unfiled any papers filed by Boykin until he has paid in full all outstanding fees in the district court and this court. Boykin has not demonstrated that he has paid any of his outstanding fees. The court also notes that Boykin has not demonstrated that he is in imminent danger of serious physical injury. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that it is unnecessary to rule on the motion for appointment of counsel. Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge. [6] [7055534] [19-3475] (AG) [Entered: 01/13/2020 09:05 AM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 Filed Notice to the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals by Appellant Marshaun Boykin. [5] [7053492] [19-3475] (PS) [Entered: 01/02/2020 04:11 PM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Marshaun Boykin for appointment of counsel. [4] [7051390] [19-3475] (PS) [Entered: 12/19/2019 03:47 PM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Notice to the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals by Appellant Marshaun Boykin. [3] [7051389] [19-3475] (PS) [Entered: 12/19/2019 03:46 PM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.A. sec. 1915(g), appellant may not proceed in forma pauperis. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the pro se appellant pay the required $505 fees to the clerk of the district court or this appeal will be dismissed pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending resolution of appellant's fee status on appeal. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 01/02/2020. [2][7051381] [19-3475] (PS) [Entered: 12/19/2019 03:40 PM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 01/02/2020. [1] [7051376] [19-3475] (PS) [Entered: 12/19/2019 03:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marshaun Boykin v. Mark Fischer, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARSHAUN BOYKIN
Represented By: Marshaun Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAMON MARQUEZ, Doctor
Represented By: Stephen J. Gorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK FISCHER, Doctor
Represented By: Stephen J. Gorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?