Rewards Network Establishment v. Philip Lajaunie
Defendant / Appellant: LA BOUCHERIE INC. and PHILIP LAJAUNIE
Plaintiff / Appellee: REWARDS NETWORK ESTABLISHMENT SERVICES INC.
Case Number: 20-1045
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 20, 2021 Rewards Network Establishment v. Philip Lajaunie

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Mandate issued. No record to be returned. [45] [7161271] [20-1045] (CAH) [Entered: 05/19/2021 08:55 AM]
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 04/20/2021 Nonprecedential Disposition and 05/11/2021 Rehearing Denial Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7161273-2] [7161273] [20-1045] (CAH) [Entered: 05/19/2021 08:58 AM]
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Appellant Mr. Philip Lajaunie Petition for Rehearing is DENIED. (See order for details.) [44] [7159496] [20-1045] (CG) [Entered: 05/11/2021 10:45 AM]
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Paper copies of rehearing brief filed by Appellant Mr. Philip Lajaunie. DIST. [43] [7158819] [20-1045] (GW) [Entered: 05/07/2021 09:51 AM]
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Filed Petition for Rehearing by Appellant Mr. Philip Lajaunie. Paper copies due on 05/07/2021 [42] [7157986] [20-1045] (GW) [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:34 PM]
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Submitted petition for rehearing by Philip Lajaunie, appearing pro se for Appellant Mr. Philip Lajaunie. [41] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7157935] [20-1045] (Lajaunie, Philip) [Entered: 05/04/2021 12:37 PM]
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Final judgment filed per nonprecedential disposition. With costs: yes. [40] [7155215] [20-1045] (ZNS) [Entered: 04/20/2021 04:04 PM]
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Filed Nonprecedential Disposition PER CURIAM. AFFIRMED. Michael B. Brennan, Circuit Judge; Michael Y. Scudder, Circuit Judge and Thomas L. Kirsch II, Circuit Judge. [39] [7155212] [20-1045] (ZNS) [Entered: 04/20/2021 04:00 PM]
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellant Mr. Philip Lajaunie. [38] [7123756] [20-1045] (DRS) [Entered: 11/24/2020 10:52 AM]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellant Mr. Philip Lajaunie. Paper copies due on 11/24/2020 Electronically Transmitted. [37] [7122290] [20-1045] (CO) [Entered: 11/17/2020 02:55 PM]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Submitted appellant brief by Philip Lajaunie for Appellant Mr. Philip Lajaunie. [36] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7122269] [20-1045] (Lajaunie, Philip) [Entered: 11/17/2020 01:42 PM]
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellee Rewards Network Establishment Services Inc.. [35] [7120511] [20-1045] (Wright, Alexander) [Entered: 11/09/2020 02:37 PM]
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Appellee shall file a paper captioned Amended Jurisdictional Statement no later than 11/09/2020, which contains a jurisdictional statement that provides the omitted information noted above and otherwise complies with all the requirements of Circuit Rule 28(a). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk DISTRIBUTE, along with the briefs in this appeal, copies of this order and appellees Amended Jurisdictional Statement to the assigned merits panel. (See order for further details). DW [34] [7119295] [20-1045] (MM) [Entered: 11/03/2020 01:01 PM]
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's reply brief. [ # 32 ] Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/17/2020 for Appellant Philip Lajaunie. CMD [33] [7117730] [20-1045] (MM) [Entered: 10/27/2020 03:50 PM]
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mr. Philip Lajaunie to extend time to file Appellant's Reply Brief., to file Appellant's Reply Brief. [32] [7117652] [20-1045] (Lajaunie, Philip) [Entered: 10/27/2020 01:37 PM]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Paper copies of appellee brief filed by Appellee Rewards Network Establishment Services Inc.. [31] [7114649] [20-1045] (CAG) [Entered: 10/14/2020 03:44 PM]
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Appellee's brief filed by Appellee Rewards Network Establishment Services Inc.. Paper copies due on 10/20/2020 Electronically Transmitted. [30] [7114383] [20-1045] (CO) [Entered: 10/14/2020 08:59 AM]
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Submitted appellee brief by Alexander N. Wright for Appellee Rewards Network Establishment Services Inc.. [29] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7114294] [20-1045] (Wright, Alexander) [Entered: 10/13/2020 04:12 PM]
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant Mr. Philip Lajaunie. [28] [7108133] [20-1045] (LJ) [Entered: 09/16/2020 10:21 AM]
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Mr. Philip Lajaunie. Paper copies due on 09/18/2020 Electronically Transmitted. [27] [7107178] [20-1045] (CAG) [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:13 PM]
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Submitted appellant brief by Philip Lajaunie, appearing pro se for Appellant Mr. Philip Lajaunie. [26] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7107056] [20-1045] (Lajaunie, Philip) [Entered: 09/11/2020 01:01 PM]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file Apellant's brief. [ # 24 ]. Appellant's brief due on or before 09/11/2020 for Philip Lajaunie. Appellee's brief due on or before 10/13/2020 for Rewards Network Establishment Services Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/03/2020 for Appellant Philip Lajaunie. CMD [25] [7103461] [20-1045] (ZNS) [Entered: 08/25/2020 02:50 PM]
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mr. Philip Lajaunie to extend time to file appellant's brief. [24] [7103194] [20-1045] (Lajaunie, Philip) [Entered: 08/24/2020 06:16 PM]
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief only to the extent that briefing will proceed as follows: [ # 22 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 08/28/2020 for Philip Lajaunie. Appellee's brief due on or before 09/28/2020 for Rewards Network Establishment Services Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/19/2020 for Appellant Philip Lajaunie CMD. [23] [7093181] [20-1045]--[Edited 07/13/2020 by CMD to update text.] (ZNS) [Entered: 07/13/2020 04:10 PM]
July 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mr. Philip Lajaunie to extend time to file appellant brief. [22] [7092897] [20-1045] (Lajaunie, Philip) [Entered: 07/12/2020 08:00 PM]
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Mandate issued only as to La Boucherie Inc.. [21] [7092192] [20-1045] (CAH) [Entered: 07/09/2020 09:14 AM]
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 07/01/2020 Order Dismissing a Party with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7092198-2] [7092198] [20-1045] (CAH) [Entered: 07/09/2020 09:21 AM]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: This courts order of May 8, 2020, ordered counsel to file an appearance and a disclosure statement on behalf of appellant La Boucherie, Inc., by June 12, 2020. To date, no attorney has filed an appearance or a disclosure statement. Because a corporation may only appear and proceed by and through an attorney, IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is DISMISSED as to appellant La Boucherie, Inc. United States v. Hagerman, 545 F.3d 579, 581-82 (7th Cir. 2008); Scandia Down Corp. v. Euroquilt, Inc. 772 F.2d 1423, 1427 (7th Cir. 1985). Briefing will proceed according to the courts order dated May 8, 2020. CMD [20] [7090570] [20-1045] (ER) [Entered: 07/01/2020 11:51 AM]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: Motion to reconsider. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. JLW [ # 18 ] [19] [7082223] [20-1045] (VG) [Entered: 05/20/2020 02:26 PM]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mr. Philip Lajaunie for reconsideration of his Lawyers' Motion to Withdraw. [18] [7081587] [20-1045] (Lajaunie, Philip) [Entered: 05/18/2020 03:04 PM]
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re: Motion for Defendant-Appellant to Become an Electronic Filer. [ # 16 ] The motion to become an electronic filer is GRANTED. Appellant Philip Lajaunie is granted permission to electronically file documents in appeal number 20-1045. This court's Electronic Case Filing Procedures, the Electronic Case Filing User Manual, and answers to frequently asked questions regarding Electronic Case Filing are available at the Seventh Circuit's website: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov. The court will terminate Lajaunie's status as an electronic filer upon the termination of this appeal or for any abuse of filing privileges. JLW [17] [7080784] [20-1045] (MM) [Entered: 05/13/2020 12:22 PM]
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Philip Lajaunie to become an electronic filer. [16] [7080072] [20-1045] (JR) [Entered: 05/11/2020 11:30 AM]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re: 1. Defendants' Counsel's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants. 2. Defendants' Counsel's Supplement to the Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants. [ # 14 ] The motion is GRANTED and attorney Eugene E. Murphy, Jr., may withdraw from further representation of the appellants. Appellant Philip LaJaunie is reminded that he, as an individual, will be proceeding pro se in this matter unless he secures new counsel. The appellants are further reminded that La Boucherie, Inc., is a corporation and may only appear and proceed by and through an attorney. United States v. Hagerman, 545 F.3d 579, 581-82 (7th Cir. 2008); Scandia Down Corp. v. Euroquilt, Inc. 772 F.2d 1423, 1427 (7th Cir. 1985). Accordingly, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that new counsel file an appearance and a disclosure statement for La Boucherie, Inc., by 06/12/2020, or this appeal will be dismissed as to La Boucherie, Inc. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 07/13/2020 for La Boucherie Inc. and Philip Lajaunie. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/12/2020 for Rewards Network Establishment Services Inc.. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/02/2020 for Appellants La Boucherie Inc. and Philip Lajaunie. CMD [15] [7079685] [20-1045] (MM) [Entered: 05/08/2020 09:31 AM]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Amended motion filed by Attorney Eugene E. Murphy, Jr. for Appellants Philip Lajaunie and La Boucherie Inc. to withdraw as counsel. [14] [7079664] [20-1045]--[Edited 05/08/2020 by MM to reflect attorney filer and to reflect all parties that the attorney represents.] (Murphy, Eugene) [Entered: 05/07/2020 08:21 PM]
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER issued DENYING Defendants Counsels Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants without prejudice to renewal in a motion that includes a current address for the appellants. [ # 12 ] CMD [13] [7078344] [20-1045] (AD) [Entered: 05/01/2020 03:10 PM]
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion filed by Attorney Eugene E. Murphy, Jr. for Appellants Philip Lajaunie and La Boucherie Inc. Defendants' Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants. [12] [7078304] [20-1045]--[Edited 05/01/2020 by AD to reflect attorney filer.] (Murphy, Eugene) [Entered: 05/01/2020 02:26 PM]
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 06/12/2020 for La Boucherie Inc. and Philip Lajaunie. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/13/2020 for Rewards Network Establishment Services Inc.. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/03/2020 for Appellants La Boucherie Inc. and Philip Lajaunie. RJS [7076840] [20-1045] (AG) [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:18 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Alexander N. Wright for Appellee Rewards Network Establishment Services Inc. has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [10] [7065403] [20-1045] (LJ) [Entered: 02/27/2020 12:37 PM]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 05/01/2020 for La Boucherie Inc. and Philip Lajaunie. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/01/2020 for Rewards Network Establishment Services Inc.. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/22/2020 for Appellants La Boucherie Inc. and Philip Lajaunie. RJS [7065038] [20-1045] (ER) [Entered: 02/26/2020 12:13 PM]
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants brief due on or before 03/26/2020 for La Boucherie Inc. and Philip Lajaunie. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/27/2020 for Rewards Network Establishment Services Inc. Appellants reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/18/2020 for Appellants La Boucherie Inc. and Philip Lajaunie. RJS [7059502] [20-1045] (MM) [Entered: 01/30/2020 02:27 PM]
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellants La Boucherie Inc. and Philip Lajaunie. [7] [7057539] [20-1045] (Murphy, Eugene) [Entered: 01/22/2020 09:42 AM]
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants La Boucherie Inc. and Philip Lajaunie. [6] [7057448] [20-1045] (Murphy, Eugene) [Entered: 01/21/2020 04:08 PM]
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 03/06/2020 for La Boucherie Inc. and Philip Lajaunie. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/06/2020 for Rewards Network Establishment Services Inc.. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/27/2020 for Appellants La Boucherie Inc. and Philip Lajaunie. RJS [7057418] [20-1045] (PS) [Entered: 01/21/2020 03:31 PM]
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted in Room 1120, Thursday, February 6, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [4] [7057413] [20-1045] (PS) [Entered: 01/21/2020 03:26 PM]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The appellants shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before January 22, 2020. (See order for details.) DW [3] [7056625] [20-1045] (CG) [Entered: 01/16/2020 11:47 AM]
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Philip Lajaunie and La Boucherie Inc.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7056362] [20-1045] (Murphy, Eugene) [Entered: 01/15/2020 01:06 PM]
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants La Boucherie Inc. and Philip Lajaunie by 01/15/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 01/23/2020. Appellants' brief due on or before 02/18/2020 for La Boucherie Inc. and Philip Lajaunie. [1] [7055091] [20-1045] (AG) [Entered: 01/09/2020 02:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rewards Network Establishment v. Philip Lajaunie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LA BOUCHERIE INC.
Represented By: Eugene E. Murphy Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PHILIP LAJAUNIE
Represented By: Eugene E. Murphy Jr.
Represented By: Philip Lajaunie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: REWARDS NETWORK ESTABLISHMENT SERVICES INC.
Represented By: Alexander N. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?