Juan Reyes v. Leonta Jackson
Petitioner / Appellant: JUAN REYES
Respondent / Appellee: MICHAEL MELVIN and LEONTA JACKSON, Warden
Case Number: 20-1432
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 Appellee Michael Melvin in 20-1432 substituted by Appellee Leonta Jackson in 20-1432, pursuant to FRAP 43(c). [11] [7076653] [20-1432] (CG) [Entered: 04/23/2020 10:29 AM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 Filed Circuit Rule 43 Notice by Appellee Michael Melvin. [10] [7076640] [20-1432] (Bendik, Leah) [Entered: 04/23/2020 09:57 AM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 Docketing Statement filed by Appellee Michael Melvin. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [9] [7076638] [20-1432] (Bendik, Leah) [Entered: 04/23/2020 09:54 AM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 Appearance form filed by Attorney Leah M Bendik for Appellee Michael Melvin. [8] [7076611] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-1432]-[Edited 04/23/2020 by VG - to reflect termination and addition of counsel] (Bendik, Leah) [Entered: 04/23/2020 07:55 AM]
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 Prose motion filed by Appellant Juan Reyes to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [7] [7075691] [20-1432] (CAH) [Entered: 04/17/2020 03:50 PM]
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Juan Reyes. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7075690] [20-1432] (CAH) [Entered: 04/17/2020 03:49 PM]
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Appellant Juan Reyes is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Juan Reyes by 04/16/2020. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0360 0000 5171 5738. [5] [7072411] [20-1432] (AD) [Entered: 04/02/2020 11:51 AM]
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: Notice of Non-Interest. The clerk has corrected the docket to reflect that the appellee is represented by the Office of the Illinois Attorney General, not the Office of the United States Attorney. CMD [4] [7069502] [20-1432] (AD) [Entered: 03/19/2020 10:54 AM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Filed Notice that neither the United States nor any government agency or employee is an interested party in this appeal from the denial of a 22554 petition filed by a state prisoner by Appellee Michael Melvin. [3] [7069428] [20-1432] (Walters, Greggory) [Entered: 03/18/2020 05:16 PM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Juan Reyes leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 03/18/2020. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 04/17/2020 for Appellant Juan Reyes [7069361] [2] [7069361] [20-1432] (AP) [Entered: 03/18/2020 03:08 PM]
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 State prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 03/02/2020. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Juan Reyes by 03/24/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 03/31/2020. [1] [7069029] [20-1432] (AG) [Entered: 03/17/2020 02:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Juan Reyes v. Leonta Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JUAN REYES
Represented By: Juan Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: MICHAEL MELVIN
Represented By: Greggory R. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: LEONTA JACKSON, Warden
Represented By: Leah Myers Bendik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?