Roger Day, Jr. v. Subsectretario Del Sistema Pen, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DIRECTOR GENERAL DEL CENTRO DE READAPTACION SOCIAL NUMERO 5 ORIENTE, Mexico, CONSEJO TECINCO INTERDICIPLINARIO DEL CENTRO FEDERAL DE READAPTACION SOCIAL, Mexico, DIRECTOR GENERAL DE TRANSLADO DE REOS Y SEGURIDAD PENITENCIARIA, Mexico and SUBSECTRETARIO DEL SISTEMA PENITENCIARIO FEDERAL, Mexico
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROGER C. DAY, JR.
Case Number: 20-1555
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 26, 2021 Roger Day, Jr. v. Subsectretario Del Sistema Pen

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: Motion to Renew Motion for Appointment of Counsel on Appeal. [ # 11 ] [12] [7083500] This appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). A review of the docket indicates that the appellants motion for leave to procced on appeal in forma pauperis is currently pending before this court. Accordingly, the motion is DENIED without court action, pursuant to this court's fee notice and order dated 04/06/2020. CMD [20-1555] (MM) [Entered: 05/27/2020 03:47 PM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Roger C. Day, Jr. to renew motion for appointment of counsel. [11] [7083313] [20-1555] (CAH) [Entered: 05/27/2020 09:56 AM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 Prose motion filed by Appellant Roger C. Day, Jr. to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [10] [7083311] [20-1555] (CAH) [Entered: 05/27/2020 09:52 AM]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: Motion to Further Support the Appellant's Pending Motion for Appointment of Counsel for Appeal. [ # 8 ] The motion is DENIED without court action, pursuant to the fee notice and order dated 04/06/2020. Further, the appellant is reminded of his obligation to filed an asset affidavit. (See the courts order dated 04/30/2020.) The appellant may renew his request for counsel once his fee status has been resolved. (See order for further details). CMD [9] [7083028] [20-1555] (MM) [Entered: 05/26/2020 12:14 PM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Roger C. Day, Jr. to further support the appellant's pending motion for appointment of counsel for appeal. [8] [7082829] [20-1555] (DRS) [Entered: 05/22/2020 03:50 PM]
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: Motion for Appointment of Counsel on Appeal. [ # 6 ] A review of the court's docket indicates that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore all proceedings will remain suspended until the appellant's fee status has been determined. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). Because the appellant's fee status remains pending, the motion is DENIED without court action, pursuant to the fee notice and order dated 04/06/2020. To the extent that the appellant seeks to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, a further review of the docket indicates that the paperwork he has filed to date is incomplete because it does not include an asset affidavit. Accordingly, the appellant shall file his asset affidavit is due by 06/01/2020. The clerk shall send the appellant an asset affidavit form. CMD [7] [7078132] [20-1555] (MM) [Entered: 04/30/2020 04:08 PM]
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Roger C. Day, Jr. for appointment of counsel. [6] [7077806] [20-1555] (CAH) [Entered: 04/29/2020 02:53 PM]
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Roger C. Day, Jr. Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [5] [7077805] [20-1555] (CAH) [Entered: 04/29/2020 02:52 PM]
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 Prose motion filed by Appellant Roger C. Day, Jr. to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [4] [7077804] [20-1555] (CAH) [Entered: 04/29/2020 02:52 PM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Roger C. Day, Jr. leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 04/21/2020. [3] [7076273] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 05/21/2020 [20-1555] (CAH) [Entered: 04/21/2020 02:34 PM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7073071] [20-1555] (AD) [Entered: 04/06/2020 03:46 PM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 Federal prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 04/20/2020. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 05/06/2020. [1] [7073059] [20-1555] (AD) [Entered: 04/06/2020 03:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Roger Day, Jr. v. Subsectretario Del Sistema Pen, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIRECTOR GENERAL DEL CENTRO DE READAPTACION SOCIAL NUMERO 5 ORIENTE, Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CONSEJO TECINCO INTERDICIPLINARIO DEL CENTRO FEDERAL DE READAPTACION SOCIAL, Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIRECTOR GENERAL DE TRANSLADO DE REOS Y SEGURIDAD PENITENCIARIA, Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUBSECTRETARIO DEL SISTEMA PENITENCIARIO FEDERAL, Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROGER C. DAY, JR.
Represented By: Roger C. Day Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?