Stanley Boclair v. Jacqueline Lashbrook
Plaintiff / Appellant: STANLEY BOCLAIR
Defendant / Appellee: JACQUELINE LASHBROOK, Warden
Case Number: 20-1813
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 06/16/2020 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7087426-2] [7087426] [20-1813] (AD) [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:17 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is DISMISSED pursuant to FRAP 42(b). The appellant shall remit to the clerk of the district court the $505 appellate fees. Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [4][7087419] [20-1813] (AD) [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:11 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Stanley Boclair to withdraw appeal. [3] [7087298] [20-1813] (PS) [Entered: 06/16/2020 11:13 AM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Stanley Boclair leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 05/27/2020. [2] [7083328] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 06/26/2020 [20-1813] (CM) [Entered: 05/27/2020 10:22 AM]
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the Appellate Court. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 05/28/2020. [1] [7081196] [20-1813] (VG) [Entered: 05/15/2020 10:12 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Stanley Boclair v. Jacqueline Lashbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STANLEY BOCLAIR
Represented By: Stanley Boclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQUELINE LASHBROOK, Warden
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?