Aloysius Oliver v. Riliwan Ojelade
Defendant / Appellee: RILIWAN OJELADE
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALOYSIUS M. OLIVER
Case Number: 20-1836
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: Motion for extension of time, filed on 7/13/2020. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the appellant shall file the Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement by August 28, 2020. The clerk shall send the appellant this courts instructions for preparing a docketing statement. [ # 7 ] CMD [8] [7093295] [20-1836] (FP) [Entered: 07/14/2020 09:21 AM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Aloysius M. Oliver to extend time to file the docketing statement [7] [7093185] [20-1836] (DRS) [Entered: 07/13/2020 04:16 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Aloysius M. Oliver Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [6] [7089309] [20-1836] (CM) [Entered: 06/25/2020 01:09 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 Prose motion filed by Appellant Aloysius M. Oliver to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [5] [7089308] [20-1836] (CM) [Entered: 06/25/2020 01:08 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Aloysius M. Oliver for appointment of counsel. [4] [7089306] [20-1836] (CM) [Entered: 06/25/2020 01:07 PM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 Attorney Brent J. Colbert for Riliwan Ojelade in 20-1836 terminated and added Attorney(s) Julie Ann Teuscher for party(s) Appellee Riliwan Ojelade, in case 20-1836 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Julie A. Teuscher for Appellee Riliwan Ojelade. [3] [7082716] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-1836]--[Edited 05/22/2020 by AD to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Teuscher, Julie) [Entered: 05/22/2020 11:00 AM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Aloysius M. Oliver leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 05/20/2020. [2] [7082412] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 06/22/2020 [20-1836] (CAH) [Entered: 05/21/2020 10:28 AM]
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Aloysius M. Oliver by 05/26/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 06/02/2020. [1] [7081849] [20-1836] (MM) [Entered: 05/19/2020 12:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Aloysius Oliver v. Riliwan Ojelade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RILIWAN OJELADE
Represented By: Brent J. Colbert
Represented By: Julie Ann Teuscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALOYSIUS M. OLIVER
Represented By: Aloysius M. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?