Jason Gonzales v. Michael Madigan, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MICHAEL J. MADIGAN, SILVANA TABARES, RAY HANANIA, SHAW DECREMER, FRIENDS OF MICHAEL J. MADIGAN, GRASIELA RODRIGUEZ, JOE BARBOSA and 13TH WARD DEMORCRATIC ORGANIZATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: JASON GONZALES
Case Number: 20-1874
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 8, 2021 Summary Gonzales v. Madigan

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant Jason Gonzales. [17] [7092930] [20-1874] (CAH) [Entered: 07/13/2020 09:14 AM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 15 Re-Submitted appellant brief by Anthony J. Peraica for Appellant Jason Gonzales. [15] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7092128] [20-1874] (Peraica, Anthony) [Entered: 07/08/2020 04:37 PM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Scott B. Erdman for Appellee Grasiela Rodriguez has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [14] [7091701] [20-1874] (LJ) [Entered: 07/07/2020 03:34 PM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 16 Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Jason Gonzales. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/05/2020 for 13th Ward Demorcratic Organization, Joe Barbosa, Shaw Decremer, Friends of Michael J. Madigan, Ray Hanania, Michael J. Madigan, Grasiela Rodriguez and Silvana Tabares. Paper copies due on 07/13/2020 Electronically Transmitted. [16] [7092222] [20-1874] (DRS) [Entered: 07/09/2020 09:53 AM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 13 Brief deficiency letter sent to Appellant Jason Gonzales. [13] [7091414] [20-1874] (DRS) [Entered: 07/07/2020 09:30 AM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 12 Submitted appellant brief by Anthony J. Peraica for Appellant Jason Gonzales. [12] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7091351] [20-1874] (Peraica, Anthony) [Entered: 07/06/2020 05:57 PM]
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael Kreloff for Appellee Shaw Decremer. [11] [7089514] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1874] [Edited 06/26/2020 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Kreloff, Michael) [Entered: 06/26/2020 09:51 AM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Megan E. Stride for Appellee Friends of Michael J. Madigan. [10] [7087954] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1874]--[Edited 06/19/2020 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Stride, Megan) [Entered: 06/18/2020 05:29 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brett E. Legner for Appellee Friends of Michael J. Madigan. [9] [7087953] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1874]--[Edited 06/19/2020 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Legner, Brett) [Entered: 06/18/2020 05:24 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael A. Scodro for Appellee Friends of Michael J. Madigan. [8] [7087952] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1874] (Scodro, Michael) [Entered: 06/18/2020 05:18 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Adam R. Vaught for Appellee Michael J. Madigan. [7] [7086666] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1874] (Rizzo, Vincent) [Entered: 06/12/2020 09:55 AM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Vincent M. Rizzo for Appellee Michael J. Madigan. [6] [7086664] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1874] [Edited 06/12/2020 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Rizzo, Vincent) [Entered: 06/12/2020 09:54 AM]
June 12, 2020 Attorney Adam R. Vaught for Silvana Tabares, Grasiela Rodriguez, Ray Hanania, Friends of Michael J. Madigan, Shaw Decremer, Joe Barbosa and 13th Ward Demorcratic Organization in 20-1874 terminated, pursuant to disclosure statement. [7086704-2] [7086704] [20-1874] (AG) [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:18 PM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 Docketing Statement filed by Appellees 13th Ward Demorcratic Organization, Friends of Michael J. Madigan and Michael J. Madigan. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7086616] [20-1874] (Vaught, Adam) [Entered: 06/11/2020 07:29 PM]
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Jason Gonzales. [4] [7083894] [20-1874] (Peraica, Anthony) [Entered: 05/28/2020 04:52 PM]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Circuit Rule 3(c)(1), referencing Circuit Rule 28(a), requires an appellant to file a docketing statement which provides information concerning appellate jurisdiction.In the present case, appellants Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement fails to set forth the date on which the motion to reconsider was filed. Appellant must provide this information. See Circuit Rule 28(a)(2)(ii). Accordingly, appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the date that the motion to reconsider was filed. The statement is due on or before June 2, 2020. DW [3] [7083410] [20-1874] (AD) [Entered: 05/27/2020 12:32 PM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Anthony J. Peraica for Appellant Jason Gonzales. [2] [7083284] [20-1874] (MM) [Entered: 05/27/2020 09:03 AM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet filed. Appellant's brief due on or before 07/06/2020 for Jason Gonzales. [1] [7083279] [20-1874] (MM) [Entered: 05/27/2020 08:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jason Gonzales v. Michael Madigan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL J. MADIGAN
Represented By: Adam R. Vaught
Represented By: Vincent M. Rizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SILVANA TABARES
Represented By: Adam R. Vaught
Represented By: Richard J. Prendergast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAY HANANIA
Represented By: Adam R. Vaught
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHAW DECREMER
Represented By: Adam R. Vaught
Represented By: Michael Kreloff
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRIENDS OF MICHAEL J. MADIGAN
Represented By: Adam R. Vaught
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Stride
Represented By: Michael Anthony Scodro
Represented By: Brett E. Legner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRASIELA RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Adam R. Vaught
Represented By: Scott B. Erdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOE BARBOSA
Represented By: Adam R. Vaught
Represented By: James P. Nally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 13TH WARD DEMORCRATIC ORGANIZATION
Represented By: Adam R. Vaught
Represented By: Michael James Kasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JASON GONZALES
Represented By: Anthony J. Peraica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?