Brenda White v. Yang Acupuncture, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: BRENDA L. WHITE
Defendant / Appellee: YANG ACUPUNCTURE and WEI YANG
Case Number: 20-2213
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: Motion to Recall the Mandate. [ # 10 ] The motion to recall the mandate is DENIED. This appeal was dismissed for lack of jurisdiction, not because appellant filed a late docketing statement, so the motion offers no reason for the court to reopen the appeal or to reconsider dismissal. JPK [11] [7104227] [20-2213] (MM) [Entered: 08/28/2020 12:42 PM]
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Brenda L. White to recall the mandate. [10] [7104064] [20-2213] (CM) [Entered: 08/27/2020 04:32 PM]
August 14, 2020 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 07/23/2020 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7100939-2] [7100939] [20-2213] (DRS) [Entered: 08/14/2020 08:27 AM]
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 Mandate issued. No record to be returned. [9] [7100937] [20-2213] (DRS) [Entered: 08/14/2020 08:26 AM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Brenda L. White. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [7099593] [20-2213] (CAH) [Entered: 08/07/2020 02:20 PM]
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. (See order for further details). Daniel A. Manion, Circuit Judge; David F. Hamilton, Circuit Judge and Michael B. Brennan, Circuit Judge. [7] [7095936] [20-2213] (FP) [Entered: 07/23/2020 05:26 PM]
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Filed District Court order of July 23, 2020. Plaintiff moves to proceed without prepaying fees or costs on appeal. Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3) states: A party who was permitted to proceed in forma pauperis in the district-court action . . . may proceed on appeal in forma pauperis without further authorization, except in circumstances not appliable here. Because Plaintiff was permitted to proceed in forma pauperis in this action, (see ECF No. 5), no further authorization is necessary, and her motion (ECF No. 12) is terminated. [6] [7095915] [20-2213] (CG) [Entered: 07/23/2020 04:31 PM]
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Appellant Brenda L. White is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Brenda L. White by 08/06/2020. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0140 0000 6080 2587. [5] [7095616] [20-2213] (AD) [Entered: 07/23/2020 08:55 AM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellant Brenda L. White. [4] [7095253] [20-2213] (PS) [Entered: 07/21/2020 04:55 PM]
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Appellant Brenda L. White shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7092408] DW Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Brenda L. White by 07/23/2020 [3] [7092408] [20-2213] (AP) [Entered: 07/09/2020 02:40 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7091921] [20-2213] (CG) [Entered: 07/08/2020 12:34 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Brenda L. White by 07/14/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 07/22/2020. [1] [7091913] [20-2213] (CG) [Entered: 07/08/2020 12:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brenda White v. Yang Acupuncture, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRENDA L. WHITE
Represented By: Brenda L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YANG ACUPUNCTURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WEI YANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?