DISH Network L.L.C. v. NBI Holdings, LLC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: NORTHWEST BROADCASTING, LP, NBI HOLDINGS, LLC, COX MEDIA GROUP, LLC, BRYSON BROADCAST HOLDINGS, LLC and CAMELOT MEDIA BUYER, INC
Plaintiff / Appellant: DISH NETWORK L.L.C.
Case Number: 20-2315
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re: Joint motion for voluntary dismissal, filed on 12/15/20. This appeal is DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). Oral argument in this appeal scheduled for January 15, 2021 is VACATED. The mandate in the appeal shall issue forthwith. Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [ # 52 ][53][7129284] [20-2315] (FP) [Entered: 12/17/2020 11:02 AM]
December 17, 2020 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 12/17/2020 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7129322-2] [7129322] [20-2315] (FP) [Entered: 12/17/2020 01:09 PM]
December 15, 2020 Filing 52 Joint motion filed by Appellant DISH Network L.L.C. to dismiss case. [52] [7128582] [20-2315] (Dockterman, Michael) [Entered: 12/15/2020 12:13 PM]
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order issued IT IS ORDERED that counsel in this appeal shall present oral argument either telephonically or by video communications. No attorneys will be present in the courtroom. The clerks office will contact counsel with further instructions. MOTIONS TO WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT: If the appeal can be resolved based on the briefs and record and the decisional process would not be significantly aided by oral argument, see FED. R. APP. P. 34(a), counsel may file a motion under Circuit Rule 34(e) to waive oral argument. The court encourages counsel to confer with opposing counsel when considering a motion to waive oral argument and prefers joint motions. A motion to waive oral argument must be filed no later than seven days before the date of argument. LJ [51] [7123092] [20-2315] (LJ) [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:12 AM]
November 20, 2020 Filing 50 Argument set for Friday, January 15, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. Each side limited to 20 minutes. [50] [7123033] [20-2315]--[Edited 12/17/2020 by FP to reflect that this order is VACATED per 12/17/2020 order.] (DRS) [Entered: 11/20/2020 08:30 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 49 Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellant DISH Network L.L.C.. [49] [7121907] [20-2315] (SK) [Entered: 11/16/2020 11:51 AM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 48 Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellant DISH Network L.L.C.. Paper copies due on 11/19/2020 Electronically Transmitted. [48] [7121395] [20-2315] (CO) [Entered: 11/12/2020 03:55 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 47 Submitted appellant reply brief by Michael Dockterman, Pantelis Michalopoulos and Jared R. Butcher for Appellant DISH Network L.L.C.. [47] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7121288] [20-2315] (Dockterman, Michael) [Entered: 11/12/2020 02:36 PM]
November 3, 2020 Filing 46 Paper copies of SEALED, REDACTED appellee brief and appendix filed by Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. [46] [7119147] [20-2315] (LJ) [Entered: 11/03/2020 09:43 AM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE: Attorney Ms. Hille R. Sheppard for Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP will not be available for oral argument November 23-27, December 15-16, 2020; January 4-8, January 28 through February 1, 2021. [45] [7118755] [20-2315] (Sheppard, Hille) [Entered: 10/30/2020 08:43 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 44 SEALED Appellee's brief filed by Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. Per order. Electronically Transmitted. [44] [7118730] Paper copies due on 11/06/2020 [20-2315] (GW) [Entered: 10/30/2020 04:33 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 43 Filed Supplemental Appendix by Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. [43] [7118728] Paper copies due on 11/06/2020 [20-2315] (GW) [Entered: 10/30/2020 04:31 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 42 Redacted Appellee's brief filed by Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. per order. Electronically Transmitted. Paper copies due on 11/06/2020 [42] [7118727] [20-2315] (GW) [Entered: 10/30/2020 04:30 PM]
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re: Motion to maintain under seal a portion of the brief of appellees the terrier defendants, filed on 10/29/2020. The motion is GRANTED. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the unredacted version of appellees brief that is tendered with their motion. Appellees shall resubmit by November 2, 2020, a brief that redacts only the image on page 10 of their brief. The redacted brief will be filed in the public record. [ # 39 ] SCR [41] [7118680] [20-2315] (FP) [Entered: 10/30/2020 03:40 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 40 Re-Submitted Redacted appellee brief by Hille Sheppard for Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. [40] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7118194] [20-2315] (Sheppard, Hille) [Entered: 10/29/2020 10:21 AM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 39 Motion by Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP to seal Appellees' Brief. [39] [7118189] [20-2315] (Sheppard, Hille) [Entered: 10/29/2020 10:12 AM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 38 Brief deficiency letter sent to Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. [38] [7116909] [20-2315] (GW) [Entered: 10/23/2020 11:22 AM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 37 Submitted Supplemental Appendix by Hille Sheppard for Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. [37] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7116767] [20-2315] (Sheppard, Hille) [Entered: 10/22/2020 08:08 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 36 Submitted Redacted appellee brief by Hille Sheppard for Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. [36] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7116766] [20-2315] (Sheppard, Hille) [Entered: 10/22/2020 08:05 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 35 Submitted sealed appellee brief by Hille Sheppard for Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. Permission to submit a sealed brief was granted 06/23/2020. [35] [7116765] [20-2315] (Sheppard, Hille) [Entered: 10/22/2020 08:02 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 34 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrew F. Rodheim for Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. Additional Parties: Terrier Media Buyer, Inc., Camelot Media Holdings, LLC, Northwest Broadcasting, Inc., Apollo Global Management, Inc., AP IX Titan Holdings GP, LLC, AP IX (PMC) VoteCo, LLC, Apollo Investment Fund IX, L.P.. [34] [7116760] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2315] (Rodheim, Andrew) [Entered: 10/22/2020 05:03 PM]
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: re: Defendant-appellee Cox Media Group, LLC's unopposed motion to dismiss appeal. The motion is GRANTED. The clerk shall update the courts docket to reflect that defendant-appellee Cox Media Group, LLC, is not a party in this appeal. CMD [33] [7116639] [20-2315] (CG) [Entered: 10/22/2020 02:07 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 32 Motion filed by Appellee Cox Media Group, LLC Appellant DISH Network L.L.C. to dismiss case. [32] [7116528] [20-2315]--[Edited 10/22/2020 by AD to reflect correct party filer.] (Watson, Brian) [Entered: 10/22/2020 10:46 AM]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellee's brief [ # 30 ] Appellees' brief due on or before 10/22/2020 for Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, Cox Media Group, LLC, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/12/2020 for Appellant DISH Network L.L.C.. CMD [31] [7110000] [20-2315] (CG) [Entered: 09/23/2020 04:01 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 30 Motion filed by Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP to extend time to file appellee brief. [30] [7109892] [20-2315] (Hochman, Robert) [Entered: 09/23/2020 01:08 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 29 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant DISH Network L.L.C.. [29] [7107518] [20-2315] (GW) [Entered: 09/14/2020 02:58 PM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 28 Appellant's brief filed by Appellant DISH Network L.L.C.. Paper copies due on 09/15/2020 Electronically Transmitted. [28] [7106192] [20-2315] (CM) [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:22 PM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 27 Submitted appellant brief by Michael Dockterman, Pantelis Michalopoulos & Jared R. Butcher for Appellant DISH Network L.L.C.. [27] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7106178] [20-2315] (Dockterman, Michael) [Entered: 09/08/2020 02:54 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 26 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jared R. Butcher for Appellant DISH Network L.L.C.. [26] [7105950] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2315] (Butcher, Jared) [Entered: 09/04/2020 08:54 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 25 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Pantelis Michalopoulos for Appellant DISH Network L.L.C.. [25] [7105807] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2315] (Michalopoulos, Pantelis) [Entered: 09/04/2020 02:07 PM]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER issued GRANTING Appellants Motion for Partial Voluntary Dismissal. [ # 7 ] Appellant no longer seeks appellate review of the district courts order for limited document production dated May 6, 2020 (Dkt. No. 90) and the district courts order denying DISHs motion to compel discovery dated June 17, 2020 (Dkt. No. 104). This appeal, therefore, is LIMITED to a review of the order denying the preliminary injunction. The briefing, as LIMITED by this order, proceeds as set forth in the courts order of July 24, 2020. DW [24] [7100299] [20-2315] (AD) [Entered: 08/12/2020 09:25 AM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 23 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant DISH Network L.L.C.. [23] [7098390] [20-2315] (Butcher, Jared) [Entered: 08/04/2020 10:53 AM]
July 28, 2020 Filing 22 Amended Statement of Jurisdiction filed by Appellant DISH Network L.L.C.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [22] [7096874] [20-2315] (Dockterman, Michael) [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:06 PM]
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 09/08/2020 for DISH Network L.L.C.. Appellee's brief due on or before 10/08/2020 for Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, Cox Media Group, LLC, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/29/2020 for Appellant DISH Network L.L.C. JNS [7096123] [20-2315] (FP) [Entered: 07/24/2020 02:56 PM]
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Friday, August 7, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [20] [7096117] [20-2315] (FP) [Entered: 07/24/2020 02:47 PM]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: This matter comes before the court on review of Appellants Amended Circuit Rule 3(c) Docketing Statement and Statement of Jurisdiction filed on July 21, 2020. That statement remains inadequate. Appellants Amended Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement fails to identify by name all members of defendant Cox Media Group, LLC, defendant Apollo Global Management, LLC, defendant AP IX (PMC) VoteCo., LLC, and defendant AP IX Titan Holdings GP, LLC, and each members state of citizenship. Appellant must provide this information. appellant shall file a complete second amended statement of jurisdiction that includes the citizenship information listed above. The statement is due on or before July 28, 2020. (See order for further details) DW [19] [19] [7095513] [20-2315] (AD) [Entered: 07/22/2020 02:37 PM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Patricia Brown Holmes for Appellee Cox Media Group, LLC. [18] [7095456] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2315] (Holmes, Patricia) [Entered: 07/22/2020 12:02 PM]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re: 1. Emergency motion for stay of stay of order denying injunction. 2. Terrier defendants response in opposition. 3. Cox Media's response to motion. IT IS ORDERED that the motion for stay is DENIED. DISH Network has not shown a reasonable likelihood of success on the merits of its claims or a threat of genuinely imminent harm. [ # 3 ] SCR [17] [7095450] [20-2315] (AP) [Entered: 07/22/2020 11:53 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Joshua D. Lee for Appellee Cox Media Group, LLC. [16] [7095447] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [20-2315] (Lee, Joshua) [Entered: 07/22/2020 11:47 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 15 Filed Response in Opposition by Appellee Cox Media Group, LLC Attorney Patricia Brown Holmes to Plaintiff-Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay of Order Denying Injunction and Dissolving Restraining Order. [15][7095445] [20-2315] (Watson, Brian) [Entered: 07/22/2020 11:45 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 14 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brian Watson for Appellee Cox Media Group, LLC. [14] [7095436] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2315] (Watson, Brian) [Entered: 07/22/2020 11:33 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 13 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert N. Hochman for Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. Additional Parties: Terrier Media Buyer, Inc.; Camelot Media Holdings, LLC; Northwest Broadcasting, Inc.; Apollo Global Management, Inc.; AP IX Titan Holdings GP, LLC; AP IX (PMC) VoteCo, LLC; Apollo Investment Fund IX, L.P.. [13] [7095384] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2315] [13] [7095384] [20-2315]--[Edited 07/22/2020 by ZNS to reflect the addition of counsel] (Hochman, Robert) [Entered: 07/22/2020 10:05 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Hille R. Sheppard for Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. Additional Parties: Terrier Media Buyer, Inc.; Camelot Media Holdings, LLC; Northwest Broadcasting, Inc.; Apollo Global Management, Inc.; AP IX Titan Holdings GP, LLC; AP IX (PMC) VoteCo, LLC; Apollo Investment Fund IX, L.P.. [12] [7095380] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2315] (Sheppard, Hille) [Entered: 07/22/2020 10:00 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 Filed Response in Opposition by Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP to DISH's Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. [11][7095288] [20-2315] (Skakun, John) [Entered: 07/22/2020 08:36 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Neil H. Conrad for Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. Additional Parties: Terrier Media Buyer, Inc.; Camelot Media Holdings, LLC; Northwest Broadcasting, Inc.; Apollo Global Management, Inc.; AP IX Titan Holdings GP, LLC; AP IX (PMC) VoteCo, LLC; Apollo Investment Fund IX, L.P.. [10] [7095283] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2315] (Conrad, Neil) [Entered: 07/22/2020 05:31 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John M. Skakun III for Appellees Bryson Broadcast Holdings, LLC, Camelot Media Buyer, Inc, NBI Holdings, LLC and Northwest Broadcasting, LP. Additional Parties: Terrier Media Buyer, Inc.; Camelot Media Holdings, LLC; Northwest Broadcasting, Inc.; Apollo Global Management, Inc.; AP IX Titan Holdings GP, LLC; AP IX (PMC) VoteCo, LLC; Apollo Investment Fund IX, L.P.. [9] [7095282] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2315] (Skakun, John) [Entered: 07/22/2020 05:27 AM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 Amended Statement of Jurisdiction filed by Appellant DISH Network L.L.C.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [7095269] [20-2315] (Dockterman, Michael) [Entered: 07/21/2020 07:04 PM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 Motion filed by Appellant DISH Network L.L.C. for partial voluntary dismissal. [7] [7095266] [20-2315] (Dockterman, Michael) [Entered: 07/21/2020 06:57 PM]
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before July 28, 2020. (See order for details.) DW [6] [7095235] [20-2315] (CG) [Entered: 07/21/2020 04:24 PM]
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Appellant shall file, on or before July 28, 2020, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be LIMITED to a review of the order denying the preliminary injunction. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be suspended pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7095229] DW [5] [7095229] [20-2315]--[Edited 07/21/2020 by CG to update docket text.] (CG) [Entered: 07/21/2020 04:20 PM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael Dockterman for Appellant DISH Network L.L.C.. [4] [7095198] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2315] (Dockterman, Michael) [Entered: 07/21/2020 03:48 PM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Motion filed by Appellant DISH Network L.L.C. for stay of Order Denying Preliminary Injunction and Dissolving Restraining Order. [3] [7095146] [20-2315] (Dockterman, Michael) [Entered: 07/21/2020 02:59 PM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Northwest Broadcasting, Inc., Camelot Media Holdings, LLC., Apollo Global Management, LLC., Apollo Investment Fund IX, LP, Terrier Media Buyer, Inc., AP IX Titan Holdings GP, LLC, AP IX (PMC) VoteCo, LLC. [2] [7094986] [20-2315] (CG) [Entered: 07/21/2020 10:12 AM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 08/04/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 08/31/2020 for DISH Network L.L.C. [1] [7094978] [20-2315] (CG) [Entered: 07/21/2020 10:03 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: DISH Network L.L.C. v. NBI Holdings, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORTHWEST BROADCASTING, LP
Represented By: Andrew F. Rodheim
Represented By: Scott R. Lassar
Represented By: Neil H. Conrad
Represented By: Bruce Roger Braun Esq. I
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Represented By: Hille R. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NBI HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: John M. Skakun III
Represented By: Andrew F. Rodheim
Represented By: Scott R. Lassar
Represented By: Neil H. Conrad
Represented By: Bruce Roger Braun Esq. I
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Represented By: Hille R. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COX MEDIA GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Brian O'Connor Watson
Represented By: Patricia Brown Holmes
Represented By: Allison N. Siebeneck
Represented By: Joshua Douglas Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRYSON BROADCAST HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: John M. Skakun III
Represented By: Andrew F. Rodheim
Represented By: Scott R. Lassar
Represented By: Neil H. Conrad
Represented By: Bruce Roger Braun Esq. I
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Represented By: Hille R. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAMELOT MEDIA BUYER, INC
Represented By: John M. Skakun III
Represented By: Andrew F. Rodheim
Represented By: Scott R. Lassar
Represented By: Neil H. Conrad
Represented By: Bruce Roger Braun Esq. I
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Represented By: Hille R. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DISH NETWORK L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael Dockterman
Represented By: Pantelis Michalopoulos
Represented By: Jared Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?