Frankie Brown v. Warden, USP McCreary
Respondent / Appellee: WARDEN, USP MCCREARY
Petitioner / Appellant: FRANKIE BROWN
Case Number: 20-2331
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: On August 21, 2020, this court received a letter from the appellant. Because this appeal was voluntarily dismissed on August 5, 2020, the letter will be filed without further court action. The clerk will send the appellant a copy of the courts public docket. CMD [4] [7103584] [20-2331] (AG) [Entered: 08/26/2020 09:12 AM]
August 5, 2020 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 08/05/2020 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7098905-2] [7098905] [20-2331] (AP) [Entered: 08/05/2020 03:15 PM]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re. Motion to dismiss. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is DISMISSED in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). Further, the appellant is reminded that any petition for a writ of certiorari must be filed directly with the clerk of the United States Supreme Court and in accordance with the Supreme Courts rules. Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [ # 2 ][3][7098894] [20-2331] (AP) [Entered: 08/05/2020 03:08 PM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Frankie Brown to dismiss case pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [2] [7098285] [20-2331] (CM) [Entered: 08/04/2020 09:32 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 Federal prisoner's habeas corpus case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Frankie Brown by 07/27/2020. Fee or IFP forms due on 08/05/2020 for Appellant Frankie Brown. Transcript information sheet due by 08/05/2020. [1] [7095519] [20-2331] (MM) [Entered: 07/22/2020 02:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Frankie Brown v. Warden, USP McCreary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WARDEN, USP MCCREARY
Represented By: James M. Cutchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: FRANKIE BROWN
Represented By: Frankie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?